The Cherokee Nation v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Cherokee Nation
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv08061
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Eastern District of Oklahoma, Case No. 6:21cv00200RAW. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 14, 2021 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:21-cv-00200. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 5, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2996) transferring case to the Northern District of California (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Stay ) by McKinsey and Company, Inc. ;(Evans, Kyle)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White denying #21 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Motion to Remand by McKinsey and Company, Inc. Responses due by 8/23/2021(Evans, Kyle)
August 5, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by The Cherokee Nation ; (With attachments)(Burrage, Michael)
July 29, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Stay ) by The Cherokee Nation ; (With attachments)(Burrage, Michael)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #13 Defendant's Corrected Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. (tls, Deputy Clerk) (tls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 8/2/2021; NEF regenerated (tls, Deputy Clerk).
July 26, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by McKinsey and Company, Inc. ; (With attachments)(Evans, Kyle)
July 23, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Corrected ) by The Cherokee Nation ;(Sullivan, Frank)
July 20, 2021 Filing 15 Supplement to #8 MOTION to Stay by McKinsey and Company, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/27/2021 to term motion and add link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White directing EXPEDITED Response to be filed to #13 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by 7/23/2021. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2021 Filing 13 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by McKinsey and Company, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 7/30/2021(Curran, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by McKinsey and Company, Inc. Responses due by 7/30/2021(Curran, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 21-200-RAW. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert G. McCampbell on behalf of McKinsey and Company, Inc. (McCampbell, Robert)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 21-200-JWD. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay by McKinsey and Company, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 7/29/2021(Curran, Jeffrey)
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey A. Curran on behalf of McKinsey and Company, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by The Cherokee Nation (With attachments) Responses due by 7/26/2021(Sullivan, Frank)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randa Reeves on behalf of The Cherokee Nation (Reeves, Randa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of The Cherokee Nation (Burrage, Michael)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/13/2021) (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Sequoyah County District Court, case number 21-CJ-76 by McKinsey and Company, Inc. (With attachments) (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by McKinsey and Company, Inc. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2021 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/6/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1525700 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by McKinsey and Company, Inc. (Evans, Kyle)
June 2, 2021 PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against McKinsey and Company, Inc. by The Cherokee Nation (tjm, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Cherokee Nation v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cherokee Nation
Represented By: Frank Sullivan, III
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Randa Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?