In Re Meta Pixel Healthcare Litigation
Plaintiff: John Doe, Doe, John Doe II, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Malinda Smidga, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Jane Doe III, C.C., David Smart and C. M.
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc., Michael Krackenberger, The Regents of the University of California, Novant Health, Inc., Northwestern Memorial Hospital, Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Instagram LLC and Main Line Health
Petitioner: JANE DOE
Intervenor Defendant: Dignity Health Medical Foundation
Interested Party: Katrina Calderon and Danielle Calderon
Consolidated Plaintiff: Nancy Murphy, Robert Stewart, Alistair Stewart, Patrick Santoro, Jessica Landis, Diana Williams and Alicia Bell
Consolidated Defendant: Advocate Aurora Health, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv03580
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
2 Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Filing 393 Statement re #388 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mahnam Ghorbani, #2 Proposed Order)(Ghorbani, Mahnam) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 392 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/14/23 before Judge William H. Orrick by Doe, for Court Reporter Jan Davis. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 391 NOTICE of Refiled Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order at Dkt. #372 by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe III re #372 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Rule 37 Motion for Sanctions to Enforce Dkt. 275, The Court's June 13, 2023 Order for Production of Documents Responsive to Requests for Production Nos. 5-7, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Rule 37 Motion for Sanctions to Enforce Dkt. 275, The Court's June 13, 2023 Order for Production of Documents Responsive to Requests for Production Nos. 5-7for, #3 Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions to Enforce Dkt. 275, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes, #6 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes, #7 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes, #8 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes, #9 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes, #10 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes, #11 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes, #12 Exhibit 34 to Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes, #13 Exhibit 42 to Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes, #14 Exhibit 44 to Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes)(Mura, Andre) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 390 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #386 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document #382 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 15, 2023 Filing 389 Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to #387 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Strike Paragraph 357 (Reason: Correcting an error) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 12/7/2023. Replies due by 12/21/2023. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 15, 2023 Filing 388 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Unredacted Version of Motion to Dismiss)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 15, 2023 Filing 387 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Strike Paragraph 357 filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 1/17/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Responses due by 11/29/2023. Replies due by 12/6/2023. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 15, 2023 Filing 386 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 384 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting #375 , #376 Motions to Relate Cases. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 15, 2023 Filing 383 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/07/2023 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Recorded Proceeding - San Jose. (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 14, 2023 Filing 385 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 11/14/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. (Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2024). Close of Fact Discovery: 10/18/2024. Hearing on Motion for Class Certification set for 7/16/2025 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2026 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 9/9/2026 08:30 AM, both in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Total Time in Court: 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Janet Davis. Plaintiff Attorney: Geoffrey Graber. Defendant Attorney: Lauren R. Goldman and Darcy Harris. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2023)
November 14, 2023 Filing 382 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Motion to Strike Paragraph 357 filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 1/17/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Responses due by 12/7/2023. Replies due by 12/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/14/2023) Modified on 11/15/2023 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2023 Filing 381 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/07/2023 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by John Doe, for Recorded Proceeding - San Jose. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 380 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. SEALED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #323 Plaintiffs' Rule 37 Motion for Sanctions. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023) Modified on 11/13/2023 (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 379 REDACTED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #323 Plaintiffs' Rule 37 Motion for Sanctions. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
November 13, 2023 Filing 378 CLERKS NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2023 at 2:00 p.m. will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 377 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 376 Joint MOTION to Relate Case filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darcy C. Harris in Support of Motion to Relate, #2 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 375 Joint MOTION to Relate Case filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darcy C. Harris in Support of Motion to Relate, #2 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 374 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Motion Hearing re #323 Motion for Sanctions (Redacted version -- Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Rule 37 Motion For Sanctions To Enforce Dkt. 275, The Courts June 13, 2023 Order for Production of Documents Responsive To Requests For Production Nos. 5-7) filed by John Doe, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe I held on 11/7/2023.The Court ordered the proceeding SEALED. The transcript is accessible only by court order.Court heard oral argument. Court to issue order.Plaintiff Attorney: Jay Barnes, Jennifer Paulson, Geoffrey Graber. Defendant Attorney: Elizabeth McCloskey, Matt Regan. Representative: Ariel Ruiz.Digital Recording Liberty: 10:21-11:50 a.m. Total: 1 Hr. 29 Mins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/7/2023)
