Dakin et al v. Hormel Foods Sales, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Diane Dakin, Deborah Despain and Marilyn Curren
Defendant: Hormel Foods Sales, LLC and Hormel Foods, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv06085
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods Sales, LLC, Hormel Foods, LLC. Filed byDiane Dakin, Marilyn Curren, Deborah Despain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Declaration)(Sumer, Emrah) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order. Signed as modified on 9/30/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #16 Stipulation Setting Motion Schedule for Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 See Order #17 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Complaint due by 9/30/2021. Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2022. Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint due by 10/29/2021. Responses/Opposition due by 11/19/2021. Replies due by 12/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. These proceedings will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://ww w.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2021 )
September 29, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, filed by Marilyn Curren, Diane Dakin, Deborah Despain. (Sumer, Emrah) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hormel Foods Sales, LLC, Hormel Foods, LLC.. (Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Signed 9/27/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Collins. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order. Signed 9/27/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Young.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16429632.) filed by Hormel Foods Sales, LLC, Hormel Foods, LLC. (Collins, Rory) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16429499.) filed by Hormel Foods Sales, LLC, Hormel Foods, LLC. (Young, Tyler) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Diane Dakin, Marilyn Curren, Deborah Despain. Service waived by Hormel Foods, LLC waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Diane Dakin, Marilyn Curren, Deborah Despain. Service waived by Hormel Foods Sales, LLC waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Hormel Foods Sales, LLC and Hormel Foods, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/7/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rita Mansuryan (Mansuryan, Rita) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marilyn Curren, Diane Dakin, Deborah Despain.. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hormel Foods Sales, LLC, Hormel Foods, LLC. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods Sales, LLC, Hormel Foods, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16260038.). Filed byDiane Dakin, Marilyn Curren, Deborah Despain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Green, Robert) (Filed on 8/6/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dakin et al v. Hormel Foods Sales, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Dakin
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Represented By: Emrah M Sumer
Represented By: James Robert Noblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Despain
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Represented By: Emrah M Sumer
Represented By: James Robert Noblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Curren
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Represented By: Emrah M Sumer
Represented By: James Robert Noblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormel Foods Sales, LLC
Represented By: Rita Mansuryan
Represented By: Rory Farrell Collins
Represented By: Tyler Adam Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormel Foods, LLC
Represented By: Rita Mansuryan
Represented By: Rory Farrell Collins
Represented By: Tyler Adam Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?