Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC v. Pandora Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC
Defendant: Pandora Media, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv08294
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/15/2021 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Pandora Media, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Benzler, Jessica) (Filed on 12/16/2021) Modified on 12/20/2021 (sfb, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2021 Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 12/15/2021. Parties to submit a joint stipulation regarding a proposed case schedule, including the dates listed in the joint case management statement, which are in compliance with Judge Chhabrias Standing Order. Parties to also stipulate to a briefing schedule regarding Defendants forthcoming motion. Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Jury Trial set for 4/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 1:51 - 2:01. Plaintiff Attorney: Brian Carpenter, Brian Boerman. Defendant Attorney: Bryan Kohm, Jessica Benzler. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2021) Modified on 12/17/2021: Matter transcribed by Marla Knox. (rjd, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2021 Filing 85 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kohm, Bryan) (Filed on 12/14/2021)
December 8, 2021 Filing 84 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Pandora Media, LLC. (Kohm, Bryan) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
November 22, 2021 Filing 83 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/8/2021, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 01:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, December 10th, 2021, by no later than 10:00AM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 18, 2021 Filing 82 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Carpenter, Brian) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 18, 2021 Filing 81 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 5, 2021 Filing 80 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael John Sacksteder (Sacksteder, Michael) (Filed on 11/5/2021)
November 1, 2021 Filing 79 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2021 at 01:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances:< /b< Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, December 3rd, 2021, by no later than 10:00AM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. p< (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/01/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 77 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 76 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 75 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC.. (Carpenter, Brian) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 25, 2021 Filing 74 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by November 8, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021)
October 25, 2021 Filing 73 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:20-cv-00731. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir)
October 21, 2021 Case Stayed. (ir)
October 21, 2021 Case transferred to NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. (ir)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #71 Motion to Stay entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is the Parties Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines the Motion). Having considered the same, the Court finds that the Motion should and hereby is GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED that all deadlines in the above-styled case are hereby STAYED, pending entry of a scheduling order by the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JGlc)
October 15, 2021 Filing 71 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boerman, Brian)
October 13, 2021 Filing 70 FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Petitioner Pandora Media, LLC. The district courts order #60 denying Pandoras motion to transfer is vacated, and the district court is directed to grant the transfer motion. (lad)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #63 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Upon consideration of the Unopposed Motion to Withdraw of Tara K. Hawkes as counsel of record for Plaintiff Bluebonnet Internet Media Services LLC, and being fully advised in the premises and good cause appearing,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Tara K. Hawkes is hereby terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff Bluebonnet Internet Media Services LLC, and the Clerk is directed to remove Ms. Hawkes from ECF notifications for this case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JGlc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 67 Joint MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boerman, Brian)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SERVE FINALINFRINGEMENT AND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir)
August 12, 2021 Filing 65 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct #52 Scheduling Order, to Amend Deadline Serve Final Infringement and Invalidity Contentions by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carpenter, Brian)
August 9, 2021 Filing 64 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 7/23/21, Proceedings Transcribed: Claim Construction Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR, Telephone number: (903) 720-6009 (shellyholmes@hotmail.com). Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 8/30/2021, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2021, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2021, (kd)
August 4, 2021 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Tara K. Hawkes by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hawkes, Tara)
July 23, 2021 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Markman Hearing held on 7/23/2021. Case called for Markman Hearing. The Court heard arguments regarding contested claim terms. The Court made determination on terms and an Order will issue with the approved claim terms. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes). (bot2)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ***VACATED by #70 *** ORDER DENYING #31 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) Modified on 10/13/2021 (lad).