November 6, 2023 Filing 373 Statement re #358 Objection, Statement in Support of Opposition to Relation of Cases by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #325 , #326 , #350 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Plaintiffs' motion #325 granted. Plaintiffs' motion #326 granted, as narrowed by Meta. Plaintiffs to e-filed revised PDFs by 11/16/2023. Meta's motion #350 granted. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi provisionally granting #370 Meta's unopposed request to seal November 7, 2023 discovery hearing. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 6, 2023 Filing 370 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CLOSE NOVEMBER 7 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION (DKT. 275) (CORRECTED) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 11/7/2023. (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #334 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed portions of the First Amended Complaint for Compelling Justifications Shown. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 368 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #333 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal portions of the First Amended Complaint for Compelling Justifications Shown. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 3, 2023 Filing 367 **Filed in Error - Pls. Refer to Docket #370 ** - ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Seal November 7 Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion (Dkt. 275) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 11/7/2023. (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/3/2023) Modified on 11/6/2023 (tn, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 366 RELATED CASE ORDER. Case No. 23-cv-0550-SI is found to be related to this action. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/3/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 365 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #363 Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Propose Data Sources and Search Terms for Plaintiffs' ESI. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2023)
November 1, 2023 Received one CD-R re #326 Ex. 8 to Decl. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2023) Modified on 11/1/2023 (amk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/1/2023 (amk, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2023 Filing 364 Statement re #360 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases (Statement in Support of Relation of Cases) by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 31, 2023 Filing 363 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Plaintiffs' ESI Proposals filed by Doe. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 362 RELATED CASE ORDER. Case No. 23-cv-4784 is found to be related. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/27/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 26, 2023 Filing 361 REPLY (re #323 MOTION for Sanctions (Redacted version -- Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Rule 37 Motion For Sanctions To Enforce Dkt. 275, The Courts June 13, 2023 Order for Production of Documents Responsive To Requests For Production Nos. 5-7) ) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce, #2 Declaration of Dr. Timothy Libert in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions to Enforce Dkt. 275)(Mura, Andre) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 26, 2023 Filing 360 Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 22-cv-5500-SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/26/2023. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND ESTABLISH MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge William H. Orrick granting #357 Stipulation. Hearing on Motion to Dismiss set for 1/17/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 25, 2023 Filing 358 OBJECTIONS to #355 Order Relating Case , Consolidation, and Request to Separate the Actions by C. M. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yana Hart in Support of Plaintiff C.M.'s Objections to Court Order Relating Cases, Objections to Consolidation, and Request to Separate the Actions, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Hart, Yana) (Filed on 10/25/2023) Modified on 10/26/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2023 Filing 357 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Establish Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/24/2023)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #353 Stipulation to Extend Time for Reply re Motion for Sanctions. Reply due by 10/26/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2023)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER RELATING CASE No. 23-cv-4179-JST. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/24/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2023)
October 23, 2023 Filing 354 Statement of Non-Opposition re #345 Statement filed byDoe, John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe III. (Related document(s) #345 ) (Torchiana, Claire) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 23, 2023 Filing 353 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #349 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, #323 MOTION for Sanctions (Redacted version -- Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Rule 37 Motion For Sanctions To Enforce Dkt. 275, The Courts June 13, 2023 Order for Production of Documents Responsive To Requests For Production Nos. 5-7) (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to File Plaintiffs Reply to Opposition to Plaintiffs Rule 37 Motion For Sanctions to Enforce Dkt. 275, The Courts June 13, 2023 Order for Production of Documents Responsive to Requests For Production Nos. 5-7 [Dkt. 323]) filed by Doe, John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #351 Stipulated Addendum to ESI Protocol. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 351 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Addendum to ESI Protocol filed by Doe. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 17, 2023 Filing 350 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Parts of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Goldman, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions (Filed Under Seal), #4 Declaration of Tobias Woolbridge (Filed Under Seal), #5 Declaration of Darcy Harris (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 2 to D. Harris Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 3 to D. Harris Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 4 to D. Harris Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 7 to D. Harris Declaration (Filed Under Seal))(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2023)
October 17, 2023 Filing 349 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #323 MOTION for Sanctions (Redacted version -- Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Rule 37 Motion For Sanctions To Enforce Dkt. 275, The Courts June 13, 2023 Order for Production of Documents Responsive To Requests For Production Nos. 5-7) ) (Redacted) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tobias Woolbridge (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Darcy C. Harris (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 1 to D. Harris Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to D. Harris Declaration (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 3 to D. Harris Declaration (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 4 to D. Harris Declaration (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 5 to D. Harris Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to D. Harris Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to D. Harris Declaration (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 8 to D. Harris Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to D. Harris Declaration)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2023)
October 17, 2023 Filing 348 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman in Support of #334 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PARTYS MATERIALS SHOULD BE SEALED filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #334 ) (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2023)
