Britton v. Templin
Plaintiff: Donald Britton
Defendant: C.E.O. Mark Templin doing business as Toyota Financial Services
Case Number: 3:2022cv03468
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to C.E.O. MARK TEMPLIN OF TOYOTA FINANCIAL SERVICES by Donald Britton (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to CEO Mark Templin by Donald Britton (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022) Modified on 7/15/2022 (msr, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying #5 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 8, 2022 Remark: Docket nos. #8 and #11 were mailed to Plaintiff at 2748 El Rey Street in Antioch on July 8, 2022. Address updated on ECF. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2022)
June 28, 2022 Filing 10 Mail returned as undeliverable re #8 Clerk's Notice Util - Teleconference Zoom (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 23, 2022 Filing 9 Mail returned as undeliverable re #6 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2022)
June 15, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2022. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/29/2022 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than by noon on 9/28/2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022)A copy of this notice was mailed to Plaintiff on June 15, 2022.
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 06/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 14, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)copy placed in O:drive for mailing on 6/14/2022
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by Donald Britton. Responses due by 6/27/2022. Replies due by 7/5/2022. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Donald Britton.. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mark Templin. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Templin doing business asToyota Financial Services (Filing fee $ 402.). Filed byDonald Britton. (Attachments: #1 Receipt $402 #44611017508, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britton v. Templin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.E.O. Mark Templin doing business as Toyota Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?