Grammens et al v. Bankers Standard Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Edward Grammens and Joanne Powell
Defendant: Bankers Standard Insurance Company and Madsen Kneppers and Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv06427
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER VACATING HEARINGS. Motion Hearings previously set for 10/6/2021 are vacated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/24/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Order by Judge William H. Orrick terminating #7 Motion to Dismiss, see Dkt. No. 23. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Order by Judge William H. Orrick terminating #8 Motion to Dismiss, see Dkt. No. 23. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OBJECTION to Declaration of Joel P. Gumbiner in support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Certain Causes of Action Pursuant to FCRP 12(B)(6) and Dismiss Entire Action, or in the alternative, Stay Pending Completion of Appraisal (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Causes of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6)) filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Gurries, Alicia) (Filed on 9/15/2021) Modified on 9/16/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Causes of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) ) filed byBankers Standard Insurance Company. (Gurries, Alicia) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Stay Pending Completion of Appraisal ) filed byBankers Standard Insurance Company. (Gurries, Alicia) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECLARATION of Joel P. Gumbiner in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Stay Pending Completion of Appraisal, #7 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Causes of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6), #18 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byEdward Grammens. (Related document(s) #8 , #7 , #18 ) (Williams, Bartlett) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JOINT OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Stay Pending Completion of Appraisal, #7 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Causes of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6)) filed by Edward Grammens. (Williams, Bartlett) (Filed on 9/8/2021) Modified on 9/9/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE - Hearing Reset as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss and #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Stay Pending Completion of Appraisal. Motion Hearing reset for 10/6/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward Grammens re #15 Case Management Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Management Conference Order)(Williams, Bartlett) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/30/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Renotice motion hearing re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Causes of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) filed byBankers Standard Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Gurries, Alicia) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Renotice motion hearing re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Stay Pending Completion of Appraisal filed byBankers Standard Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Gurries, Alicia) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 8/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bankers Standard Insurance Company.. (Gurries, Alicia) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Deadline as to Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Stay Pending Completion of Appraisal filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 9/8/2021. Replies due by 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathleen DeLaney, #2 Proposed Order)(Richman, Dina) (Filed on 8/25/2021) Modified on 8/26/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Causes of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 9/8/2021. Replies due by 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richman, Dina) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Edward Grammens (Williams, Bartlett) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Edward Grammens.. (Williams, Bartlett) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bankers Standard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Richman, Dina) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/23/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file attachme nt 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-15 as separate entry. Using the event >Civil Events> Other Filings> Notices> Certification of Interested Entities>. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV2101830. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 0971-16300870). Filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-15, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Richman, Dina) (Filed on 8/19/2021) Modified on 8/20/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grammens et al v. Bankers Standard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Grammens
Represented By: Bartlett Harrison Williams
Represented By: Joel Philip Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Powell
Represented By: Bartlett Harrison Williams
Represented By: Joel Philip Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Dina Rebecca Richman
Represented By: Alicia Marie Gurries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madsen Kneppers and Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?