United States of America v. Baig et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Naiz Baig, Santa Clara County Department of Tax and Collections, Eugene Sakai Trust, California Franchise Tax Board, Mina Shahkarami and 2011 Mina Shahkarami Revocable Trust Dated September 16, 2011
Case Number: 3:2021cv06692
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to 2011 Mina Shahkarami Revocable Trust Dated September 16, 2011. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Mina Shahkarami. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to California Franchise Tax Board. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Eugene Sakai Trust. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Santa Clara County Department of Tax and Collections. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Naiz Baig. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by United States of America . (Halasz, Ty) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by United States of America . (Halasz, Ty) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2011 Mina Shahkarami Revocable Trust Dated September 16, 2011, Naiz Baig, California Franchise Tax Board, Eugene Sakai Trust, Santa Clara County Department of Tax and Collections, Mina Shahkarami. Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Naiz Baig, #3 Summons to the Sakai Trust, #4 Summons to the Santa Clara Tax Collector, #5 Summons to the FTB, #6 Summons to Mina Shahkarami, #7 Summons to the Shahkarami Trust)(Halasz, Ty) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20) [err101]. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Even t is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #1 Complaint,, filed by United States of America (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20) [err101]. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Even t is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by United States of America (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Baig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ty Halasz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naiz Baig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara County Department of Tax and Collections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Sakai Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mina Shahkarami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2011 Mina Shahkarami Revocable Trust Dated September 16, 2011
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?