Center for Biological Diversity v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams and Debra Haaland
Case Number: 3:2021cv06323
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Biological Diversity. Debra Haaland served on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021; U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service served on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021; Martha Williams served on 8/26/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Segee, Brian) (Filed on 10/6/2021) Modified on 10/6/2021. Incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. Correct event is "Summons Returned Executed as to USA" [err101] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is n ecessary. Re: #16 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Center for Biological Diversity (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 10:00 am before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2021.All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 9/1/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Biological Diversity.. (Segee, Brian) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Anne Mayhall (Mayhall, Taylor) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #9 Amended Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Margaret Townsend. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Margaret Townsend, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-16290685) (Filing Fee previously paid on 08/17/2021) filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Segee, Brian) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Debra Haaland, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2021 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim denying #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice without prejudice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Margaret Townsend ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16290685.) filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Segee, Brian) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity (Segee, Brian) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Segee, Brian) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Debra Haaland, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16290593.). Filed byCenter for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Segee, Brian) (Filed on 8/17/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Brian P. Segee
Represented By: Margaret E. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Williams
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Haaland
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?