Grutman v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Grutman
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Case Number: 3:2022cv00992
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2024. Further Case Management Conference reset from 11/7/2023 to 1/30/2024, at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 2:20 PM.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 2, 2023 Filing 52 FIFTH JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Barbara Grutman and Ford Motor Company. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/2/2023) Modified on 11/3/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #50 STIPULTION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES and REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 27, 2023 Filing 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Barbara Grutman and Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 9/27/2023) Modified on 9/28/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #47 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE JURISDICTION. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2023)
August 1, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Gurpreet Sandhu and Request to Remove Counsel from Electronic Service List (Sandhu, Gurpreet) (Filed on 8/1/2023)
July 27, 2023 Filing 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Jurisdiction filed by Barbara Grutman and Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/27/2023) Modified on 7/28/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE by Barbara Grutman of withdrawal of counsel (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann LaRocque (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 13, 2023 Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEUDLING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2023. Further Case Management Conference reset from 7/18/2023 to 11/7/2023, at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 2:20 PMWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2023)
July 13, 2023 Filing 43 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/13/2023. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2023)
July 12, 2023 Filing 42 Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Barbara Grutman. Responses due by 7/26/2023. Replies due by 8/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/12/2023) Modified on 7/13/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/13/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Rabiya F. Tirmizi (Tirmizi, Rabiya) (Filed on 7/11/2023)
July 11, 2023 Filing 39 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2023, at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 2:20 PM.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2023)
May 30, 2023 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/30/2023. Digital Recording Time: 3:21-3:25. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/30/2023)
April 25, 2023 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/25/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2023, at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2023. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Total Time in Court: 8 Minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2023)
April 24, 2023 Filing 37 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Barbara Grutman. Amendment to #36 Joint Case Management Statement Third. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 4/24/2023)
April 18, 2023 Filing 36 THIRD JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Barbara Grutman and Ford Motor Cmpany. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 4/18/2023) Modified on 4/19/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/19/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2023 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/14/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2023 at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2023. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPTING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG IN TO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 2:20 PM.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Digital Recording Time: 2:35-2:40. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2023)
February 14, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2023)
February 13, 2023 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2023 at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG IN TO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 2:20 PMWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 7, 2023 Filing 32 SECOND JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Barbara Grutman and Ford Motor Company. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 2/7/2023) Modified on 2/8/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2022 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M Chen: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/20/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2023, at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only via Zoom. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2023. Total Time in Court: 23 Minutes. Court Reporter: Ronelle Corbey. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/20/2022)
September 14, 2022 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2022, at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/20 22)
September 14, 2022 Filing 29 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (First Amended) filed by Barbara Grutman and Ford Motor Company. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 9/14/2022) Modified on 9/15/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2022 Filing 28 PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Barbara Grutman. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 9/13/2022) Modified on 9/14/2022 (jrs, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Judge initials are missing. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Re: #27 Notice of Appearance filed by Ford Motor Company (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
August 1, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Gurpreet Sandhu (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sandhu, Gurpreet) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
June 22, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff by Barbara Grutman (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/22/2022) Modified on 6/23/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2022 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M Chen: Motion Hearing held on 6/9/2022 re #10 MOTION to Dismiss; Court Granted #10 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is due by 7/11/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2022, at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2022. Total Time in Court: 18 Minutes. Court Reporter: Joan Columbini. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/9/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Law (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 7, 2022 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING TIME AND PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS RE #10 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing reset to 6/9/2022 at 02:30 PM by Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Perso ns granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
May 13, 2022 Filing 22 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 5/13/2022) Modified on 5/16/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2022 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by Barbara Grutman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Late Opposition)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 5/9/2022) Modified on 5/10/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2022 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 5/9/2022)
May 3, 2022 Filing 19 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022)
May 2, 2022 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 5/2/2022) Modified on 5/3/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel S. Harman-Holmes (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 12, 2022 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING AND ZOOM NOTICE. Motion Hearing as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss set for 6/9/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Regardless of whether the Court reschedules the hearing date, all opposition and reply papers shall be timely filed pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-7(d). Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcCourt Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court a s making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at emccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 6/7/2022 by 3:00 PM PDT.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #10 )(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2022)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 04/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation (parent of State Street Bank and Trust Company, which is the trustee of the Ford defined contribution plans), Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A. (fiduciary of the Ford defined contribution plan), Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group and certain affiliates for Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/18/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ford Motor Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 4/25/2022. Replies due by 5/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Eric D. Sentlinger, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Eric D. Sentlinger, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dean Sentlinger (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
March 14, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barbara Grutman re #1 Complaint, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #4 Summons Issued, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barbara Grutman (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/4/2022. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demandfor Violation of Statutory Obligations against DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16917181.). Filed by Barbara Grutman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015 Fusion Owner Manual, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 2/17/2022) Modified on 2/18/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grutman v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Grutman
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Eric Dean Sentlinger
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Gurpreet Sandhu
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?