Hancock County Board of Education et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al (TV2)
Plaintiff: Hancock County Board of Education and Hamblen County Board of Education
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc., McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States and McKinsey & Company Inc. Washington D.C.
Case Number: 3:2022cv02940
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00195. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 18, 2022 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Eastern District of Tennessee, 2:21-cv-00195-TAV-CRW, Hancock County Board of Education v. McKinsey & Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-02940-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 25 cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 13, 2022 Filing 19 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-25) transferring case to the MDL Panel for the Northern District of California. (AMP)
May 13, 2022 Case transferred to the Northern District of California. (AMP)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/18/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2023 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/25/22. (JBR)
January 31, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Withdrawal of Appearances of Matthew J. Piers, Charles D. Wysong, Emily R. Brown, and Margaret E. Truesdale Attorney Matthew J Piers and Margaret Truesdale terminated. (Piers, Matthew)
January 12, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE by Hamblen County Board of Education, Hancock County Board of Education re #1 Complaint, Errata to Complaint (Eldridge, David)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cyrus Mehri. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for C Bronstein. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua Karsh. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 01/10/2022. (Copy of Order mailed to Cyrus Mehri & C Bronstein) (CAT)
January 7, 2022 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Hancock County Board of Education, Hamblen County Board of Education, #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Hancock County Board of Education, Hamblen County Board of Education, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Hancock County Board of Education, Hamblen County Board of Education (ABF)
January 5, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Joshus Karsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90, Receipt #K3043983.) by Hamblen County Board of Education, Hancock County Board of Education. (ABF)
January 5, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for C Ezra Bronstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3043983.) by Hamblen County Board of Education, Hancock County Board of Education. (ABF)
January 5, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Cyrus Mehri to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3043983.) by Hamblen County Board of Education, Hancock County Board of Education. (ABF)
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hancock County Board of Education, Hamblen County Board of Education. All Defendants. (Eldridge, David)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 12/29/2021. (Copy of Order mailed to John Wayne Hogan and Leslie A. Goller) (AMP)
December 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90, Receipt number G2013446) by Leslie A. Goller for Hancock County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(AGG)
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Wayne Hogan (Filing fee $ 90 Receipt number G2013445) by Hancock County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(AGG)
December 28, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90, receipt number G2013445) filed by John Wayne Hogan for Hancock County Board of Education, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90, receipt number 2013446) filed by Leslie A. Goller for Hancock County Board of Education (AGG)
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary R. Walden on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Walden, Zachary)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/15/2021. (BDG)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/15/2021. (BDG)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/15/2021. (BDG)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Wayne Hogan, Leslie Goller,C Bronstein, Cyrus Mehri,Joshua Karsh, Margaret Truesdale, Matthew J Piers, Allison Cross and Neil L Henrichsen are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (Attachments: #1, #2, #3 )(BDG)Notice mailed to attorneys.
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (BDG)
December 15, 2021 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (BDG)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4921432.), filed by Hancock County Board of Education, Hamblen County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Other civil cover sheet)(Eldridge, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock County Board of Education et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hancock County Board of Education
Represented By: Allison Cross
Represented By: C Bronstein
Represented By: Cyrus Mehri
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Leslie Goller
Represented By: Margaret Truesdale
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Represented By: Neil L Henrichsen
Represented By: Tasha C Blakney
Represented By: Wayne Hogan
Represented By: Zachary R. Walden
Represented By: David M Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamblen County Board of Education
Represented By: Allison Cross
Represented By: C Bronstein
Represented By: Cyrus Mehri
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Leslie Goller
Represented By: Margaret Truesdale
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Represented By: Neil L Henrichsen
Represented By: Tasha C Blakney
Represented By: Wayne Hogan
Represented By: Zachary R. Walden
Represented By: David M Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. Washington D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?