HD Silicon Solutions LLC v. Microchip Technology Inc.
Plaintiff: HD Silicon Solutions LLC
Defendant: Microchip Technology Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv08295
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING HEARING BY ZOOM: The Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2022 will now be held at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk < p
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Entities by HD Silicon Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hongdun Group Inc. for HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Shih, Daniel) (Filed on 12/15/2021)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel J. Shih. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16681624.) filed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Shih, Daniel) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to P. Ryan Burningham. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $317, receipt number ACANDC-16673485.) filed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Burningham, Paul Ryan) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by HD Silicon Solutions LLC.. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Microchip Technology Inc... (Walsh, Rachel) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/12/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2021. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2021) Modified on 10/27/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:20-cv-01092. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 10/27/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #18 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burningham, P.)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burningham, P.)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Joint Claim Construction Brief or Statement by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Burningham, P.)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Filing of Petition for Inter Partes Review by HD Silicon Solutions LLC (Burningham, P.)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #42 Claim Construction Brief, by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P. Ryan Burningham, #2 Exhibit 1)(Burningham, P.)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Reply Claim Construction Brief by Microchip Technology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Walsh Declaration, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 22, #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 24, #10 Exhibit 25)(Banner, Brian)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STATUS REPORT Regarding Motion to Transfer Venue by Microchip Technology Inc.. (Banner, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Opening Claim Construction Brief by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel J. Shih, #2 Exhibit A)(Shih, Daniel)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Opening Claim Construction Brief by Microchip Technology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rachel M. Walsh, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16)(Banner, Brian)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing of Petition for Inter Partes Review by HD Silicon Solutions LLC (Burningham, P.)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Redacted version of #35 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Microchip Technology Inc., re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Defendant Microchip Technology Inc. (Public Version) (Adams, Darryl) Modified on 7/23/2021 (lad).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Sealed Document: Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion to Transfer of #29 Sealed Document, by Microchip Technology Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Walsh Declaration, #2 Exhibit 20, #3 Exhibit 21, #4 Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit 23, #6 Exhibit 24, #7 Exhibit 25) (Banner, Brian)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Proposed Scheduling Order Amended Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Burningham, P.)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Filing of Petitions for Inter Partes Review by HD Silicon Solutions LLC (Tribble, Max)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC, re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Defendant Microchip Technology Inc. (Public Version) (Burningham, P.)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by HD Silicon Solutions LLC re #29 Sealed Document, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burningham, P.)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Public attachments to #29 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC, re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Defendant Microchip Technology Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of P. Ryan Burningham, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 (filed under seal), #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5 (filed under seal), #8 Exhibit 6 (filed under seal), #9 Exhibit 7 (filed under seal), #10 Exhibit 8 (filed under seal), #11 Exhibit 9 (filed under seal), #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11 (filed under seal), #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17)(Burningham, P.) Modified on 7/7/2021 (lad).