July 16, 2021 Filing 59 Redacted Copy Defendant Pandora Media, LLC's Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) of #57 Sealed Document,, by Pandora Media, LLC. (Kohm, Bryan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 58 ATTACHMENT Non-Confidential Reply Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm and Non-Confidential Exhibits to #31 MOTION to Transfer Case , #57 Sealed Document,, by Pandora Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 42, #2 Exhibit 43, #3 Exhibit 44, #4 Exhibit 46, #5 Exhibit 47, #6 Exhibit 48, #7 Exhibit 49)(Kohm, Bryan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 57 Sealed Document: Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California of #31 MOTION to Transfer Case by Pandora Media, LLC (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm - CONFIDENTIAL, #2 Exhibit 35 - CONFIDENTIAL, #3 Exhibit 36 - CONFIDENTIAL, #4 Exhibit 37 - CONFIDENTIAL, #5 Exhibit 38 - CONFIDENTIAL, #6 Exhibit 39 - CONFIDENTIAL, #7 Exhibit 40 - CONFIDENTIAL, #8 Exhibit 41 - CONFIDENTIAL, #9 Exhibit 45 - CONFIDENTIAL) (Kohm, Bryan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 56 Redacted Copy Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue of #54 Sealed Document, #55 Attachment,, by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian)
July 2, 2021 Filing 55 ATTACHMENT Non-Confidential Exhibits to Bluebonnet's Response to #31 MOTION to Transfer Case , #54 Sealed Document, by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A, #2 Exhibit EX J, #3 Exhibit EX K, #4 Exhibit EX L, #5 Exhibit EX M, #6 Exhibit EX N, #7 Exhibit EX O, #8 Exhibit EX P, #9 Exhibit EX Q, #10 Exhibit EX R, #11 Exhibit EX S, #12 Exhibit EX T, #13 Exhibit EX U, #14 Exhibit EX V, #15 Exhibit EX W, #16 Exhibit EX X, #17 Exhibit EX Y, #18 Exhibit EX Z1, #19 Exhibit EX Z2, #20 Sealed Document EX AA, #21 Exhibit EX BB, #22 Exhibit EX CC, #23 Exhibit EX DD, #24 Exhibit EX EE)(Carpenter, Brian)
July 2, 2021 Filing 54 Sealed Document: Response of #31 MOTION to Transfer Case by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX B - CONFIDENTIAL, #2 Exhibit EX C - CONFIDENTIAL, #3 Exhibit EX D - CONFIDENTIAL, #4 Exhibit EX E - CONFIDENTIAL, #5 Exhibit EX F - CONFIDENTIAL, #6 Exhibit EX G - CONFIDENTIAL, #7 Exhibit EX H - CONFIDENTIAL, #8 Exhibit EX I - CONFIDENTIAL, #9 Exhibit EX FF - CONFIDENTIAL) (Carpenter, Brian)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2021. Markman Hearing set for 7/23/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Amended Pleadings due by 9/23/2021. Dispositive motion deadline and Daubert Motion due by 2/4/2022. Jury Selection set for 4/4/2022 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Jury Trial set for 4/4/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir)
June 4, 2021 Filing 51 Proposed Scheduling Order by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Scott, George)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. DISCOVERY HEARING scheduled for Thursday, June 3, 2021 at 1:30 PM is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. Discovery Hearing reset via zoom for 6/3/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RESETTING MARKMAN HEARING. Markman Hearing reset via zoom for 7/23/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
May 27, 2021 Filing 47 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct #33 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian) Modified on 10/4/2021 (ir).
