Velasquez v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Velasquez
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 3:2021cv08289
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 34 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rodolfo Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 7, 2021 Filing 33 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Velasquez shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 12/21/2021. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Copy placed in O:Drive on 12-7-2021
November 18, 2021 Filing 32 Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to defendant Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Related documents(s) #25 )(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 17, 2021 Filing 31 DEFENDANT'S Answer to Complaint by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Scott, William) (Filed on 11/17/2021) Modified on 11/18/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/18/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing re #29 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Scott, William) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 29 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.. (Scott, William) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 12/1/2021. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Copy placed in O:Drive on 11/17/2021
November 17, 2021 Filing 26 Declaration in Support of #25 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Rodolfo Velasquez. (Related document(s) #25 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 16, 2021 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rodolfo Velasquez re #25 MOTION for Entry of Default, #26 Declaration in Support (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 16, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Entry of Default against defendant Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing filed by Rodolfo Velasquez. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
October 25, 2021 Filing 24 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 25, 2021 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-01392. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Granting Motion to Transfer #10 . Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of California*.*450 Golden Gate Avenue, 16th Floor**San Francisco, CA 94102-3434*. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 10/22/2021. (Attachment: #1 Transfer Order) (jms).
July 20, 2021 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Todd W. Robinson: Motion Hearing held on 7/20/2021 re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sections 1391 and 1406 filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. The motion is taken under submission; written order to follow. (Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Rodolfo Velasquez, Pro Se - not present). (Defendant Attorney W. Jason Scott). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jao)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Defendant's Ex Parte Application for Telephonic Appearance. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 7/19/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa) (dlg).
July 15, 2021 Filing 19 Ex Parte Application for Telephonic Appearance by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sections 1391 and 1406 (Scott, William)(jrm). Modified on 7/16/2021 to correct event per chambers (sxa).
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #10 Continuing Hearing. Motion Hearing reset for 7/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Todd W. Robinson. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 6/9/21.(sxa) (dlg).
June 8, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY - Other re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sections 1391 and 1406 filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Scott, William) (jrm).
March 22, 2021 Filing 16 Plaintiff Rodolfo Velasquezs Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss orTransfer re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sections 1391 and 1406 filed by Rodolfo Velasquez. Nunc Pro Tunc 3/19/21. (sxa)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Todd W. Robinson Accepting Document: Plaintiff Rodolfo Velasquezs Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, from Plaintiff Rodolfo Velasquez. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: L.R. Civ. 5.1(b): Case number does not appear in the lower right corner of each page. Case number in caption of Response is incorrect. L.R. Civ. 5.1(e): Exhibits are not paged in consecutive numerical order and each page does not show the exhibit number either immediately above or below the page number. L.R. Civ. 7.1(f)(3)(a): Document opposing defendants motion does not contain a brief and complete statement of all reasons in opposition to the position taken by the movement. L.R. Civ. 7.1(f)(3)(b): Document does not contain a memorandum of points and authorities that is clearly labelled as such.. Nunc Pro Tunc 3/19/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa)
March 12, 2021 Filing 14 Request for Entry of Clerk Default by Rodolfo Velasquez. Nunc Pro Tunc 3/9/21. (sxa)(Default not issued due to Dispositive Motion filed on 3/5/2021)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Todd W. Robinson Rejecting Document: Request for Entry of Default and Motion for Default Judgment, from Plaintiff Rodolfo Velasquez. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 - Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation; OTHER: Motion is premature, Dispositive Motion filed on 3/5/2021; Request for Entry of Default is accepted; Motion for Default Judgment is Stricken. (Attachments: #1 REJECTED DOCUMENT)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa)
March 10, 2021 Filing 12 ****DOCKETED IN ERROR Modified on 3/12/2021 to remove image (sxa).
March 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jason Scott on behalf of Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Scott, William)Attorney William Jason Scott added to party Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing(pty:dft) (sxa).
March 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sections 1391 and 1406 by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Rambarran, Ian) QC mail sent on 3/7/2021 re proposed order (sxa).
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying #8 Motion for Case Management Conference or Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 2/22/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Case Management or Settlement Conference by Rodolfo Velasquez. Nunc Pro Tunc 2/8/2021. (sxa)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Todd W. Robinson Accepting Document: Request for Case Management or Settlement Conference, from Plaintiff Rodolfo Velasquez. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 - Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation;. Nunc Pro Tunc 2/8/21.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Todd W. Robinson Rejecting re #5 Notice of Related Case, from Defendant Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(a),(g): Docket entry does not accurately reflect the document filed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2020: #1 Striken Document, #2 Striken Document Ex A, #3 Striken Document Ex B, #4 Striken Document Ex C) (sxa).
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing of case(s) 3:14-CV-00473-CAB-NLS . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rambarran, Ian) Modified on 10/13/2020 to Strike Document per ECF #6 (sxa).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Todd W. Robinson for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv1392-TWR-MDD. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/25/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing served. (dlg)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jmr) (jms).
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS122929.), filed by Rodolfo Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1392-GPC-MDD. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Ian A Rambarran
Represented By: William Jason Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?