Series 17-04-631, LLC v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Series 17-04-631, LLC
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc. and McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Case Number: 3:2021cv05327
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 21 Letter from Christopher L. Coffin . (Coffin, Christopher) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 12, 2021 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:21-cv-10553. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 12, 2021 Filing 19 Case transferred electronically to Northern District of California pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 6/16/2021. (Lara, Miguel)
July 12, 2021 Filing 18 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1 in MDL Case 2996 received from Northern District of California requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Lara, Miguel)
July 12, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:21-md-02996-CRB; Boston Massachusetts, 1:21-cv-10553-PBS, Series 17-04-631, LLC v. McKinsey & Company, Inc., et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-5327 CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: JPMDL. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
June 16, 2021 Filing 17 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1 in MDL Case 2996 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 12, 2021 Filing 16 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer and Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. "This matter is STAYED pending the resolution of the Motion to Transfer. The deadline to respond to the complaint is extended to 30 days after the Motion to Transfer is ruled on, if denied." (Baker, Casey)
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Series 17-04-631, LLC. Mckinsey & Company, Inc., United States waiver sent on 4/14/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Rivera, Adam)
May 11, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Series 17-04-631, LLC. McKinsey & Company, Inc. waiver sent on 4/14/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Rivera, Adam)
May 10, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer, Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint ( Responses due by 5/24/2021) by McKinsey & Company, Inc., Mckinsey & Company, Inc., United States.(Weld, Christopher)
April 6, 2021 Filing 12 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Michael O. Mena. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Baker, Casey)
April 6, 2021 Filing 11 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added John W. Cleary. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Baker, Casey)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Eduardo E. Bertran. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Baker, Casey)
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Robert Strongarone. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Baker, Casey)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael O. Mena Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8712837 by Series 17-04-631, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Michael O. Mena)(Rivera, Adam)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John W. Cleary Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8712829 by Series 17-04-631, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of John W. Cleary)(Rivera, Adam)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Eduardo E. Bertran Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8712822 by Series 17-04-631, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Eduardo Bertran)(Rivera, Adam)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert Strongarone Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8712798 by Series 17-04-631, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Robert Strongarone)(Rivera, Adam)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to McKinsey & Company, Inc., Mckinsey & Company, Inc., United States. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service (Baker, Casey)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Category Sheet by Series 17-04-631, LLC. (Baker, Casey)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., Mckinsey & Company, Inc., United States Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8707002 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Series 17-04-631, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rivera, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Series 17-04-631, LLC v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Series 17-04-631, LLC
Represented By: Adam R. Rivera
Represented By: Eduardo E. Bertran
Represented By: John W. Cleary
Represented By: Michael O. Mena
Represented By: Robert Strongarone
Represented By: Christopher Luke Coffin
Represented By: John W. Cleary, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Weld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Represented By: Christopher Weld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?