Romero v. Covello
Petitioner: Carlos Romero
Respondent: Patrick Covello
Case Number: 3:2021cv07396
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/1/2021. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-01690. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 23, 2021 Copies of #5 Clerk's IFP and #6 Notice of Assignment mailed to petitioner. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 09/22/21, CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California.(Plummer, M)
September 22, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Carlos Romero. (Plummer, M)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Coll, A)
September 17, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Carlos Romero. (Coll, A)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Patrick Covello by Carlos Romero. (Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?