Hall-Johnson v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Carneice Hall-Johnson and Carneice Kathrine Hall-Johnson
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco and Chinatown Community Development Center, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv07770
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Defendants Chinatown Community Development Center, Inc., City and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 USM Form 285)(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order service packet delivered to the U.S. Marshals Service mail box in the clerk's office. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/15/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM WEBINAR: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 02:30 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12/27/21 at 2 pm Pacific.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.u scourts.gov/si General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2021. Initi al Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 02:30 PM - Videoconference Only. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Carneice Kathrine Hall-Johnson. Service waived by City and County of San Francisco waiver sent on 10/4/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Hall-Johnson, Carneice) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
October 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting - Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures. (Hall-Johnson, Carneice) (Filed on 10/17/2021)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT GUIDELINE AND CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/082021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/07/2021. (bxsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2022 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Carneice Hall-Johnson. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Carneice Hall-Johnson. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carneice Hall-Johnson. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 INITIAL COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTION (no process) against Chinatown Community Development Center, Inc., City and County of San Francisco (Filing Fee: ifpp entered 10/4/2021). Filed by Carneice Hall-Johnson. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall-Johnson v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carneice Hall-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carneice Kathrine Hall-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chinatown Community Development Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?