Flournoy v. Walmart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Henry Flournoy, Jr.
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc., Walmart Stores, Pleasanton, Walmart Store Manager and Byron Gadson
Case Number: 3:2021cv07570
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: PSLC LLH
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST for Copies of Complaints filed by James Henry Flournoy, Jr. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2021)
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by James Henry Flournoy, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from James Henry Flournoy, Jr., dated 10/10/2021. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 PRISONER'S APPLICATION AND DECLARATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by James Henry Flournoy, Jr. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 COMPLAINT BY A PRISONER UNDER THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT, 42 u.s.c. 1983 (no process) against Byron Gadson, Walmart Store Manager, Walmart Stores, Inc., Walmart Stores, Pleasanton, (Filing Fee: ifpp entered on 10/15/2021). Filed byJames Henry Flournoy, Jr. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2021: #2 Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2021 Mailed copy of re #5 & #6 Clerk's Notice to Plaintiff. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/5/2021. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Filing of Prisoner's Civil Rights Complaint on Form due by 11/5/2021. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to File Late Complaint filed by James Henry Flournoy, Jr.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Request to Waive Court Fees filed by James Henry Flournoy, Jr.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Letter from James Henry Flournoy, Jr., dated 9/16/2021. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against Walmart Stores, Inc., (Filing Fee: ifpp entered on 9/28/2021). Filed by James Henry Flournoy, Jr.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Summons, #(2) Proposed Civil Subpoena (Duces Tecum), #(3) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flournoy v. Walmart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Henry Flournoy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Pleasanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Store Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Gadson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?