Quinan v. Kleinberg et al
Plaintiff: Russell Quinan
Defendant: Adam Kleinberg, Paul Giese and Theo Fanning
Case Number: 3:2021cv05295
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Russell Quinan (Restis, William) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Russell Quinan Notice of Pendency of Other Action (Restis, William) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Russell Quinan (Restis, William) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Russell Quinan. Service waived by Adam Kleinberg waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Restis, William) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Russell Quinan. Service waived by Paul Giese waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Restis, William) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Russell Quinan. Service waived by Theo Fanning waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Restis, William) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Russell Quinan.. (Restis, William) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Theo Fanning, Paul Giese, Adam Kleinberg. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/23/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Restis, William) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Theo Fanning, Paul Giese, Adam Kleinberg ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16160573.). Filed byRussell Quinan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Restis, William) (Filed on 7/9/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinan v. Kleinberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Quinan
Represented By: William Richard Restis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Kleinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Giese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theo Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?