Meta Platforms, Inc. v. Nguyen et al
Plaintiff: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Defendant: Long Nguyen, Pham Van Linh, Adman Duong, Trung Hieu Nguyen, Henry Long, Van Nhut Nguyen, Thang Van, Duong Viet Dung, Dung Dinh and Trungg Hieuu
Case Number: 3:2021cv10066
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Filing 74 RESPONSE re #71 Response ( Non Motion ), #70 Response ( Non Motion ) to Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut's "Responses" to Order Adopting Report and Recommendation and Granting Default Judgment, Attorneys' Fees, and Costs by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. re #68 Judgment, #67 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, on Pham Van Linh (Kim, Jason) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. re #68 Judgment, #67 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, on Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut (Kim, Jason) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 71 RESPONSE re #67 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, by Long Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Vietnamese Response)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 70 RESPONSE re #67 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, by Van Nhut Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Vietnamese Response, #2 Envelope)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 69 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE. Plaintiff shall serve the defendants with a copy the Order Granting Default Judgment and Judgment (Dkt. Nos. #66 and #67 )and file a proof of service. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 11, 2023 Filing 68 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/11/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #63 AND GRANTING DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ATTORNEYS' FEES, AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/10/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 5, 2023 Filing 66 Supplemental Brief in Support of Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ann Marie Mortimer in Support)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 9/5/2023)
September 5, 2023 Filing 65 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Marvisi in support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 9/5/2023)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 08/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 22, 2023 Filing 63 REFERRAL FOR REASSIGNMENT AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #47 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. and #53 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Pham Van Linh, Adman Duong and Trung Hieu Nguyen filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. Objections due by 9/5/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/22/2023. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 16, 2023 Filing 62 Declaration of Sam Winters in Support of #53 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Pham Van Linh, Adman Duong and Trung Hieu Nguyen filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Marvisi, Brandon) (Filed on 8/16/2023)
August 7, 2023 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before by Zoom Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Motion Hearing held on 8/7/2023 re #53 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Pham Van Linh, Adman Duong and Trung Hieu Nguyen filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. The Court requests that Plaintiff file a short declaration regarding the recent activity of the three defendants on Meta. The Court will issue a written order on the motion. Digital Recording Time: 9:30-9:32. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Brandon Marvisi and Jason Kim. Attorney for Defendants: No Appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/7/2023)
August 2, 2023 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing Re: #53 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Pham Van Linh, Adman Duong and Trung Hieu Nguyen currently set for 8/7/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. This proceeding will be held by videoconference via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #57 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (sklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 26, 2023 Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held by Zoom before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Motion Hearing held on 6/26/2023 re #47 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. The Court takes the matter under submission and will issue a written order. Digital Recording Time: 9:31-9:40. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Brandon Marvisi and Jason Kim. Attorney for Defendants: No Appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2023)
June 22, 2023 Filing 58 Supplemental Brief re #47 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Marvisi in support, #2 Declaration of Sam Winters in support (Redacted))(Related document(s) #47 ) (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 6/22/2023)
June 22, 2023 Filing 57 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Declaration of Sam Winters in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Marvisi in support, #2 Declaration of Veronica Nauts in support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Sam Winters, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Declaration of Sam Winters)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 6/22/2023)
June 22, 2023 Filing 56 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing Re: #47 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut currently set for 6/26/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. This proceeding will be held by videoconference via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 16, 2023 Filing 55 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Case Management Conference: Given the pending motions for default judgment (dkt nos. #47 and [53), the Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2023 at 1:30 PM is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 15, 2023 Filing 54 Notice of Questions re #47 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on June 15, 2023. (sklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 9, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Pham Van Linh, Adman Duong and Trung Hieu Nguyen filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 6/23/2023. Replies due by 6/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Marvisi in support, #2 Proposed Order re Default Judgment)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 6/9/2023)
June 8, 2023 Filing 52 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #47 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut ) filed byLong Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2023)
June 6, 2023 Filing 51 REPLY (re #47 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Marvisi in support)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 6/6/2023)
May 30, 2023 Filing 50 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Pham Van Linh also known as Thang Van. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #49 )(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 24, 2023 Filing 49 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Pham Van Linh filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Marvisi in support)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 5/24/2023)
May 17, 2023 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. re #47 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut (Marvisi, Brandon) (Filed on 5/17/2023)
May 16, 2023 Filing 47 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 5/30/2023. Replies due by 6/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Marvisi in support, #2 Declaration of Andrew Herter in support, #3 Declaration of Michael Duffey in support, #4 Proposed Order)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 5/16/2023)
May 11, 2023 Filing 46 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #30 )(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #39 Motion to Strike #20 Answer to Complaint, #17 Answer to Complaint, #16 Answer to Complaint . The Clerk is directed to enter default against Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 10, 2023 Filing 44 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing Re: #39 MOTION to Strike #20 Answer to Complaint, #17 Answer to Complaint, #16 Answer to Complaint currently set for 5/15/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. This proceeding will be held by videoconference via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 2, 2023 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Pham Van Linh served on 5/2/2023, answer due 5/23/2023. (Marvisi, Brandon) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #37 Motion for Alternative Service. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 26, 2023 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Motion Hearing: Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the #37 Motion for Alternative Service suitable for disposition without oral argument. The hearing set for 5/1/2023 at 9:30 AM is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 26, 2023 Filing 40 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing Re: #37 MOTION to Serve Defendant Pham Van Linh by Email set for 5/1/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. This proceeding will be held by videoconference via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 4, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION to Strike #20 Answer to Complaint, #17 Answer to Complaint, #16 Answer to Complaint filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 4/18/2023. Replies due by 4/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Marvisi in support, #2 Proposed Order)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 4/4/2023)
