Swanson v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Naomi Swanson
Defendant: Monsanto Company and DOES 1-50
Case Number: 3:2021cv08047
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-01799. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-290 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Case transferred to Northern District of California for inclusion MDL No. 2741. (bgt)
October 4, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (bgt)
September 10, 2021 Submission of #6 Order, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (ceo)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Naomi Swanson. Monsanto Company served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Fitzpatrick, Nathan)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff Naomi Swanson filed the Complaint in this action on April 30, 2021. #1 . As of today, Plaintiff has not filed proof of service of process upon Defendants, and there is no evidence in the record that demonstrates Plaintiff has properly served Defendants. Accordingly, within ten (10) days from the date of entry of this order, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file a notice either showing that service has in fact been properly made or providing why Plaintiff has been unable to serve Defendants. The Court warns Plaintiff that her failure to file such a notice will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this case after expiration of the ten (10)-day period. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 08/27/21. (ceo)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (jpk)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Edward Fitzpatrick on behalf of Naomi Swanson (jpk)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (jpk)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Naomi Swanson. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10940822) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Swanson
Represented By: Nathan Edward Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?