Knight v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jessi A. Knight
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2021cv08985
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: James Donato
2 Judge: Trina L Thompson
3 Judge: Trina L Thompson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Further Jury Trial days set for 10/3/2023 - 10/10/2023 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before District Judge Trina L Thompson. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2023)
October 24, 2022 Filing 36 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2022)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/24/2022. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2022)
October 19, 2022 Filing 34 Minute Entry for case management conference held on 10/19/2022 before Judge Trina L. Thompson. The Court set the following schedule for further proceedings:Trial Date: October 2, 2023Pretrial Date: August 31, 2023Joint Pretrial Statement with Objections: August 17, 2023ADR Deadline: May 19, 2023Last day to hear dispositive motion: August 1, 2023Last day to file dispositive motion: June 27, 2023Close of Expert Discovery: May 29, 2023Rebuttal Expert Disclosure: May 8, 2023Close of Fact Discovery: April 17, 2023Further CMC Hearing: June 29, 2023 at 2:00 PMJoint CMC Statement: June 22, 2023Plaintiff Attorney: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes. Defendant Attorney: Reshma Amarlal Bajaj. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/19/2022)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/19/22. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2022)
October 12, 2022 Filing 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT 1st Amended filed by Jessi A. Knight. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 10/12/2022)
October 3, 2022 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 10/3/2022)
September 29, 2022 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 9/29/2022)
September 29, 2022 Filing 29 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2022)
September 22, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Reshma Amarlal Bajaj (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bajaj, Reshma) (Filed on 9/22/2022)
September 20, 2022 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Specially Set Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/19/2022 at 09:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina- l-thompson/Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at tltcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Wednesday, October 12, 2022, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2022)
August 29, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Trina L Thompson. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to the case. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Trina L. Thompson in the San Francisco division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials TLT immediately after the case number.2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before Judge Thompson by the moving party for a date consistent with the Courts law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff remain unchanged.5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for or after November 15, 2022, and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered.6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before November 15, 2022, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines (e.g., motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases.7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice.8. On or before October 14, 2022, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address all issues outlined in the #Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District. The approved form for such statements can be accessed # here.IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 8/29/2022 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (ecg-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. The case management conference set for August 18, 2022, is vacated pending further order. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/16/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 11, 2022 Filing 24 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Rule 26(f) filed by Jessi A. Knight. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2022 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 8/11/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/29/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 23, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret DEFENDANT FCA US LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 6/23/2022)
June 23, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Mayo DEFENDANT FCA US LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Mayo, James) (Filed on 6/23/2022)
June 20, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE by Jessi A. Knight of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/20/2022)
June 3, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by James P. Mayo (Mayo, James) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel S. Harman-Holmes (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
March 18, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon David Universal (Universal, Jon) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA US LLC is a Delaware Limited Liability Company for FCA US LLC. (Mayo, James) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Notice of Appearance James P. Mayo)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 4, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jessi A. Knight re #13 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Haw, Christine) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
February 24, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2022)
February 23, 2022 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 2/23/2022)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The docket does not indicate that the defendant has been served, and a joint case management statement was not filed. The initial case management conference set for February 24, 2022, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/22/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
January 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Karin Kuemerle (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 1/28/2022)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/20/2021. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2021)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jessi A. Knight.. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 12/16/2021)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Law (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 12/16/2021)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/22/2021. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/3/2021. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Statutory Obligations against Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16644913.). Filed byJessi A. Knight. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 11/19/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessi A. Knight
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: Jon David Universal
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Reshma Amarlal Bajaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?