Clenney et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Clenney and Norma Clenney
Defendant: FCA US LLC and DOES 1 through 10, Inclsuive
Case Number: 3:2022cv00547
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
2 Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Rabiya F. Tirmizi (Tirmizi, Rabiya) (Filed on 3/3/2023)
February 16, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin J Scott on behalf of Plaintiffs (Scott, Caitlin) (Filed on 2/16/2023)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. Given #54 the plaintiff's response, the #51 Order to Show Cause is lifted. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/14/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023)
February 9, 2023 Filing 54 DECLARATION of ARIEL HARMAN-HOLMES in Response to the Order to Show Cause Issued #51 Order to Show Cause by Michael Clenney, Norma Clenney. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 2/9/2023) Modified on 2/10/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2023 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. Telephone Conference set for 3/30/2023 02:15 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2023)
February 9, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Settlement (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2023)
February 8, 2023 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 2/8/2023. CASE REFERRED to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference to occur within 90 days, or as soon thereafter as possible.The Court will issue an order to show cause as to plaintiffs' counsel and to show cause why the case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Last day to hear Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2023, 10:00 AM, in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria.Plaintiffs' just served defense right before this hearing with a second round of discovery requests - some were duplicative, but much broader than what was requested in November.Plaintiffs' counsel has not been responsive to defense regarding setting a deposition of the plaintiff in this case. The Court ordered that plaintiff's deposition take place on 3/1/2023, at 10 a.m.Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 1:26 - 1:35. Plaintiff Attorney: No appearance. Defendant Attorney: Eric Sentlinger. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2023)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/9/2023. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/8/2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023)
February 2, 2023 Filing 50 UPDATED JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 2/2/2023)
February 2, 2023 Filing 49 UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 2/2/2023)
January 31, 2023 Filing 48 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING A FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR 2/8/2023, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2023, 01:00 PM, via Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, February 2, 2023, by 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2023)
December 29, 2022 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lambert, Sarah) (Filed on 12/29/2022)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. The #45 stipulated request to allow Clenney to file a First Amended Complaint is denied because there is no need to file an amended complaint when a plaintiff is simply dropping one of their claims. The sixth claim and the prayer for punitive damages are now abandoned and FCA no longer needs to defend against them. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 6, 2022 Filing 45 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File First Amended Complaint filed by Michael Clenney, Norma Clenney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 12/6/2022) Modified on 12/9/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #43 Stipulation to Continue Trial Dates and Related Deadlines AS MODIFIED. No further extensions will be granted. Close of Fact Discovery due by 3/6/2023. Opening Reports due by 3/6/2023. Rebuttal Reports due by 3/13/2023. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/20/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Jury Trial set for 8/21/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 43 AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION to continue trial dates and related documents filed by Michael Clenney, Norma Clenney. (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] ORDER on amended joint stipulation) (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 11/21/2022) Modified on 11/25/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/25/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions terminated: #41 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Trial Dates and Related Deadlines filed by Michael Clenney, Norma Clenney. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/15/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2022)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying #41 Stipulation to Continue Trial Dates and Related Deadlines. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/14/2022. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2022)
November 8, 2022 Filing 41 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Trial Dates and Related Deadlines re 39 Case Management Conference - Initial, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Michael Clenney, Norma Clenney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
July 28, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE OF REFERRAL FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/28/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2022)
July 27, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for Discovery (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2022)
July 13, 2022 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 7/13/2022.CASE REFERRED to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Discovery.Case Schedule:Last day to amend pleadings due by 9/1/2022. Close of Fact Discovery due by 11/18/2022. Opening Reports due by 11/18/2022. Rebuttal Reports due by 12/2/2022. Close of Expert Discovery due by 12/16/2022. Last day to hear Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2023, 09:30 AM, in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2023, 10:00 AM, in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Jury Trial set for 5/22/2023, 10:00 AM, in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria.Total Time in Court: 5 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 2:13 - 2:18. Plaintiff Attorney: Ariel Harman-Holmes. Defendant Attorney: Sarah Lambert. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/13/2022)
July 13, 2022 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING THE TIME FOR THE CMC ON 7/13/2022, TO 130 P.M. No further registration is required if counsel have already pre-registered.Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2022, 01:30 PM, via Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov /vc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. The re is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2022)
July 11, 2022 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 7/13/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2022, 01:00 PM, via Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Cour t Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Tuesday, July 12, at 12 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2022)
July 6, 2022 Filing 36 UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Rule 26(f) filed by Michael Clenney, Norma Clenney. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 7/6/2022) Modified on 7/8/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order granting request #29 to substitute attorney. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 20, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE by Michael Clenney, Norma Clenney of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/20/2022)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria denying #13 defendant's motion to dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2022 01:00 PM via Zoom. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2022)
June 10, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lambert, Sarah) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 10, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dean Sentlinger (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 10, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by James P. Mayo (Mayo, James) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
May 24, 2022 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2022 at 01:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, June 30th, 2022 by no later than 10:00AM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel S. Harman-Holmes (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 25, 2022 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2022, 01:00 PM, via Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at # https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, May 19, 2022, by 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 20, 2022 Filing 25 JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michael Clenney, Norma Clenney. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 4/20/2022) Modified on 4/25/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #21 Stipulation selecting Private ADR.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2022)
April 14, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2022)
April 12, 2022 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the motion hearing scheduled for 4/14/2022, re #13 Motion to Dismiss. The Court will issue a written ruling based on the motion and responsive briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2022)
April 8, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Jeffrey Pardo (Pardo, Matthew) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 6, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Michael Clenney filed by Michael Clenney. (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 4/6/2022)
April 5, 2022 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL FOR MOTION HEARING ON 4/14/2022, RE #13 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2022, 10:00 AM, via Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https: //www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, April 7, 2022, by 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2022)
March 28, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike ) filed byFCA US LLC. (Mayo, James) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 21, 2022 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike ) filed byMichael Clenney, Norma Clenney. (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 10, 2022 Filing 17 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2022, 01:00 PM, via Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances : Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, April 21, 2022, by 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (T his is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 6, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC re #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Mayo, James) (Filed on 3/6/2022)
March 6, 2022 Filing 15 Certification of Interested Parties #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FCA US LLC. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Mayo, James) (Filed on 3/6/2022) Modified on 3/10/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Mayo (Mayo, James) (Filed on 3/6/2022)
March 6, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike filed by FCA US LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 3/21/2022. Replies due by 3/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration James P. Mayo, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Notice of Appearance James P. Mayo)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 3/6/2022) Modified on 3/10/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon David Universal (Universal, Jon) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Clenney, Norma Clenney re #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 02/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2022)
February 11, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2022)
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Clenney, Norma Clenney.. (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
January 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Karin Kuemerle (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 1/28/2022)
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2022)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2022)
January 27, 2022 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Michael Clenney, Norma Clenney . (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/10/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Michael Clenney, Norma Clenney . (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Statutory Obligations against DOES 1 through 10, Inclsuive, FCA US LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16847047.). Filed byMichael Clenney, Norma Clenney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2013 Dodge Warranty, #2 Summons In A Civil Action)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 27, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Please re-file Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/2020) in its entirety. Missing signature of attorney of record. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Michael Clenney, Norma Clenney. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clenney et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Clenney
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Caitlin J Scott
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Clenney
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Caitlin J Scott
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: Jon David Universal
Represented By: Eric Dean Sentlinger
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, Inclsuive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?