Mogan v. Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP et al
Plaintiff: Michael Mogan
Defendant: Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP, Airbnb Inc., Dave Willner, Jeff Henry, Sanaz Ebrahini, Michele Floyd and Jacqueline Young
Case Number: 3:2021cv08431
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #16 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Anti-SLAPP Statute. The Court EXTENDS the briefing deadline and ORDERS the SRC Defendants to file any reply by January 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/27/2021. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant and to Impose Pre-Filing Restrictions and Sanctions filed by Airbnb Inc., Sanaz Ebrahini, Jeff Henry, Dave Willner. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 1/4/2022. Replies due by 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Damali A. Taylor, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Damali) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Airbnb Inc., Sanaz Ebrahini, Jeff Henry, Dave Willner re #32 MOTION for Sanctions PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 11; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (Taylor, Damali) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Sanctions PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 11; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Airbnb Inc., Sanaz Ebrahini, Jeff Henry, Dave Willner. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 1/4/2022. Replies due by 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Damali) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 17, 2021 Filing 31 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP, Jacqueline Young.. (Servais, Andrew) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 17, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Strike #16 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Anti-SLAPP Statute, #1 Complaint, filed by Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP, Jacqueline Young. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 1/3/2022. Replies due by 1/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew A. Servias, #2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Proposed Order)(Servais, Andrew) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 15, 2021 Filing 29 Reply In Support of 412 Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Airbnb Inc., Sanaz Ebrahini, Jeff Henry, Dave Willner. (Taylor, Damali) (Filed on 12/15/2021) Modified on 12/16/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2021 Filing 28 Renotice motion hearing re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byAirbnb Inc., Sanaz Ebrahini, Jeff Henry, Dave Willner. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Taylor, Damali) (Filed on 12/15/2021)
December 14, 2021 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE pursuant to #25 Order Relating Cases any dates for hearing noticed motions are vacated and must be re-noticed by the moving party before the newly assigned Judge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021)
December 13, 2021 Filing 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Anti-SLAPP Statute ) filed byMichael Mogan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Michael Mogan In Support Of Plaintiffs Request For Judicial Notice And In Opposition To Defendant Sacks Ricketts And Case LLP, Michele Floyd And Jacqueline Youngs Motion To Strike Complaint Pursuant To California Code Of Civil Procedure 425.16, #2 Supplement Plaintiff's Request For Judicial Notice In Opposition To Defendant Sacks Ricketts Case LLP, Michele Floyd And Jacqueline Youngs Motion To Strike Complaint And Exhibits 1-18, #3 Supplement Plaintiff's Request For Judicial Notice In Opposition To Defendant Sacks Ricketts Case LLP, Michele Floyd And Jacqueline Youngs Motion To Strike Complaint And Exhibits 18-36, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mogan, Michael) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RELATING CASE. Related case: 3:21-cv-06959-TSH. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/10/2021. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 10, 2021 Filing 24 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re #17 Notice (Other) filed by Jacqueline Young, Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP, Michele Floyd re 21-cv-06959-TSH. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/10/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 10, 2021 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 8, 2021 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Airbnb Inc., Sanaz Ebrahini, Jeff Henry, Dave Willner.. (Taylor, Damali) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
December 8, 2021 Filing 22 DECLARATION OF MICHAEL MOGAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Michael Mogan. CORRECTION OF DOCKET #21 -2. (Mogan, Michael) (Filed on 12/8/2021) Modified on 12/8/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2021 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint) filed by Michael Mogan. SEE DOCKET ENTRY #22 FOR CORRECTED DECLARATION OF ATTACHMENT 2. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiff's Request For Judicial Notice In Opposition To Defendant AIRBNB Inc., Dave Willner And Sanaz Ebrahini's Motion To Dismiss The Complaint And Exhibits 1-9, #2 Declaration Declaration Of Michael Mogan In Support Of Plaintiffs Request For Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mogan, Michael) (Filed on 12/8/2021) Modified on 12/8/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2021 Filing 20 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/14/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2021)
December 4, 2021 Filing 19 PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO RELATING THE CASES PURSUANT TO L.R. 3-12(e)re #17 Notice (Other) by Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2021) Modified on 12/6/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michele Floyd, Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP, Jacqueline Young.. (Servais, Andrew) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICEOF RELATED CASE by Michele Floyd, Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP, Jacqueline Young. (Servais, Andrew) (Filed on 12/3/2021) Modified on 12/6/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2021 Filing 16 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Anti-SLAPP Statute filed by Michele Floyd, Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP, Jacqueline Young. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 12/13/2021. Replies due by 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice of Exhibits 1-7, #2 Declaration Declaration of Andy Servais, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Servais, Andrew) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A Servais for Defendants Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP; Michelle Floyd and Jacqueline Young (Servais, Andrew) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Each attorney of record must file their own notice of appearance. [err102] Re: #15 Notice of Appearance filed by Jacqueline Young, Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP, Michele Floyd. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 26, 2021 Filing 13 ***FILED IN ERROR PLEASE SEE CORRETED CLERK'S NOTICE #14 *** CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/10/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2021) Modified on 11/29/2021 (wft, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Airbnb Inc., Sanaz Ebrahini, Jeff Henry, Dave Willner. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2022 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 12/8/2021. Replies due by 12/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support, #2 Declaration of Damali A. Taylor In Support, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Damali) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Airbnb Inc., Sanaz Ebrahini, Jeff Henry, Dave Willner (Taylor, Damali) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Sestito for Defendants Airbnb Inc., Dave Willner, Jeff Henry, and Sanaz Ebrahimi (Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Damali A. Taylor for Defendants Airbnb Inc., Dave Willner, Jeff Henry, and Sanaz Ebrahimi (Taylor, Damali) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 13, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Mogan.. (Mogan, Michael) (Filed on 11/13/2021)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Airbnb Inc., Sanaz Ebrahini, Michele Floyd, Jeff Henry, Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP, Dave Willner, Jacqueline Young. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Mogan, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
November 1, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please prepare one summons listing all defendants. [err102]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: [3 ] Proposed Summons filed by Michael Mogan. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
November 1, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Attorney must update ECF profile with current contact information. [err102] Re: #1 Complaint filed by Michael Mogan. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/ 1/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2021. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons)(Mogan, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Michael Mogan (Mogan, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ACANDC-16569181). Filed by Michael Mogan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mogan, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2021) Modified on 11/1/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mogan v. Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mogan
Represented By: Michael S. Mogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP
Represented By: Andrew A Servais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbnb Inc.
Represented By: Damali A. Taylor
Represented By: Dawn Sestito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Willner
Represented By: Damali A. Taylor
Represented By: Dawn Sestito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Henry
Represented By: Damali A. Taylor
Represented By: Dawn Sestito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanaz Ebrahini
Represented By: Damali A. Taylor
Represented By: Dawn Sestito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Floyd
Represented By: Andrew A Servais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Young
Represented By: Andrew A Servais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?