MacMillan et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Brendan MacMillan, Melanie MacMillan, Margaret MacMillan and L.M.
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Nicole Stein, Ronda Johnson, Molly Braun, Andrea Creed and Kimiko Burton
Case Number: 3:2021cv09159
Filed: November 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret MacMillan, Melanie MacMillan, L.M., Brendan MacMillan. City and County of San Francisco served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. (Marinho, Sarah) (Filed on 12/28/2021)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2022 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Perso ns granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by L.M., Brendan MacMillan, Margaret MacMillan, Melanie MacMillan.. (Marinho, Sarah) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Molly Braun, Kimiko Burton, City and County of San Francisco, Andrea Creed, Ronda Johnson, Nicole Stein. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/13/2021. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Marinho, Sarah) (Filed on 11/26/2021)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Molly Braun, Kimiko Burton, City and County of San Francisco, Andrea Creed, Ronda Johnson, Nicole Stein (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16663974). Filed by Margaret MacMillan, Melanie MacMillan, (a minor) L.M., Brendan MacMillan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of No Interested Parties)(Marinho, Sarah) (Filed on 11/26/2021) Modified on 11/29/2021 (slh, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacMillan et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan MacMillan
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Dmitry Stadlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie MacMillan
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Dmitry Stadlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret MacMillan
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Dmitry Stadlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.M.
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Dmitry Stadlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronda Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimiko Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?