Navarrette v. Options Recovery Services et al
Plaintiff: Tommy Navarrette and Tomas Navarrette
Defendant: Options Recovery Services, George K.L. Smith, Brianna Herron and Pamela Thomas
Case Number: 3:2022cv02156
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Brianna Herron, Options Recovery Services, George K.L. Smith, Pamela Thomas. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2022 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 6/7/2022. Replies due by 6/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Linkert, Richard) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Brianna Herron served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Options Recovery Services served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; George K.L. Smith served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022; Pamela Thomas served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Options Recovery Services, #2 Smith, #3 Thomas)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of summons from USMS. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
April 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tomas Navarrette Case Management Scheduling Order Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Pamela Thomas, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service George K.L. Smith, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Breanne Herron, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service Receipt & Tracking)(Navarrette, Tomas) (Filed on 4/16/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2022 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2022.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/8/2022. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 04/06/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Brianna Herron, Options Recovery Services, George K.L. Smith, Pamela Thomas. (Attachments: #1 USM 285, #2 USM 285, #3 USM 285, #4 USM 285)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2022)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. The Clerk will now reassign this case to a United States District Judge because one or more of the parties has requested reassignment to a United States DistrictJudge or has not consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re: Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #3 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tommy Navarrette.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2022)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tommy Navarrette. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2022)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brianna Herron, Options Recovery Services, George K.L. Smith, Pamela Thomas. Filed byTommy Navarrette. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarrette v. Options Recovery Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Navarrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Navarrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Options Recovery Services
Represented By: Richard Stone Linkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George K.L. Smith
Represented By: Richard Stone Linkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brianna Herron
Represented By: Richard Stone Linkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Thomas
Represented By: Richard Stone Linkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?