Campbell et al v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Thomas J Campbell, Millicent C Campbell and Maurice Ragson
Defendant: Mitchell E Wilson and Marla Wilson
Case Number: 3:2021cv05486
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal ) Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal filed byMarla Wilson, Mitchell E Wilson. (McLetchie, Margaret) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal ) filed byMillicent C Campbell, Thomas J Campbell, Maurice Ragson. (Berg, Lindsey) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Remand ) and Supplemental Declaration of Michael Masuda filed byMillicent C Campbell, Thomas J Campbell, Maurice Ragson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Berg, Lindsey) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Advancing Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Response due by 9/7/2021. Reply due by 9/13/2021. Motion Hearing reset for 9/22/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Remand ) Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed byMarla Wilson, Mitchell E Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 02/22/2021 Letter, #2 Declaration Margaret A. McLetchie's Declaration in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand)(McLetchie, Margaret) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal filed by Marla Wilson, Mitchell E Wilson. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/10/2021. Replies due by 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Margaret A. McLetchie's Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal, #3 Proposed Amended Notice of Removal)(McLetchie, Margaret) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand filed by Millicent C Campbell, Thomas J Campbell, Maurice Ragson. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/27/2021. Replies due by 9/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Berg, Lindsey) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/30/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 Case REASSIGNED to Judge William H. Orrick. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marla Wilson, Mitchell E Wilson.. (McLetchie, Margaret) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to Complaint byMarla Wilson, Mitchell E Wilson. (McLetchie, Margaret) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendants' Notice of Removal of Civil Action Under U.S.C. 1332(a), 1441(b), and 1446 from Superior Court of California, County of Monterey. Their case number is 21CV001648. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16185394). Filed byMitchell E Wilson, Marla Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McLetchie, Margaret) (Filed on 7/16/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell et al v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J Campbell
Represented By: Lindsey Noelle Berg
Represented By: Michael Peter Masuda
Represented By: Lucina Rios-Garcia,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millicent C Campbell
Represented By: Lindsey Noelle Berg
Represented By: Michael Peter Masuda
Represented By: Lucina Rios-Garcia,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Ragson
Represented By: Lindsey Noelle Berg
Represented By: Michael Peter Masuda
Represented By: Lucina Rios-Garcia,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell E Wilson
Represented By: Margaret Ann McLetchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marla Wilson
Represented By: Margaret Ann McLetchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?