Stowell v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Stowell
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America and Liberty Mutual Insurance
Case Number: 3:2022cv01561
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Filing 18 RENEWED STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA AND LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANYS TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America and Matthew Stowell. (Ghalumyan, Hayk) (Filed on 5/4/2022) Modified on 5/5/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION (THIRD) TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America and Matthew Stowell. (Ghalumyan, Hayk) (Filed on 4/18/2022) Modified on 4/19/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2022 Filing 16 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2022, 01:00 PM, via Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: b> Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, May 26, 2022, by 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2022)
March 31, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION (SECOND) TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America and Matthew Stowell. (Ghalumyan, Hayk) (Filed on 3/31/2022) Modified on 4/1/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 03/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/28/2022. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 25, 2022 Filing 12 Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 3/25/2022 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
March 25, 2022 Filing 11 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
March 25, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
March 25, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Liberty Mutual Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America.. (Ghalumyan, Hayk) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
March 18, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matthew Stowell.. (Asbill-Bearor, Natalia) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 16, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Liberty Mutual Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of America, Other Affiliate Matthew Stowell for Liberty Mutual Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Russum, Blake) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Approving #4 Stipulation to Extend Defendants Safeco Insurance Company of America and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company's Time to Respond to Complaint. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 14, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2022 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 STIPULATION To Extend Defendants Safeco Insurance Company of America and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America and Matthew Stowell. (Russum, Blake) (Filed on 3/14/2022) Modified on 3/14/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2022 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ROBIN K. PERKINS. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America. Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 11, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022)
March 11, 2022 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: HAYK GHALUMYAN. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Notice of Removal, fil ed by Liberty Mutual Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America. Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022)
March 11, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/25/2022. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Liberty Mutual Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for Liberty Mutual Insurance; Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of America for Safeco Insurance Company of America. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Russum, Blake) (Filed on 3/11/2022)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court with jury demand (no process). Their case number is 21CV390807. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-16984337). Filed byLiberty Mutual Insurance, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Kennedy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Russum, Blake) (Filed on 3/11/2022) Modified on 3/14/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stowell v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Stowell
Represented By: Natalia D. Asbill-Bearor
Represented By: Robin Kerry Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Hayk Ghalumyan
Represented By: Blake Justin Russum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Hayk Ghalumyan
Represented By: Blake Justin Russum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?