Andrade v. Lake County District Attorney
Petitioner: Silvia Andrade
Respondent: Lake County District Attorney
Case Number: 3:2021cv05785
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
2 Judge: PSLC HHL
3 Judge: PSLC RMH
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 8/9/2021. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 54611155581. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 Received copy of re #2 Clerk's Notice to petitioner dated 7/16/21 by Silvia Andrade. (cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Silvia Andrade dated 8/2/21. (cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/3/2021. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S LETTER dated 7/16/2021 regarding check no 27396691086 in the amount of $5.00 returned. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Silvia Andrade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrade v. Lake County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Silvia Andrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lake County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?