October 17, 2023 Filing 347 EXHIBITS re #334 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PARTYS MATERIALS SHOULD BE SEALED (Unredacted Proposed Revised Sealed Version of (Dkt 334-3) First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #334 ) (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2023)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 346 RELATED CASE ORDER. Case No. 23-cv-4411-JSW is found to be related. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/17/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2023)
October 16, 2023 Filing 345 Statement re #343 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases (in Support of Relation of Cases) by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 344 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 22-cv-3580-WHO. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 12, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 343 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 22-cv-3580-WHO. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS FILED IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge William H. Orrick granting #331 Stipulation. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #329 Motion to Relate Case No. 23-cv-04821-LJC. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 340 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman in Support of #326 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #326 ) (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 339 EXHIBITS re #326 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed (Proposed Revised Sealed Version of Exhibit 3 (Dkt 326-5)) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Proposed Revised Sealed Version of Exhibit 9 (Dkt 326-8)), #2 Exhibit (Proposed Revised Sealed Version of Exhibit 20 (Dkt 326-13)), #3 Exhibit (Proposed Revised Sealed Version of Exhibit 31 (Dkt 326-15)), #4 Exhibit (Proposed Revised Sealed Version of Exhibit 32 (Dkt 326-16)), #5 Exhibit (Proposed Revised Sealed Version of Exhibit 34 (Dkt 326-17)), #6 Exhibit (Proposed Revised Sealed Version of Exhibit 42 (Dkt 326-18)))(Related document(s) #326 ) (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 338 EXHIBITS re #326 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed (Proposed Revised Sealed Version of Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes(Dkt 326-4)) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #326 ) (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 337 EXHIBITS re #326 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed (Proposed Revised Sealed Version of Proposed Order (Dkt 326-3)) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #326 ) (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 336 EXHIBITS re #326 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed (Proposed Revised Sealed Version of Motion for Sanctions (Dkt 326-2)) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #326 ) (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 335 AMENDED COMPLAINT - FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Meta Platforms, Inc.. Filed byJohn Doe II, John Doe, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III, Jane Doe I. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Mura, Andre) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 334 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PARTYS MATERIALS SHOULD BE SEALED filed by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jay Barnes in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Materials Should Be Sealed, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [UNREDACTED] FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT)(Mura, Andre) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 333 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE INFORMATION UNDER SEAL filed by Doe, John Doe, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jay Barnes in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Information Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [UNREDACTED] FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT)(Mura, Andre) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 332 EXHIBITS re #331 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Unseal Documents Filed in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byJohn Doe. (Related document(s) #331 ) (Terrell, Beth) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 331 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Unseal Documents Filed in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe. (Terrell, Beth) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 330 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/19/2023, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stephen W. Franklin, telephone number (561)313-8439. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #322 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/31/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2024. (Related documents(s) #322 ) (Franklin, Stephen) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 329 Joint MOTION to Relate Case filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darcy C. Harris in Support of Motion to Relate, #2 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 5, 2023 Filing 328 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Jane Doe. Responses due by 10/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy E. Tabor in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related)(Caddell, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
October 3, 2023 Filing 327 EXHIBITS re #324 Declaration in Support,, (Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Jay Barnes) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Jay Barnes)(Related document(s) #324 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/3/2023)
October 3, 2023 Filing 326 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jenny Paulson, #2 Unredacted Version - Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Rule 37 Motion For Sanctions To Enforce Dkt. 275, The Courts June 13, 2023 Order for Production of Documents Responsive To Requests For Production Nos. 5-7, #3 Unredacted Version - Proposed Order, #4 Unredacted Version - Declaration of Jay Barnes, #5 Unredacted Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #6 Unredacted Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #7 Unredacted Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #8 Unredacted Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #9 Unredacted Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #10 Unredacted Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #11 Unredacted Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #12 Unredacted Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #13 Unredacted Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #14 Unredacted Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #15 Unredacted Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #16 Unredacted Exhibit 32 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #17 Unredacted Exhibit 34 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #18 Unredacted Exhibit 42 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #19 Unredacted Exhibit 44 to Declaration of Jay Barnes, #20 Unredacted Exhibit 45 to Declaration of Jay Barnes)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/3/2023)
October 3, 2023 Filing 325 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Exhibits 2 and 35 to Declaration of Jay Barnes) filed by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jenny Paulson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to Barnes Declaration, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 35 to Barnes Declaration)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/3/2023)
October 3, 2023 Filing 324 Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes in Support of #323 MOTION for Sanctions (Redacted version -- Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Rule 37 Motion For Sanctions To Enforce Dkt. 275, The Courts June 13, 2023 Order for Production of Documents Responsive To Requests For Production Nos. 5-7) (Redacted Version) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibits 1-10, #2 Redacted Exhibits 11-20, #3 Redacted Exhibits 21-30, #4 Redacted Exhibits 31-37, #5 Redacted Exhibits 38-40, #6 Redacted Exhibits 41-45)(Related document(s) #323 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/3/2023)