March 27, 2023 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held by Zoom before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/27/2023. Plaintiff has filed a motion to serve Defendant Pham Van Linh by email. In addition, plaintiff will be moving to strike the responses filed by Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut. Updated Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Digital Recording Time: 1:32-1:33. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Brandon Marvisi and Jason Kim. Attorney for Defendants: No Appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/27/2023)
March 24, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION to Serve Defendant Pham Van Linh by Email [Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(F)(3)] filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 4/7/2023. Replies due by 4/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Marvisi in support, #2 Declaration of Andrew Herter in support, #3 Proposed Order) (Marvisi, Brandon) (Filed on 3/24/2023)
March 23, 2023 Filing 36 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 20, 2023 Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Marvisi re Plaintiff's Further Case Management Statement)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 3/20/2023)
March 8, 2023 Filing 34 RESPONSE (re #30 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut ) filed byLong Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2023)
February 27, 2023 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held by Zoom before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Motion Hearing held on 2/27/2023 re #30 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. The Court requests that as a procedural matter Plaintiff file a Motion to Strike Defendants' answers that are filed on the docket. Digital Recording Time: 9:30-9:35. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Jason Kim and Brandon Marvisi. Attorney for Defendants: No Appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2023)
February 22, 2023 Filing 32 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing Re: #30 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut currently set for 2/27/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2023)
December 23, 2022 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. re #30 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut (Marvisi, Brandon) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 22, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Long Nguyen and Nguyen Van Nhut filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 1/5/2023. Replies due by 1/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Herter in Support, #2 Declaration of Michael Duffey in Support, #3 Declaration of Brandon Marvisi in Support, #4 Proposed Order ([Proposed] Entry of Default and Default Judgment))(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
November 18, 2022 Filing 29 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Adman Duong and Trung Hieu Nguyen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #28 )(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2022)
November 16, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Entry of Default of Defendants Adman Duong and Trung Hieu Nguyen filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Marvisi in support)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 11/16/2022)
October 20, 2022 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #10 Summons Issued (formal Hague Certificate of Service on Defendant Trung Hieu Nguyen issued by Vietnam) (Marvisi, Brandon) (Filed on 10/20/2022)
October 12, 2022 Filing 26 Received Document by Long Nguyen, Van Nhut Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2022)
October 3, 2022 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held by Zoom before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/3/2022. Two of the Defendants have filed responses to the complaint and have retained foreign counsel but do not intend to participate in this litigation any further. The remaining defendants are still in the process of being served through the Hague Convention. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion for default judgment against the Defendants who have responded is 12/31/2022. Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2023. Further Case Management Conference to discuss the status of service on the remaining defendants set for 3/27/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Digital Recording Time: 1:39-1:44. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Ann Marie Mortimer and Jason Kim. Attorneys : No Appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/3/2022)
September 28, 2022 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference currently set for 10/3/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by te lephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2022)
September 26, 2022 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #10 Summons Issued (formal Hague Certificate of Service on Defendant Nguyen Van Nhut issued by Vietnam) (Marvisi, Brandon) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #10 Summons Issued (formal Hague Certificate of Service on Defendant Adman Duong issued by Vietnam) (Marvisi, Brandon) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byLong Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
June 10, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jeff R. R. Nelson (Nelson, Jeff) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
May 24, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Jonathan Kim Meta Platforms, Inc. (Kim, Jason) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 20, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byVan Nhut Nguyen. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byLong Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #14 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2022. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/3/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 21, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference [L.R. 6-1(B)] filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff R. R. Nelson In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference [L.R. 6-1(B)], #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference [L.R. 6-1(B)])(Nelson, Jeff) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 14, 2022 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nelson, Jeff) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 Refund Status re #9 Application for Refund Approved. (rgh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
January 6, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Meta Platforms, Inc... (Nelson, Jeff) (Filed on 1/6/2022)
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Adman Duong, Pham Van Linh, Long Nguyen, Trung Hieu Nguyen, Van Nhut Nguyen. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
January 3, 2022 Filing 9 Application for Refund re #1 Complaint,, Receipt Number ACANDC-16759820 (corrected) by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/18/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 Refund Status re #5 Application for Refund Declined. (rgh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2021)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 Application for Refund re #1 Complaint,, Receipt Number ACANDC-16759851 (duplicate payment) by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 12/30/2021)
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 12/30/2021)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 12/30/2021)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 12/30/2021)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adman Duong, Pham Van Linh, Long Nguyen, Trung Hieu Nguyen, Van Nhut Nguyen ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16759851.). Filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 12/30/2021)
December 30, 2021 Please double check receipt number, do not see duplicate payment. #Electronic filing error. Re: #5 Application for Refund filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. (as, COURT STAFF) (F iled on 12/30/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meta Platforms, Inc. v. Nguyen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pham Van Linh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adman Duong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trung Hieu Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Nhut Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thang Van
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duong Viet Dung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dung Dinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trungg Hieuu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Represented By: Jeff R. R. Nelson
Represented By: Jason Jonathan Kim
Represented By: Brandon Marvisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?