MAZZONE-URIE v. OneWest Bank FSB et al
Plaintiff: Florentina MAZZONE-URIE
Defendant: OneWest Bank FSB, as Successor in Interest to Certain Assets and Liabilities of Indymac Bank, FSB, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Ocwen Financial Corporation and OneWest Bank FSB
Case Number: 3:2021cv06075
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 8/25/2021. Replies due by 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schneider, Timothy) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to #13 Notice withdrawing Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, hearing set for 8/12/2021 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Florentina MAZZONE-URIE re #4 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening), (Mellen, Matthew) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Benjamin Kenney (Kenney, Austin) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 Response re #4 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening), byOcwen Financial Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Schneider, Timothy) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 9, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Financial Corporation, OneWest Bank FSB, as Successor in Interest to Certain Assets and Liabilities of Indymac Bank, FSB, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION OF ALLISON ERGGELET RE EX PARTE NOTICE by Florentina MAZZONE-URIE re #4 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening), (Mellen, Matthew) (Filed on 8/9/2021) Modified on 8/10/2021 (arkS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING #4 MOTION HEARING BEFORE JUDGE EDWARD M. CHEN ON 8/12/2021 AT 1:30PM. HEARING TO BE CONDUCTED BY ZOOM WEBINAR. Motion Hearing re: #4 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order set for 8/12/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. It is ORDERED that the Opposition to the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is to be filed by 8/10/2021. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Opposition due 8/10/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021) Modified on 8/9/2021 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/9/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 EX PARTE APPLICATION against Ocwen Financial Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation, OneWest Bank FSB, as Successor in Interest to Certain Assets and Liabilities of Indymac Bank, FSB ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 0971-16260334.). Filed by Florentina MAZZONE-URIE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Allison Cecchini Erggelet, #3 Declaration Declaration of Florentina Mazzoni-Urie)(Mellen, Matthew) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Florentina MAZZONE-URIE . (Mellen, Matthew) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ocwen Financial Corporation, OneWest Bank FSB, as Successor in Interest to Certain Assets and Liabilities of Indymac Bank, FSB, PHH Mortgage Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16258336.). Filed byFlorentina MAZZONE-URIE. (Attachments: #1 Summons Onewest Bank, #2 Summons Ocwen Financial Corporation, #3 Summons PHH Mortgage, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mellen, Matthew) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 version which can be downloaded from https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Florentina MAZZONE-URIE (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAZZONE-URIE v. OneWest Bank FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florentina MAZZONE-URIE
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank FSB, as Successor in Interest to Certain Assets and Liabilities of Indymac Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Austin Benjamin Kenney
Represented By: Timothy Alan Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Represented By: Austin Benjamin Kenney
Represented By: Timothy Alan Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?