National Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. Physicians Reimbursement Fund, Inc.
Plaintiff: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: PHYSICIANS REIMBURSEMENT FUND and Physicians Reimbursement Fund, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv06867
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Physicians Reimbursement Fund, Inc... (Casey, William) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company.. (Orloff, Lance) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Physicians Reimbursement Fund, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sphargis, Inc., a California corporation for Physicians Reimbursement Fund, Inc. (Casey, William) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Physicians Reimbursement Fund, Inc. (Casey, William) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/15/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2021. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company (Orloff, Lance) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Orloff, Lance) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PHYSICIANS REIMBURSEMENT FUND. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Orloff, Lance) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/17/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment, Equitable Contribution, and Indemnity against National Fire & Marine Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16355485.). Filed byNational Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orloff, Lance) (Filed on 9/3/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. Physicians Reimbursement Fund, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Lance David Orloff
Represented By: James M. Baratta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHYSICIANS REIMBURSEMENT FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Reimbursement Fund, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?