Cleveland Bakers & Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund v. Mckinsey & Company, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Cleveland Bakers & Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc, McKinsey & Company Inc United States, McKinsey & Company Inc. and McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Case Number: 3:2021cv05560
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-01218. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 20, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED:, Ohio Northern, 1:21-cv-01218, Cleveland Bakers & Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund v. Mckinsey & Company, Inc., et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-05560-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 5 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 5) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In Re: MDL 2996 McKinsey & Company, Inc., National Prescription Opiate Consultant Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (P,R)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motions for appearance pro hac vice by attorneys Terence S. Ziegler, Jordan E. Jacobson, Joseph H. Meltzer for Cleveland Bakers & Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #3 #4 #5 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/19/21.(P,R)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Mckinsey & Company, Inc. on 6/28/2021, (marked c-19) filed on behalf of Cleveland Bakers & Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund. Related document(s) #2 . (R,AP)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States on 6/28/2021, (marked c-19) filed on behalf of Cleveland Bakers & Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund. Related document(s) #2 . (R,AP)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Joseph H. Meltzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10906899, filed by Plaintiff Cleveland Bakers & Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Joseph H. Meltzer in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Grabelsky, Jonah /s by George H. Faulkner)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Jordan E. Jacobson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10906864, filed by Plaintiff Cleveland Bakers & Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Jordan Jacobson in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Grabelsky, Jonah /s by George H. Faulkner)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for attorney Terence S. Ziegler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10906838, filed by Plaintiff Cleveland Bakers & Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Terence S. Ziegler in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Grabelsky, Jonah - /s by George H. Faulkner)
June 24, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70210350000144691939. (W,Jo)
June 24, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Mckinsey & Company, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70210350000144691922. (W,Jo)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon all Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
June 22, 2021 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (M,MT)
June 22, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,MT)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against all Defendants. Filing fee paid $402.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-10893457. Filed by Cleveland Bakers & Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Faulkner, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland Bakers & Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund v. Mckinsey & Company, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland Bakers & Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jordan E. Jacobson
Represented By: Joseph H. Meltzer
Represented By: Terence S. Ziegler
Represented By: Jonah D. Grabelsky
Represented By: Joseph C. Hoffman, Jr.
Represented By: George H. Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?