Zurich American Insurance Company v. Kwan Wo Ironworks Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Kwan Wo Ironworks Inc. and Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2021cv06661
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2021.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/1/2021. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/24/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zurich American Insurance Company.. (Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Zurich American Insurance shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 Refund Status re #10 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 Application for Refund, duplicate complaint filing fee, by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Kwan Wo Ironworks Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2021 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 ERRATA re #1 Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byZurich American Insurance Company. (Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, a Swiss corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, a Swiss corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation for Zurich American Insurance Company. re #1 Complaint (Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Zurich American Insurance Company . (Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #5 *** COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16331907.). Filed byZurich American Insurance Company. (Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/27/2021) Modified on 8/30/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Kwan Wo Ironworks Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Lincoln Victor Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwan Wo Ironworks Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?