Detwiler v. Entelo, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Detwiler
Defendant: Entelo, Inc. and Jon Bischke
Case Number: 3:2021cv07919
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting #14 Stipulation. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Jon Bischke, Entelo, Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McCormack, Bryan) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 12/28/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/25/2021. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jon Bischke, Entelo, Inc... (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zachary Detwiler.. (McCormack, Bryan) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zachary Detwiler (McCormack, Bryan) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/30/20 21. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2022 11:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jon Bischke, Entelo, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities,,,,,,,, Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler's Standing Orders; Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California | Contents of Joint Case Management Statement; and ECF Registration Information (Kim, Heidi) (Filed on 10/11/2021)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Entelo, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Shasta Ventures, Other Affiliate Battery Ventures IX, L.P., Other Affiliate Partners for Growth, Other Affiliate Escalate Capital Partners, Other Affiliate US Venture Partners, Battery Ventures, Other Affiliate Escalate, Other Affiliate 3TS Capital Partners/TCEE, Other Affiliate 23 Associates, Other Affiliate Adam Joseph Greenbaum Miller, Other Affiliate Allen Fogel, Other Affiliate Andrew C. Paradise, Other Affiliate Battery Investment Partners IX, LLC, Other Affiliate Birchaven Group, LLC, Other Affiliate BridgeBank, Other Affiliate Canary Enterprises LLC, Other Affiliate Correlation Ventures II, L.P., Other Affiliate David Jeffrey Kurtz, Other Affiliate Duro Ventures, LP A3, Other Affiliate Edward Harvey, Other Affiliate Emerald Stage2, Other Affiliate En Fund I, a Series of Chaos Ventures Syndicate, LP, Other Affiliate En Fund I, a Series of DV Deals, LP, Other Affiliate Enterprise Innovation Fund Coperatief U.A., Other Affiliate Escalate Capital Partners SBIC III, LP, Other Affiliate Gabriel Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate HCP-FVI, LLC, Other Affiliate Howard M. Hecht, Other Affiliate Ivana Cvejic, Other Affiliate John L. Steffens, Other Affiliate Jonathan Bischke, Other Affiliate Josh Kalish, Other Affiliate Kevin Kleinschmidt, Other Affiliate Partners for Growth V, L.P., Other Affiliate Partners for Growth VI, L.P., Other Affiliate Philip Harrison-Beauregard, Other Affiliate Reitler Advisory Group LLC, Other Affiliate RL Venture Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Ross Freeman, Other Affiliate Shasta Ventures IV, L.P., Other Affiliate StarVest Partners II (Advisors), L.P., Other Affiliate StarVest Partners II (Parallel), L.P., Other Affiliate StarVest Partners II, L.P., Other Affiliate TCEE FUND III SICAR, Other Affiliate U.S. Venture Partners XI, L.P., Other Affiliate City National Bank, Other Affiliate Silicon Valley Bank for Entelo, Inc.. (Kim, Heidi) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/22/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Entelo, Inc. (Kim, Heidi) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1441, and 1446 from California Superior Court, County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-21-592811. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16479399). Filed byJon Bischke, Entelo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 copy of Complaint attached - Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 10/8/2021) Modified on 10/8/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Detwiler v. Entelo, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Detwiler
Represented By: Bryan J. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entelo, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Michael McInerney
Represented By: Heidi Gina Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Bischke
Represented By: Thomas Michael McInerney
Represented By: Heidi Gina Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?