Lindsey v. WC Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dekeisha Lindsey
Defendant: WC Logistics, Inc. and AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv08400
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY (re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Dismiss, or Enjoin Duplicative Proceedings ) filed byAIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc., WC Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nadia D. Adams)(Adams, Nadia) (Filed on 12/23/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS RE: #16 MOTION TO REMAND #19 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 1/20/2021 AT 1:30PM: Hearings re #16 MOTION to Remand , #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Dismiss, or Enjoin Duplicative Proceedings and Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled for 1/20/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2022. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/em cGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2022. Initial Case M anagement Conference set for 1/20/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 26 FILED IN WRONG CASE. IGNORE.REPLY in Support (re #16 MOTION to Remand) filed by Dekeisha Lindsey. (Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 12/20/2021) Modified on 12/21/2021 (slh, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/23/2021 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2021 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Dismiss, or Enjoin Duplicative Proceedings ) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Consolidate, Dismiss, or Enjoin Duplicative Proceeding filed byDekeisha Lindsey. (Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 12/16/2021)
December 15, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY (re #16 MOTION to Remand ) PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND filed byDekeisha Lindsey. (Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 12/15/2021)
December 15, 2021 Filing 23 Re-notice of Motion Hearing re #16 MOTION to Remand - Plaintiff's Re-Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand filed by Dekeisha Lindsey. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 12/15/2021)
December 13, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF DEKEISHA LINDSEY'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc., WC Logistics, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/27/2021. Replies due by 1/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Adams, Nadia) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 8, 2021 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Remand ) filed byAIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc., WC Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Mancuso In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Remand)(Adams, Nadia) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case 21-cv-8466-JD, Lindsey v. WC Logistics, Inc. related. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/2021. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 2, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, Dismiss, or Enjoin Duplicative Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc., WC Logistics, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2021 01:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/16/2021. Replies due by 12/23/2021. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Adams, Nadia) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants. Filed by Dekeisha Lindsey. (Aiwazian, Edwin) (Filed on 11/29/2021) Modified on 12/6/2021 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING #16 MOTION TO REMAND FROM 1/6/2022 TO 1/13/2022 AT 1;30PM: Hearing re #16 MOTION to Remand reset for 1/13/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Briefing schedule remains unchanged.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/20 22 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand filed by Dekeisha Lindsey. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/8/2021. Replies due by 12/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 11/24/2021) Modified on 11/29/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Relate Case filed by AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc., WC Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nadia D. Adams ISO Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, #2 Proposed Order)(Adams, Nadia) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 1/13/2022 AT 1:30PM TO COINCIDE WITH MOTION HEARING: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2022.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE: Motion Hearing re: #5 Motion to Dismiss is reset for 1/13/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Responses due by 12/2/2021. Replies due by 12/9/2021.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGenera l Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 12/2/202 1. Replies due by 12/9/2021. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND RELATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Plaintiff's deadline to file her Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is continued to 12/2/2021; reply due 12/9/2021; hearing reset to 1/13/2022 at 1:30PM. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/19/2021. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/18/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO re #5 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND RELATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Dekeisha Lindsey. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Zabehi (Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dekeisha Lindsey.. (Zabehi, Tara) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/12/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2021. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2021)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF DEKEISHA LINDSEYS COMPLAINT filed by AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc., WC Logistics, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 11/18/2021. Replies due by 11/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order)(Adams, Nadia) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Initial Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2022 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN STATE COURT filed by AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc., WC Logistics, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Adams, Nadia) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2021. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Alameda. Their case number is RG21109457, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-16566488). Filed by AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc., WC Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Declarartion of A. Mancuso In Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Defendant's Disclosure Statement)(Adams, Nadia) (Filed on 10/28/2021) Modified on 10/29/2021 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey v. WC Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dekeisha Lindsey
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Tara Zabehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WC Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Nadia Darkazalli Adams
Represented By: David Allan Berkley
Represented By: Kristin Lee Walker-Probst
Represented By: Nikku Khalifian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Nadia Darkazalli Adams
Represented By: David Allan Berkley
Represented By: Kristin Lee Walker-Probst
Represented By: Nikku Khalifian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?