United SF Freedom Alliance et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: United SF Freedom Alliance, Bhanu Vikram, Carson Robert Schilling, Christa L. Festa, Christianne T. Crotty, Cynthia Wheeler, Dennis Callahan, Faiming Cheung and Jessica Kwok-Bo Lindsey
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Carol Isen, Susan Philip, Jeanine R. Nicholson, Phillip A. Ginsburg, Kimberly Ackerman, Fabian Perez and William Scott
Case Number: 3:2021cv09187
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Entire Case Without Prejudice by United SF Freedom Alliance (Howard, John) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 9, 2021 Filing 17 Proposed Order re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Kimberly Ackerman, City and County of San Francisco, Phillip A. Ginsburg, Carol Isen, Jeanine R. Nicholson, Fabian Perez, Susan Philip, William Scott. (Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 12/9/2021)
December 9, 2021 Filing 16 Declaration of Tara M. Steeley in Support of #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed byKimberly Ackerman, City and County of San Francisco, Phillip A. Ginsburg, Carol Isen, Jeanine R. Nicholson, Fabian Perez, Susan Philip, William Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 12/9/2021)
December 9, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Kimberly Ackerman, City and County of San Francisco, Phillip A. Ginsburg, Carol Isen, Jeanine R. Nicholson, Fabian Perez, Susan Philip, William Scott. (Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 12/9/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/13/2021. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint set for 1/20/2022 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb Gen eral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document asso ciated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kimberly Ackerman, City and County of San Francisco, Phillip A. Ginsburg, Carol Isen, Jeanine R. Nicholson, Fabian Perez, Susan Philip, William Scott.. (Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Order re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Kimberly Ackerman, City and County of San Francisco, Phillip A. Ginsburg, Carol Isen, Jeanine R. Nicholson, Fabian Perez, Susan Philip, William Scott. (Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Judicial Notice re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed byKimberly Ackerman, City and County of San Francisco, Phillip A. Ginsburg, Carol Isen, Jeanine R. Nicholson, Fabian Perez, Susan Philip, William Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Kimberly Ackerman, City and County of San Francisco, Phillip A. Ginsburg, Carol Isen, Jeanine R. Nicholson, Fabian Perez, Susan Philip, William Scott. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 12/20/2021. Replies due by 12/27/2021. (Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 2, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kimberly Ackerman, City and County of San Francisco, Phillip A. Ginsburg, Carol Isen, Jeanine R. Nicholson, Fabian Perez, Susan Philip, William Scott re #7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, (Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 1, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 34611157237 by City and County of San Francisco. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021) (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kimberly Ackerman, City and County of San Francisco, Phillip A. Ginsburg, Carol Isen, Jeanine R. Nicholson, Fabian Perez, Susan Philip, William Scott re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, Proof of Service of Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler's Standing Orders and Related Initial Documents (Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kimberly Ackerman, City and County of San Francisco, Phillip A. Ginsburg, Carol Isen, Jeanine R. Nicholson, Fabian Perez, Susan Philip, William Scott (Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Yeh for Defendants (Yeh, Kevin) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/13/2021. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-595642. (). Filed byCarol Isen, William Scott, Jeanine R. Nicholson, Fabian Perez, Susan Philip, Kimberly Ackerman, Phillip A. Ginsburg, City and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 11/29/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United SF Freedom Alliance et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United SF Freedom Alliance
Represented By: John W. Howard
Represented By: Alyssa Paige Malchiodi
Represented By: Andrew Gilbert Nagurney
Represented By: Michelle D. Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bhanu Vikram
Represented By: John W. Howard
Represented By: Alyssa Paige Malchiodi
Represented By: Andrew Gilbert Nagurney
Represented By: Michelle D. Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carson Robert Schilling
Represented By: John W. Howard
Represented By: Alyssa Paige Malchiodi
Represented By: Andrew Gilbert Nagurney
Represented By: Michelle D. Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa L. Festa
Represented By: John W. Howard
Represented By: Alyssa Paige Malchiodi
Represented By: Andrew Gilbert Nagurney
Represented By: Michelle D. Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christianne T. Crotty
Represented By: John W. Howard
Represented By: Andrew Gilbert Nagurney
Represented By: Michelle D. Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Wheeler
Represented By: John W. Howard
Represented By: Alyssa Paige Malchiodi
Represented By: Andrew Gilbert Nagurney
Represented By: Michelle D. Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Callahan
Represented By: John W. Howard
Represented By: Andrew Gilbert Nagurney
Represented By: Michelle D. Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faiming Cheung
Represented By: John W. Howard
Represented By: Andrew Gilbert Nagurney
Represented By: Michelle D. Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Kwok-Bo Lindsey
Represented By: John W. Howard
Represented By: Alyssa Paige Malchiodi
Represented By: Andrew Gilbert Nagurney
Represented By: Michelle D. Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Kevin Yeh
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Isen
Represented By: Kevin Yeh
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Philip
Represented By: Kevin Yeh
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanine R. Nicholson
Represented By: Kevin Yeh
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip A. Ginsburg
Represented By: Kevin Yeh
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Ackerman
Represented By: Kevin Yeh
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabian Perez
Represented By: Kevin Yeh
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Scott
Represented By: Kevin Yeh
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?