May 19, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing Joint Claim Construction Statement by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC (Carpenter, Brian)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian S. Boerman for Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ab4)
May 18, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian S. Boerman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14819840) by on behalf of Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Boerman, Brian)
May 17, 2021 Filing 44 BRIEF regarding #43 Brief, by Pandora Media, LLC. (Kohm, Bryan)
May 3, 2021 Filing 43 BRIEF regarding #41 Brief, #39 Brief,,,,,, by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Carpenter, Brian)
April 22, 2021 Filing 42 STATUS REPORT Regarding Pending Motion for Inter-District Transfer by Pandora Media, LLC. (Kohm, Bryan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 41 BRIEF by Pandora Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm in Support of Responsive Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Declaration of Stephen Travis Pope, #14 Attachment A, #15 Attachment B, #16 Attachment C)(Kohm, Bryan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 40 STIPULATION Dismissal of Claims for Infringement of US Patent No. 10,318,647 with Prejudice by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian)
April 12, 2021 Filing 39 BRIEF by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D part 1, #5 Exhibit D part 2, #6 Exhibit D part 3, #7 Exhibit D part 4, #8 Exhibit D part 5, #9 Exhibit D part 6, #10 Exhibit D part 7, #11 Exhibit D part 8, #12 Exhibit D part 9, #13 Exhibit D part 10, #14 Exhibit D part 11, #15 Exhibit D part 12, #16 Exhibit D part 13, #17 Exhibit D part 14, #18 Exhibit D part 15, #19 Exhibit D part 16, #20 Exhibit D part 17, #21 Exhibit D part 18, #22 Exhibit D part 19, #23 Exhibit D part 20, #24 Exhibit D part 21, #25 Exhibit D part 22, #26 Exhibit D part 23, #27 Exhibit D part 24, #28 Exhibit D part 25, #29 Exhibit E, #30 Exhibit F, #31 Exhibit G, #32 Exhibit H, #33 Exhibit I, #34 Exhibit J, #35 Exhibit K part 1, #36 Exhibit K part 2, #37 Exhibit L, #38 Exhibit M part 1, #39 Exhibit M part 2, #40 Exhibit N part 1, #41 Exhibit N part 2, #42 Exhibit N part 3, #43 Exhibit O, #44 Exhibit P, #45 Exhibit Q, #46 Exhibit R part 1, #47 Exhibit R part 2, #48 Exhibit R part 3, #49 Exhibit R part 4, #50 Exhibit R part 5, #51 Exhibit S, #52 Exhibit T part 1, #53 Exhibit T part 2, #54 Exhibit T part 3, #55 Exhibit U, #56 Exhibit V, #57 Exhibit W, #58 Exhibit X, #59 Exhibit Y, #60 Exhibit Z, #61 Exhibit AA part 1, #62 Exhibit AA part 2, #63 Exhibit BB, #64 Exhibit CC, #65 Exhibit DD, #66 Exhibit EE, #67 Exhibit FF)(Carpenter, Brian)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jessica L. Benzler for Pandora Media, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #36 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Pandoras Agreed Motion for Leave to Brief Additional Claim Construction Disputes and for Enlargement of Page Limits. The Court DENIES the Motion. The Court notes that Bluebonnet filed its Opening Brief briefing the additional terms with extra pages without the Court's permission. As such, the Court STRIKES Bluebonnet's Opening Brief (ECF No. 37) and ORDERS Bluebonnet to refile an Opening Brief that complies with the Court's term and page limits by April 12, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
April 1, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael J Sacksteder (for Jessica L. Benzler) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14656553) by on behalf of Pandora Media, LLC. (Sacksteder, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Filing 37 BRIEF by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D part 1, #5 Exhibit D part 2, #6 Exhibit D part 3, #7 Exhibit D part 4, #8 Exhibit D part 5, #9 Exhibit D part 6, #10 Exhibit D part 7, #11 Exhibit D part 8, #12 Exhibit D part 9, #13 Exhibit D part 10, #14 Exhibit D part 11, #15 Exhibit D part 12, #16 Exhibit D part 13, #17 Exhibit D part 14, #18 Exhibit D part 15, #19 Exhibit D part 16, #20 Exhibit D part 17, #21 Exhibit D part 18, #22 Exhibit D part 19, #23 Exhibit D part 20, #24 Exhibit D part 21, #25 Exhibit D part 22, #26 Exhibit D part 23, #27 Exhibit D part 24, #28 Exhibit D part 25, #29 Exhibit E, #30 Exhibit F, #31 Exhibit G, #32 Exhibit H, #33 Exhibit I, #34 Exhibit J, #35 Exhibit K part 1, #36 Exhibit K part 2, #37 Exhibit L, #38 Exhibit M part 1, #39 Exhibit M part 2, #40 Exhibit N part 1, #41 Exhibit N part 2, #42 Exhibit N part 3, #43 Exhibit O, #44 Exhibit P, #45 Exhibit Q, #46 Exhibit R part 1, #47 Exhibit R part 2, #48 Exhibit R part 3, #49 Exhibit R part 4, #50 Exhibit R part 5, #51 Exhibit S, #52 Exhibit T part 1, #53 Exhibit T part 2, #54 Exhibit T part 3, #55 Exhibit U, #56 Exhibit V, #57 Exhibit W, #58 Exhibit X, #59 Exhibit Y, #60 Exhibit Z, #61 Exhibit AA part 1, #62 Exhibit AA part 2, #63 Exhibit BB, #64 Exhibit CC, #65 Exhibit DD, #66 Exhibit EE, #67 Exhibit FF)(Carpenter, Brian)
March 22, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File [Pandoras Agreed Motion for Leave to Brief Additional Claim Construction Disputes and for Enlargement of Page Limits] by Pandora Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
