DeSoto v. General Electric Company, Viacomcbs Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark DeSoto
Defendant: General Electric Company, Viacomcbs Inc. (fka CBS Corporation, fka Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC (fka Foster Wheeler Corporation), Crane Co., Warren Pumps, LLC, Foster Wheeler LLC, ViacomCBS Inc., General Electric Company, Foster Wheeler Corporation, CBS Corporation, Viacom Inc. and Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv06627
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 31 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff Mark DeSoto by Mark DeSoto. (Chu, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crane Co. identifying Other Affiliate Hartford, Other Affiliate American Home Assurance Company, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Highlands Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transit Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Pacific Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transamerica Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company of North America, Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Prudential Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Centennial Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Continental, Other Affiliate Crane Co., Other Affiliate Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Other Affiliate INA, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual, Other Affiliate The Home Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Century Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies, Other Affiliate Midland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance, Other Affiliate Mission Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Dairyland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Centaur Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Integrity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Globe Indemnity, Other Affiliate Aetna, Other Affiliate New England Reinsurance Corporation, Other Affiliate The Employers Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas, Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The North River Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Firemans Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate AIU Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance of Wausau for Crane Co.. for Defendant Crane Co. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 29 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Crane Co. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint for Asbestos Personal Injury/Products Liability byWarren Pumps, LLC. (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company, Viacomcbs Inc. identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Other Affiliate CBS Corporation (f/k/a Viacom, Inc. as successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation) for General Electric Company, Viacomcbs Inc.. on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company, Viacomcbs Inc. on behalf of Defendant Viaco,CBS, Inc. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. byGeneral Electric Company, Viacomcbs Inc.. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company, Viacomcbs Inc. on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company, Viacomcbs Inc. on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGeneral Electric Company, Viacomcbs Inc.. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 CRANE CO.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCrane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Foster Wheeler LLC re #9 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #10 Notice of Appearance, #11 Certificate of Interested Entities, #8 Answer to Complaint (Park, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler LLC (Park, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Park (Park, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint byFoster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Crane Co., Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Viacomcbs Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mark DeSoto (Donadio, David) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark DeSoto.. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Asbestos Personal Injury/Products Liability; Demand for Jury Trial against General Electric Company Viacomcbs Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Crane Co., Warren Pumps LLC (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 0971-16326789.). Filed by Mark DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Donadio, David) (Filed on 8/26/2021) Modified on 8/30/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeSoto v. General Electric Company, Viacomcbs Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark DeSoto
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company, Viacomcbs Inc. (fka CBS Corporation, fka Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC (fka Foster Wheeler Corporation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?