Weston v. DocuSign, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard R. Weston
Defendant: DocuSign, Inc., Daniel D. Springer, Michael J. Sheridan and Cynthia Gaylor
Petitioner: Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho, Steven Truong and Dennis Richerson
Case Number: 3:2022cv00824
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1(b), it has been determined that this matter is appropriate for disposition without oral argument. As such, the hearing set for today at 2:00 p.m. is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2022)
March 29, 2022 Filing 40 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2022 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadc asting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Michael H. Rogers. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Phillip Kim. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by James W. Johnson. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Francis P. McConville. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 23, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17018574.) filed by Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rogers, Michael) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 23, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17018512.) filed by Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, James) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 22, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17015042.) filed by Steven Truong. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kim, Phillip) (Filed on 3/22/2022)
March 18, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17006719.) filed by Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McConville, Francis) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 15, 2022 Filing 31 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byDeka International S.A. Luxembourg, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Joost, #2 Exhibit A_Supplemental Joint Declaration)(Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 15, 2022 Filing 30 REPLY (re #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed bySteven Truong. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 9, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE by Dennis Richerson re #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Non-Opposition to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 3/9/2022)
March 8, 2022 Filing 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed bySteven Truong. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 3/8/2022)
March 8, 2022 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byDeka International S.A. Luxembourg, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho. (Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/8/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dennis Richerson re #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Adam Marc Apton on behalf of Dennis Richerson (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Dennis Richerson. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 3/8/2022. Replies due by 3/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam M. Apton, #2 Exhibit A - PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit C - PSLRA Notice, #5 Exhibit D - Decl., #6 Exhibit E - LK Resume, #7 Proposed Order)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Steven Truong re #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Laurence Matthew Rosen on behalf of Steven Truong (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 21 Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen in Support of #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed bySteven Truong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Cert., #3 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #20 ) (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Steven Truong. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 3/8/2022. Replies due by 3/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Francis P. McConville by Jennifer Lauren Joost on behalf of Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho (Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Eric J. Belfi by Jennifer Lauren Joost on behalf of Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho (Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Christopher J. Keller by Jennifer Lauren Joost on behalf of Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho (Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Jennifer L. Joost by Jennifer Lauren Joost on behalf of Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho (Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho (Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 3/8/2022. Replies due by 3/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Joost, #2 Exhibit A_Certifications, #3 Exhibit B_Transactions Charts, #4 Exhibit C_Joint Declaration, #5 Exhibit D_Notice of Pendency Collins Action, #6 Exhibit E_Notice of Pendency Weston Action, #7 Exhibit F_Labaton Sucharow Resume, #8 Exhibit G_Kessler Topaz Resume, #9 Proposed Order)(Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES by Judge William H. Orrick granting #11 Stipulation. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Richard R. Weston. Service waived by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waiver for Cynthia Gaylor, #2 Waiver for Michael J. Sheridan, #3 Waiver for Daniel D. Springer)(Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 16, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time For All Defendants To Respond To Complaint And Continuing Case Management Conference And Associated Deadlines filed by DocuSign, Inc., Cynthia Gaylor, Michael J. Sheridan, Daniel D. Springer. (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 2/16/2022)
February 16, 2022 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by DocuSign, Inc., Cynthia Gaylor, Michael J. Sheridan, Daniel D. Springer (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/16/2022)
February 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Corinne Bretan Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/16/2022)
February 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Richard R. Weston of Publication Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 23-1(a) with Exhibits A-B (Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/16/2022)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk Clerk on 2/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 9, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DocuSign, Inc., Cynthia Gaylor, Michael J. Sheridan, Daniel D. Springer. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2022)
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/5/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2022)
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2022)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard R. Weston (Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/8/2022)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/8/2022)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against DocuSign, Inc., Cynthia Gaylor, Michael J. Sheridan, Daniel D. Springer ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16884765.). Filed byRichard R. Weston. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Richard R. Weston, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joost, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/8/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weston v. DocuSign, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard R. Weston
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DocuSign, Inc.
Represented By: Dean S. Kristy
Represented By: Andy Kim
Represented By: Jennifer Corinne Bretan
Represented By: Katherine Anne Marshall
Represented By: Sofia Ritala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel D. Springer
Represented By: Dean S. Kristy
Represented By: Andy Kim
Represented By: Jennifer Corinne Bretan
Represented By: Katherine Anne Marshall
Represented By: Sofia Ritala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Sheridan
Represented By: Dean S. Kristy
Represented By: Andy Kim
Represented By: Jennifer Corinne Bretan
Represented By: Katherine Anne Marshall
Represented By: Sofia Ritala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Gaylor
Represented By: Dean S. Kristy
Represented By: Andy Kim
Represented By: Jennifer Corinne Bretan
Represented By: Katherine Anne Marshall
Represented By: Sofia Ritala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deka International S.A. Luxembourg
Represented By: James W Johnson
Represented By: Michael H. Rogers
Represented By: Francis P. McConville
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho
Represented By: James W Johnson
Represented By: Michael H. Rogers
Represented By: Francis P. McConville
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Truong
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dennis Richerson
Represented By: Adam Marc Apton
Represented By: Adam Christopher McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?