Fairwinds Estate Winery, LLC et al v. Kinsale Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Fairwinds Estate Winery, LLC and Fairwinds Estate, LLC
Defendant: Kinsale Insurance Company, Malloy Imrie & Vasconi Insurance Services, LLC, CRC Insurance Services and CRC Commercial Solutions
Case Number: 3:2021cv07678
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Mailed to Napa Superior Court (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION TO REMAND. This case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of California, County of Napa. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/23/2021. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Remand Notice Of Motion And Motion To Remand And For Attorneys Fees Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1447(C); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities ) Reply In Support Of Motion To Remand And For Attorneys Fees Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1447(C) filed byFairwinds Estate Winery, LLC, Fairwinds Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Anthony B. Leuin In Support Of Fairwinds Reply On Its Motion To Remand And For Attorneys Fees Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1447(C), #2 Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Fairwinds Reply On Its Motion To Remand And For Attorneys Fees Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1447(C))(Rahmil, Roey) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Remand Notice Of Motion And Motion To Remand And For Attorneys Fees Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1447(C); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities ) filed byKinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason J. Chorley)(Chorley, Jason) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY PROCEEDINGS re (13 in 3:21-cv-05968-WHO) (23 in 3:21-cv-05968-WHO) Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2021. Case Management Conference reset for 12/1/2021 02:00 PM and Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2021 02:00 PM, both by Videoconference before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/25/2021. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Notice Of Motion And Motion To Remand And For Attorneys Fees Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1447(C); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed by Fairwinds Estate Winery, LLC, Fairwinds Estate, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/4/2021. Replies due by 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Anthony B. Leuin In Support Of Motion To Remand And For Attorneys Fees Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1447(C), #2 Declaration Declaration Of Anthony W. Zabit In Support Of Motion To Remand And For Attorneys Fees Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1447(C), #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion To Remand And For Attorneys Fees Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1447(C))(Rahmil, Roey) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/13/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RELATING CASE to Case No. 3:21cv5968-WHO. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/7/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byKinsale Insurance Company. (Chorley, Jason) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kinsale Insurance Company re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Notice of Removal, (Chorley, Jason) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/14/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Napa. Their case number is 21CV001288. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16449922). Filed byKinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason J. Chorley, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chorley, Jason) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kinsale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Kinsale Capital Group, Inc. for Kinsale Insurance Company. (Chorley, Jason) (Filed on 9/30/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairwinds Estate Winery, LLC et al v. Kinsale Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairwinds Estate Winery, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Brent Leuin
Represented By: Roey Rahmil
Represented By: Felicia Ann Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairwinds Estate, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Brent Leuin
Represented By: Roey Rahmil
Represented By: Felicia Ann Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinsale Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason J Chorley
Represented By: Michael Alan Topp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malloy Imrie & Vasconi Insurance Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRC Insurance Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRC Commercial Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?