March 2, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Compliance by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC (Carpenter, Brian)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 6/3/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 9/23/2021. Motions due by 2/4/2022. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 4/4/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
December 10, 2020 Filing 32 Proposed Scheduling Order by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian)
December 7, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Transfer Case by Pandora Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brett Uyeshiro, #2 Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm, #3 Exhibit 1 to Kohm Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Kohm Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Kohm Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Kohm Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Kohm Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Kohm Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Kohm Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Kohm Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Kohm Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to Kohm Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 to Kohm Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 to Kohm Declaration, #15 Exhibit 13 to Kohm Declaration, #16 Exhibit 14 to Kohm Declaration, #17 Exhibit 15 to Kohm Declaration, #18 Exhibit 16 to Kohm Declaration, #19 Exhibit 17 to Kohm Declaration, #20 Exhibit 18 to Kohm Declaration, #21 Exhibit 19 to Kohm Declaration, #22 Exhibit 20 to Kohm Declaration, #23 Exhibit 21 to Kohm Declaration, #24 Exhibit 22 to Kohm Declaration, #25 Exhibit 23 to Kohm Declaration, #26 Exhibit 24 to Kohm Declaration, #27 Exhibit 25 to Kohm Declaration, #28 Exhibit 26 to Kohm Declaration, #29 Exhibit 27 to Kohm Declaration, #30 Exhibit 28 to Kohm Declaration, #31 Exhibit 29 to Kohm Declaration, #32 Exhibit 30 to Kohm Declaration, #33 Exhibit 31 to Kohm Declaration, #34 Exhibit 32 to Kohm Declaration, #35 Exhibit 33 to Kohm Declaration, #36 Exhibit 34 to Kohm Declaration, #37 Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
December 7, 2020 Filing 30 Proposed Scheduling Order by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER, Jury Selection and Trial set for 4/4/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Setting Markman Hearing for 5/4/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
November 23, 2020 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Telephone Conference held on 11/23/2020. Case called for telephonic scheduling conference. Plaintiff says that the defendant may file a motion to transfer the Court told him that they can have whatever discovery they need in order to file a response to the motion to transfer. Defendant requests that the Markman Hearing be moved as he has a jury trial set in the EDTX before Judge Gilstrap. The Court is happy to move the Markman Hearing date -- the Court told parties to send the law clerk dates that they are available and the Markman will be moved. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(am)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peiyao Zhang for Pandora Media, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 11/23/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
November 17, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Compliance by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC (Carpenter, Brian)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan T. McMichael for Pandora Media, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bryan A. Kohm for Pandora Media, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
November 16, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael J Sacksteder (for Peiyao Zhang) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14186007) by on behalf of Pandora Media, LLC. (Sacksteder, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael J Sacksteder (for Jonathan T. McMichael) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14185992) by on behalf of Pandora Media, LLC. (Sacksteder, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael J Sacksteder (for Bryan A. Kohm) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14185915) by on behalf of Pandora Media, LLC. (Sacksteder, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE, Telephone Conference set for 11/23/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
November 5, 2020 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian)
November 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George T. Scott on behalf of Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. Attorney George T. Scott added to party Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC(pty:pla) (Scott, George)
November 4, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Walter J. Scott, Jr on behalf of Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. Attorney Walter J. Scott, Jr added to party Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC(pty:pla) (Scott, Walter)
October 21, 2020 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Bryan A. Kohm. (lad) (Main Document 17 replaced on 10/23/2020) (lad).
