Synopsys, Inc. v. Khanh
Plaintiff: Synopsys, Inc.
Defendant: Phan Van Khanh
Case Number: 3:2022cv02546
Filed: April 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 16 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/15/2022. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Synopsys is directed to email a Microsoft Word version of a proposed preliminary injunction order to jdpo@cand.uscourts.gov by June 16, 2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/8/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 2, 2022 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 6/2/2022. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2022)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #8 Motion for (1) Temporary Restraining Order; (2) Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; (3) Order for Expedited Discovery; and (4) Order Authorizing Alternative Service. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/2/2022 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/9/2022. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2022)
May 9, 2022 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2022. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2022)
May 4, 2022 Filing 11 Declaration of Denise M. Mingrone in Support of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (2) Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; (3) Order For Expedited Discovery; and (4) Order Authorizing Service Of Process; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof [Supplemental Mingrone Decl. ISO Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion TRO] filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
May 4, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Luis Uriarte (Uriarte, Robert) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. A hearing on the motion for temporary restraining order, Dkt. No. #8 , is set for May 9, 2022, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/3/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022)
April 29, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (2) Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; (3) Order For Expedited Discovery; and (4) Order Authorizing Service Of Process; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Denise Mingrone Declaration ISO Synopsys, Inc.s Ex Parte Motion for TRO; Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A to D. Mingrone Declaration ISO Synopsys, Inc. Ex Parte Motion for TRO, #3 Declaration Norman F. Kelly Declaration ISO Synopsys, Inc. Ex Parte Motion for TRO, #4 Declaration Daniel E. Roffman Declaration ISO Synopsys, Inc. Ex Parte Motion for TRO, #5 Proposed Order)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 27, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING A COPYRIGHT. The provisions of17 U.S.C. 508 require the submission of a report to theRegister of Copyrights. Please e-file a proposed Report onthe Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regardinga Copyright form AO 121 using the event Civil Events Other Filings Notices Notice (Other), within five daysof this notice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 27, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Phan Van Khanh. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Synopsys, Inc. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Phan Van Khanh ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17121287.). Filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 4/26/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synopsys, Inc. v. Khanh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synopsys, Inc.
Represented By: Denise Marie Mingrone
Represented By: Robert Luis Uriarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phan Van Khanh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?