Ramsey v. Coinbase Global, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donald Ramsey
Defendant: Coinbase Global, Inc., Brian Armstrong, Alesia J. Haas, Jennifer N. Jones, Surojit Chatterjee, Paul Grewal, Marc L Andreessen, Frederick Ernest Ehrsam III, Kathryn Haun, Kelly Kramer, Gokul Rajaram, Fred Wilson, AH Capital Management LLC, Paradigm Fund LP, Ribbit Management Company, LLC, Tiger Global Management, LLC, Union Square Ventures, LLC and Viserion Investment PTE LTD.
Case Number: 3:2021cv05634
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Stipulation filed by Donald Ramsey. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Laughlin. (bxsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Thomas L. Laughlin ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16393952.) filed by Donald Ramsey. (Laughlin, Thomas) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 COMPLAINT CORRECTION OF DOCKET #1 against AH Capital Management LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Brian Armstrong, Surojit Chatterjee, Coinbase Global, Inc., Frederick Ernest Ehrsam III, Paul Grewal, Alesia J. Haas, Kathryn Haun, Jennifer N. Jones, Kelly Kramer, Paradigm Fund LP, Gokul Rajaram, Ribbit Management Company, LLC, Tiger Global Management, LLC, Union Square Ventures, LLC, Viserion Investment PTE LTD., Fred Wilson. Filed byDonald Ramsey. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to AH Capital Management LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Brian Armstrong, Surojit Chatterjee, Coinbase Global, Inc., Frederick Ernest Ehrsam III, Paul Grewal, Alesia J. Haas, Kathryn Haun, Jennifer N. Jones, Kelly Kramer, Paradigm Fund LP, Gokul Rajaram, Ribbit Management Company, LLC, Tiger Global Management, LLC, Union Square Ventures, LLC, Viserion Investment PTE LTD., and Fred Wilson. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by John T. Jasnoch on behalf of Donald Ramsey (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Donald Ramsey (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 *** PLEASE SEE #8 FOR CORRECTED FILING ***COMPLAINT against AH Capital Management LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Brian Armstrong, Surojit Chatterjee, Coinbase Global, Inc., Frederick Ernest Ehrsam III, Paul Grewal, Alesia J. Haas, Kathryn Haun, Jennifer N. Jones, Kelly Kramer, Paradigm Fund LP, Gokul Rajaram, Ribbit Management Company, LLC, Tiger Global Management, LLC, Union Square Ventures, LLC, Viserion Investment PTE LTD., Fred Wilson ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16206740.). Filed byDonald Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 7/22/2021) Modified on 7/23/2021 (elyS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramsey v. Coinbase Global, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ramsey
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: Brian Jared Schall
Represented By: Thomas L Laughlin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coinbase Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alesia J. Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surojit Chatterjee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L Andreessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Ernest Ehrsam III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Haun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gokul Rajaram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AH Capital Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradigm Fund LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ribbit Management Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Global Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Square Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viserion Investment PTE LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?