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pandora Media, LLC. (Sacksteder, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Pandora Media, LLC.(Sacksteder, Michael)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is an agreed motion, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 20, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
October 2, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Pandora Media, LLC answer due 10/20/2020. (am)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Pandora Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness in Patent Cases
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is agreed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 5, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pandora Media, LLC answer due 10/5/2020. (mc5)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, (Agreed Motion for An Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint) by Pandora Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael)
August 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian A. Carpenter for Tara K. Hawkes ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13909551) by on behalf of Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian A. Carpenter for Robert R. Brunelli ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13909525) by on behalf of Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian A. Carpenter for Paul Sung Cha ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13909193) by on behalf of Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. Pandora Media, LLC served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Carpenter, Brian)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Pandora Media, LLC. (am)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Carpenter, Brian)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective December 9, 2019, attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO-120 and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (am)
August 13, 2020 Remark: Doc. #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Doc. #2 was not flattened. Please notice that all documents are required to be flattened upon filing. The U.S. Clerk's Office will flatten any document needed prior, but all parties MUST flatten documents going forward. Contact the Clerk's Office for any questions. (am)
August 13, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/13/2020) (am).
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13857400), filed by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #10 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #11 Exhibit 9 Part 1, #12 Exhibit 9 Part 2, #13 Exhibit 10 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 10 Part 2, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34 Part 1, #39 Exhibit 34 Part 2, #40 Exhibit 34 Part 3, #41 Exhibit 34 Part 4, #42 Exhibit 34 Part 5, #43 Exhibit 34 Part 6, #44 Exhibit 35 Part 1, #45 Exhibit 35 Part 2, #46 Exhibit 35 Part 3, #47 Exhibit 35 Part 4, #48 Exhibit 35.1, #49 Exhibit 35.2, #50 Exhibit 35.3, #51 Exhibit 35.4, #52 Exhibit 35.5, #53 Exhibit 35.6, #54 Exhibit 36 Part 1, #55 Exhibit 36 Part 2, #56 Exhibit 36 Part 3, #57 Exhibit 36 Part 4, #58 Exhibit 36 Part 5, #59 Exhibit 36 Part 6, #60 Exhibit 37 Part 1, #61 Exhibit 37 Part 2, #62 Exhibit 38 Part 1, #63 Exhibit 38 Part 2, #64 Exhibit 38 Part 3, #65 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carpenter, Brian) (Attachment 65 replaced on 8/13/2020) (am).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures)(mc5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC v. Pandora Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC
Represented By: Brian S. Boerman
Represented By: George T. Scott
Represented By: Paul Sung Cha
Represented By: Robert R. Brunelli
Represented By: Tara K. Hawkes
Represented By: Walter J. Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Brian A. Carpenter
Represented By: Brian Andrew Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pandora Media, LLC
Represented By: Jessica L. Benzler
Represented By: Jonathan T. McMichael
Represented By: Michael J Sacksteder
Represented By: Peiyao Zhang
Represented By: Bryan A. Kohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?