Moore v. Robinhood Financial LLC
Plaintiff: Cooper Moore
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv06117
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Robinhood Financial LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/30/2021. Replies due by 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gorton, Kelly) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robinhood Financial LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/30/2021. Replies due by 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gorton, Kelly) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Robinhood Financial LLC. (Gorton, Kelly) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Robinhood Financial LLC identifying Corporate Parent Robinhood Markets, Inc. for Robinhood Financial LLC. (Gorton, Kelly) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robinhood Financial LLC identifying Corporate Parent Robinhood Markets, Inc. for Robinhood Financial LLC. (Gorton, Kelly) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16297216.) filed by Robinhood Financial LLC. (Rainwater, Lauren) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16297160.) filed by Robinhood Financial LLC. (Payson, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Michelle Gorton (Gorton, Kelly) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cooper Moore.. (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16296635.) filed by Cooper Moore. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Drake, E.) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order. Signed 8/17/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Jennifer Rust Murray.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16289073.) filed by Cooper Moore. (Murray, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Terrell for Plaintiff Cooper Moore (Terrell, Beth) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cooper Moore. Robinhood Financial LLC served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. Proof of Service (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Robinhood Financial LLC. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2021 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/24/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cooper Moore (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Robinhood Financial LLC (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 0971-16266179.). Filed by Cooper Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 8/9/2021) Modified on 8/11/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Robinhood Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cooper Moore
Represented By: Sophia Marie Rios
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By: Kelly Michelle Gorton
Represented By: Kenneth E. Payson
Represented By: Lauren Burdette Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?