K. D. et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: K. D. and B. R. D.
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Noramco, McKinsey & Company Inc. United States and West Virginia Board of Pharmacy
Case Number: 3:2022cv01442
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 5:21-cv-00473. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 7, 2022 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:21-md-02996-CRB; Southern District of West Virginia, 5:21-cv-00473 K.D. v. Johnson & Johnson, opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-01442-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (wsn-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022)
March 3, 2022 Filing 14 TRANSFER ORDER, JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of California transferring this action to the USDC/CAND for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel on 3/3/2022. (cc: attys) (kew)
December 13, 2021 Filing 13 TRANSFER ORDER FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: MDL 2804 and MDL 2996. (kew)
December 10, 2021 Filing 12 TRANSFER ORDER FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: MDL 2804 and MDL 2996. (kew)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION set for 12/2/2021 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Original filed before the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (kew)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing that this case is stayed and retired to the inactive docket pending the MDL decision on a conditional transfer order; in the event the MDL panel decides not to file a conditional transfer order in the case, the parties are directed to inform the Court of such within 15 days of the MDL panel decision. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 8/29/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (btm)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME to Respond to Complaint by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, K. D., B. R. D. to thirty (30) days after certain rulings (Williams, Marc) (Modified on 8/28/2021 to add party filers) (mk).
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT MOTION by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States for an Immediate Stay of all Further Proceedings and Deadlines Pending Transfer of This Action to Multidistrict Litigation re: #1 Notice of Removal (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(George, Keith)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Noramco to Respond to Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal by Noramco, K. D., B. R. D. to 30 days after certain rulings. (Mowen, Kelly) (Modified on 8/26/2021 to add party filers) (mk).
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Williams, Marc)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for McKinsey & Company, Inc. to respond to Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal, to 30 days after certain rulings by McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States (George, Keith) (Modified on 8/26/2021 to add party filers) (mk).
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States (George, Keith)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for West Virginia Board of Pharmacy to respond to Complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal by West Virginia Board of Pharmacy, K. D., B. R. D. to 30 days after certain rulings (Taylor, Justin) (Modified on 8/25/2021 to add party filers) (mk).
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (msa)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Wyoming County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8017958. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (msa)
August 24, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K. D. et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. D.
Represented By: Alexander D. McLaughlin
Represented By: Benjamin D. Adams
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Represented By: W. Jesse Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. R. D.
Represented By: Alexander D. McLaughlin
Represented By: Benjamin D. Adams
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Represented By: W. Jesse Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Alexander Chesney Frampton
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Chesney Frampton
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco
Represented By: Jon B. Orndorff
Represented By: Kelly Calder Mowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By: David S. Russo
Represented By: John C. Palmer, IV
Represented By: Keith J. George
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Represented By: John Campbell Palmer, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Board of Pharmacy
Represented By: Justin C. Taylor
Represented By: Michael W. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?