Gunn et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Gunn and Dustin Stafford
Defendant: FCA US, LLC and Stellantis N.V.
Case Number: 3:2022cv02229
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., Other Affiliate FCA North America holdings LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Foreign Sales Holdco Ltd. (UK), Other Affiliate SFS UK1 Limited (UK) for FCA US, LLC. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Carnevale, Alexander) (Filed on 6/3/2022) Modified on 6/6/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by FCA US, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/17/2022. Replies due by 6/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carnevale, Alexander) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
June 2, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander M Carnevale (Carnevale, Alexander) (Filed on 6/2/2022)
May 16, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/3/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 05/02/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
May 2, 2022 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
May 2, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US, LLC.. (Riccomini, Kacey) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
May 2, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/16/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
April 29, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation for Extension of Time for FCA US LLC to File Responsive Pleading Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1 filed by FCA US, LLC. (Riccomini, Kacey) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 20, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Gunn, Dustin Stafford. FCA US, LLC served on 4/13/2022, answer due 5/4/2022. (Gibboney, Kyla) (Filed on 4/20/2022)
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dustin Stafford.. (Gibboney, Kyla) (Filed on 4/20/2022)
April 20, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Gunn.. (Gibboney, Kyla) (Filed on 4/20/2022)
April 20, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dustin Stafford (Gibboney, Kyla) (Filed on 4/20/2022)
April 20, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by James Gunn (Gibboney, Kyla) (Filed on 4/20/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FCA US, LLC, Stellantis N.V. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/25/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Stein, David) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US, LLC, Stellantis N.V. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17072731.). Filed byJames Gunn, Dustin Stafford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyla Gibboney, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stein, David) (Filed on 4/8/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunn et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gunn
Represented By: David K. Stein
Represented By: Kyla Jenny Gibboney
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Stafford
Represented By: David K. Stein
Represented By: Kyla Jenny Gibboney
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Kacey Renee Riccomini
Represented By: Alexander M Carnevale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stellantis N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?