Oakville Produce Partners, LLC v. Garten Wellbeing PBC, dba Garten Wellbeing et al
Plaintiff: Oakville Produce Partners, LLC
Defendant: Garten Wellbeing PBC, dba Garten Wellbeing, Michael Heinrich and Garten Wellbeing PBC doing business as Garten Wellbeing
Case Number: 3:2021cv05881
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Oakville Produce Partners, LLC.. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/9/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2021. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Oakville Produce Partners, LLC . RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 8/2/2021) Modified on 8/2/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Garten Wellbeing PBC, Michael Heinrich. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2021 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Oakville Produce Partners, LLC AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20). Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is loc ated at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office until the civil cover sheet is filed. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Oakville Produce Partners, LLC (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file the document as a separate entry on the docket. Re:[1-2] Supplement Rule 7.1 Corpor ate Disclosure Statement, filed by Oakville Produce Partners, LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE PERISHABLE AGRICULTURAL COMMODITIES ACT (7 U.S.C. 499b et seq.), FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, FOR VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 17220, FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, AND FOR CONVERSION. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16235802.). Filed byOakville Produce Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 7/30/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakville Produce Partners, LLC v. Garten Wellbeing PBC, dba Garten Wellbeing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakville Produce Partners, LLC
Represented By: Kaipo K.B. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garten Wellbeing PBC, dba Garten Wellbeing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garten Wellbeing PBC doing business as Garten Wellbeing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?