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Sealed Document: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue of #18 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Northern District of California by HD Silicon Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 11) (Burningham, P.)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Jesse Cheng ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14846335) by on behalf of Microchip Technology Inc.. (Banner, Brian)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint) by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Shih, Daniel)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal of U.S. Patent No. 6,748,577 by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Shih, Daniel)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mt)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTACHMENT Walsh Declaration to #22 Unopposed MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Re: Pre-Suit Indirect Infringement by Microchip Technology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Banner, Brian)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Re: Pre-Suit Indirect Infringement by Microchip Technology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney P. Ryan Burningham for HD Silicon Solutions LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Max L. Tribble, Jr (P. Ryan Burningham's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14559387) by on behalf of HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Tribble, Max)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by HD Silicon Solutions LLC.(Shih, Daniel)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Northern District of California by Microchip Technology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mei-Ling Chen in Support of Microchip's Motion to Transfer, #2 Declaration of Neel Das in Support of Microchip's Motion to Transfer, #3 Declaration of Barry J. Blixt in Support of Microchip's Motion to Transfer, #4 Declaration of Jonathan W. Greene in Support of Microchip's Motion to Transfer, #5 Declaration of Rachel M. Walsh in Support of Microchip's Motion to Transfer Venue, #6 Exhibit 1 to Walsh Declaration, #7 Exhibit 2 to Walsh Declaration, #8 Exhibit 3 to Walsh Declaration, #9 Exhibit 4 to Walsh Declaration, #10 Exhibit 5 to Walsh Declaration, #11 Exhibit 6 to Walsh Declaration, #12 Exhibit 7 to Walsh Declaration, #13 Exhibit 8 to Walsh Declaration, #14 Exhibit 9 to Walsh Declaration, #15 Exhibit 10 to Walsh Declaration, #16 Exhibit 11 to Walsh Declaration, #17 Exhibit 12 to Walsh Declaration, #18 Exhibit 13 to Walsh Declaration, #19 Exhibit 14 to Walsh Declaration, #20 Exhibit 15 to Walsh Declaration, #21 Exhibit 16 to Walsh Declaration, #22 Exhibit 17 to Walsh Declaration, #23 Exhibit 18 to Walsh Declaration, #24 Exhibit 19 to Walsh Declaration, #25 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California)(Walsh, Rachel)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STATUS REPORT (Case Readiness Status Report) by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Shih, Daniel)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microchip Technology Inc.. (Walsh, Rachel)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against HD Silicon Solutions LLC by Microchip Technology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (the 731 Patent), #2 Exhibit B (the 404 Patent), #3 Exhibit C (the 002 Patent), #4 Exhibit D (the 577 Patent), #5 Exhibit E (the 299 Patent), #6 Exhibit F (the 619 Patent), #7 Exhibit G (the 033 Patent,))(Walsh, Rachel)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rachel M. Walsh for Microchip Technology Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brett M. Schuman for Microchip Technology Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Christopher Banner (Rachel M. Walsh's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14379651) by on behalf of Microchip Technology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Christopher Banner (Brett M. Schuman's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14379614) by on behalf of Microchip Technology Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Microchip Technology Inc.. Attorney Brian Christopher Banner added to party Microchip Technology Inc.(pty:dft) (Banner, Brian)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including February 5, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Microchip Technology Inc. answer due 2/5/2021. (bw)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Microchip Technology Inc.. (Adams, Darryl)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darryl Adams on behalf of Microchip Technology Inc.. Attorney Darryl Adams added to party Microchip Technology Inc.(pty:dft) (Adams, Darryl)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Max L. Tribble, Jr (Kalpana Srinivasan's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14251983) by on behalf of HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Tribble, Max)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. Microchip Technology Inc. served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Tribble, Max)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Max L. Tribble, Jr (Daniel Shih's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14230625) by on behalf of HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Tribble, Max)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Microchip Technology Inc.. (am)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Tribble, Max) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/30/2020) (am).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Tribble, Max)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 AO 120 (part 1), #2 AO 120 (part 2))(Tribble, Max) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/30/2020) (am). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/30/2020) (am).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14229265), filed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 (Patent No. 7,260,731), #3 Exhibit 2 (Patent No. 7,870,404), #4 Exhibit 3 (Patent No. 7,810,002), #5 Exhibit 4 (Patent No. 6,748,577), #6 Exhibit 5 (Patent No. 7,154,299), #7 Exhibit 6 (Patent No. 7,302,619), #8 Exhibit 7 (Patent No. 6,774,033))(Tribble, Max)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HD Silicon Solutions LLC v. Microchip Technology Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HD Silicon Solutions LLC
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: P. Ryan Burningham
Represented By: Daniel J. Shih
Represented By: Joseph S. Grinstein
Represented By: Max L. Tribble, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Jeffrey Shih
Represented By: Paul Ryan Burningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microchip Technology Inc.
Represented By: Brett M. Schuman
Represented By: Rachel M. Walsh
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Darryl Adams
Represented By: Rachel Melissa Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?