Cruise LLC et al v. Ford Motor Company
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Counter Defendant: Cruise LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC and General Motors LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv05685
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 45 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING HEARING TO ZOOM: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2021 at 02:30 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 10/28/21 at 2 pm Pacific.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www .cand.uscourts.gov/si General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 14, 2021 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2021 before Judge Susan Illston by General Motors LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Torres, Diana) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 13, 2021 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/10/2021 before Judge Susan Illston by Ford Motor Company, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Cincone, Gia) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 13, 2021 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2021 via Zoom webinar re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cruise LLC, General Motors LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC.Total Time in Court: 1:07. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorney: Diane Doolittle, Margret Caruso, Brett Arnold, Kyle Batter, Diana Torres, Louise Decoppet. Defendant Attorney: William Brewster. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/13/2021)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Louise Decoppet.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 9, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16371000.) filed by General Motors LLC. (Decoppet, Louise) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett J. Arnold (Arnold, Brett) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 2, 2021 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Cruise LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Brewster, William) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 2, 2021 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING: Motion for Preliminary Injunction #24 Hearing set for 9/10/2021 at 10:00 AM - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 9/3/2021 at 2 p.m. Pacific.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts. gov/si General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 27, 2021 Filing 36 OBJECTIONS to re #35 Objection, #34 Reply to Opposition/Response, Defendant's Objections to Reply Evidence (LR 7-3(D)(1) by Ford Motor Company. (Cincone, Gia) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 35 OBJECTIONS to re #28 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,, by Cruise LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 34 REPLY (re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCruise LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristine Boyden, #2 Declaration of Dr. Patrick Farrell, #3 Declaration of Timothy Gorbatoff, #4 Declaration of Alexandra Heller, #5 Declaration of Dr. Gregory Shaver, #6 Declaration of Yoram Wind)(Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 33 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. (Cincone, Gia) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Received one USB drive re: #31 Notice of Manual Filing. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company (Chollet, Nichole) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #28 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,, Notice of Manual Filing (Chollet, Nichole) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 30 EXHIBITS re #29 Declaration in Opposition,, of Adam Longarzo - Exhibits part 2 - filed byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 part 1, #2 Exhibit 14 part 2, #3 Exhibit 14 part 3, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20, #10 Exhibit 21, #11 Exhibit 22 part 1, #12 Exhibit 22 part 2, #13 Exhibit 22 part 3, #14 Exhibit 23, #15 Exhibit 24, #16 Exhibit 25 part 1, #17 Exhibit 25 part 2, #18 Exhibit 25 part 3)(Related document(s) #29 ) (Brewster, William) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Adam Longarzo in Opposition to #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Exhibits part 1 - filed byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 part 3, #6 Exhibit 4 part 1, #7 Exhibit 4 part 2, #8 Exhibit 4 part 3, #9 Exhibit 5 part 1, #10 Exhibit 5 part 2, #11 Exhibit 5 part 3, #12 Exhibit 6 part 1, #13 Exhibit 6 part 2, #14 Exhibit 6 part 3, #15 Exhibit 7, #16 Exhibit 8, #17 Exhibit 9, #18 Exhibit 10, #19 Exhibit 11, #20 Exhibit 12 part 1, #21 Exhibit 12 part 2, #22 Exhibit 12 part 3)(Related document(s) #24 ) (Brewster, William) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nichole Davis Chollet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Chollet, #3 Exhibit 2 to Chollet, #4 Exhibit 3 to Chollet, #5 Exhibit 4 to Chollet, #6 Exhibit 5 to Chollet, #7 Exhibit 6 to Chollet, #8 Exhibit 7 to Chollet, #9 Exhibit 8 to Chollet, #10 Exhibit 9 to Chollet, #11 Exhibit 10 to Chollet, #12 Exhibit 11 to Chollet, #13 Exhibit 12 to Chollet, #14 Exhibit 13 to Chollet, #15 Exhibit 14 to Chollet, #16 Exhibit 15 to Chollet, #17 Exhibit 16 to Chollet, #18 Exhibit 17 to Chollet, #19 Exhibit 18 to Chollet, #20 Exhibit 19 to Chollet, #21 Exhibit 20 to Chollet, #22 Exhibit 21 to Chollet, #23 Exhibit 22 to Chollet, #24 Exhibit 23 to Chollet, #25 Exhibit 24 to Chollet, #26 Exhibit 25 to Chollet, #27 Exhibit 26 to Chollet, #28 Exhibit 27 to Chollet, #29 Exhibit 28 to Chollet, #30 Exhibit 29 to Chollet, #31 Exhibit 30 to Chollet, #32 Exhibit 31 to Chollet, #33 Exhibit 32 to Chollet, #34 Exhibit 33 to Chollet, #35 Exhibit 34 to Chollet, #36 Exhibit 35 to Chollet, #37 Exhibit 36 to Chollet, #38 Declaration - Joachimsthaler, #39 Declaration - Finegan, #40 Declaration - Neal, #41 Declaration - Poret, #42 Declaration - Jay, #43 Declaration - Butler)(Brewster, William) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 27 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nichole Davis Chollet, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Adam Longarzo)(Chollet, Nichole) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston Granting #25 Stipulated Protective Order. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Chollet, Nichole) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cruise LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/13/2021. Replies due by 8/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristine Boyden, #2 Declaration of Diane Doolittle, #3 Declaration of Timothy Gorbatoff, #4 Declaration of Mario Maiorana, #5 Declaration of Jason Sledziewski, #6 Declaration of Yoram Wind, #7 Declaration of Louise Zhang, #8 Proposed Order)(Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 29, 2021 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Other Affiliate General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors LLC. (Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 29, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cruise LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC. Ford Motor Company served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 29, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Kenneth Batter on behalf of Brett Arnold (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 29, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Kenneth Batter (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 29, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cruise LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 29, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used for Summons Returned Executed. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety using &q uot;summons returned executed" event. Re: #19 Certificate of Service filed by Cruise LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of R. Charles Henn, Jr..(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of William H. Brewster.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Nichole Chollet.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16222851.) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Henn, R.) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16222270.) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Brewster, William) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16222157.) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Chollet, Nichole) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gia L. Cincone (Cincone, Gia) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory S. Gilchrist (Gilchrist, Gregory) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 24, 2021 Filing 7 ERRATA re #1 Complaint, by Cruise LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. (Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 7/24/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cruise LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC identifying Other Affiliate General Motors LLC, Other Affiliate SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M2) L.P. for Cruise LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC. (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cruise LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Motors LLC (Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors LLC (Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16212771.). Filed byCruise LLC, General Motors LLC, GM Cruise Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 7/23/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruise LLC et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Cruise LLC
Represented By: Kyle Kenneth Batter
Represented By: Diane M. Doolittle
Represented By: Margret Mary Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: GM Cruise Holdings LLC
Represented By: Kyle Kenneth Batter
Represented By: Diane M. Doolittle
Represented By: Margret Mary Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Dale Cendali
Represented By: Diana Marie Torres
Represented By: Louise Emmanuelle Decoppet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: William Howard Brewster
Represented By: Gia L. Cincone
Represented By: Gregory S. Gilchrist
Represented By: Nichole Davis Chollet
Represented By: R. Charles Henn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?