October 3, 2023 Filing 323 MOTION for Sanctions (Redacted version -- Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Rule 37 Motion For Sanctions To Enforce Dkt. 275, The Courts June 13, 2023 Order for Production of Documents Responsive To Requests For Production Nos. 5-7) filed by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 10/17/2023. Replies due by 10/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Redacted Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Dr. Timothy Libert, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Dr. Timothy Libert)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/3/2023)
September 22, 2023 Filing 322 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/19/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by John Doe, for Court Reporter Stephen Franklin. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 9/22/2023)
September 19, 2023 Filing 321 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 9/19/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference (Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2023). Total Time in Court: 5 minutes. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin. Plaintiff Attorneys: Geoffrey Graber and Jay Barnes. Defendant Attorneys: Lauren R. Goldman and Elizabeth McCloskey. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2023)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Judge William H. Orrick granting #318 Stipulation. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2023)
September 18, 2023 Filing 319 CLERKS NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 09/19/2023 at 2:00 p.m. will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2023)
September 18, 2023 Filing 318 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Doe. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 9/18/2023)
September 12, 2023 Filing 317 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 9/12/2023)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER ON #222 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2023)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #293 August 11, 2023 Discovery Dispute. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
September 5, 2023 Filing 314 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/16/23, before Judge William Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #307 Transcript Order, #304 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/26/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2023. (Related documents(s) #307 , #304 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 9/5/2023)
September 1, 2023 Filing 313 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/18/2023, before Judge WHO. Court Reporter/Transcriber SA ZIELIE, telephone number 9035901065. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 9/22/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2023. (Zielie, Susan) (Filed on 9/1/2023)
August 25, 2023 Filing 312 Statement re #302 Discovery Order on Discovery Dispute by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Interrogatory Responses)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 8/25/2023)
August 25, 2023 Filing 311 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/22/23, before Judge Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Court Reporter/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: 11:11 - 12:01. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #305 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 9/15/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2023. (Related documents(s) #305 ) (Jauregui, Tara) (Filed on 8/25/2023)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 310 CASE CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/23/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2023)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #306 Motion to Relate Case No. 23-cv-3620. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2023)
August 23, 2023 Filing 308 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 22, 2023 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by John Doe, for Court Reporter Recorded Proceeding - San Jose. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 8/23/2023) Transcriber - Tara Jauregui, email: echoreporting@yahoo.com Modified on 8/23/2023 (kab, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2023 Filing 307 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/16/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by John Doe, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 8/23/2023)
August 22, 2023 Filing 306 Joint MOTION to Relate Case filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darcy C. Harris, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 8/22/2023)
August 22, 2023 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/22/23 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Recorded Proceeding - San Francisco. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 8/22/2023) Transcriber - Tara Jauregui, email: echoreporting@yahoo.com Modified on 8/23/2023 (kab, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2023 Filing 304 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/16/23 before Judge William H. Orrick by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 8/22/2023)
August 22, 2023 Filing 303 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Discovery Hearing re Joint Discovery Letter #293 held on 8/22/2023.The Court heard oral argument. The Court to issue the order.Plaintiff Attorney: Geoffrey Graber. Eric Kafka, Jay Barnes. Defendant Attorney: Elizabeth McCloskey. No Court ReporterDigital Recording Liberty: 11:11-12:01am. Total: 50 minutes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/22/2023)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 302 INTERIM ORDER re #293 August 11, 2023 Discovery Dispute. Meta supplemental statement due by 8/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 8/22/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2023)
August 18, 2023 Filing 301 NOTICE by John Doe 1, John Doe 2 Withdrawal of Counsel of Record (Minder, Rachel) (Filed on 8/18/2023)
August 16, 2023 Filing 300 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 8/16/2023 re #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. Total Time in Court: 59 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Geoffrey Graber and Jay Barnes. Defendant Attorney: Lauren R. Goldman. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/16/2023)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Related Case Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #289 Administrative Motion. Case No. 23-cv-2773-SK is found to be related. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2023)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 298 TENTATIVE ORDER IN ADVANCE OF THE AUGUST 16, 2023 HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/15/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 297 NOTICE by C.C., Doe, John Doe, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe III, Michael Krackenberger, David Smart, Malinda Smidga re #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jensen, Hanne) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 296 NOTICE by C.C., Doe, John Doe, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe III, Michael Krackenberger, David Smart, Malinda Smidga re #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jensen, Hanne) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 295 CLERKS NOTICE RE: ZOOM HEARING - The hearing on #232 Motion to Dismiss set for 08/16/2023 at 2:00 p.m. will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 294 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING. A Discovery Hearing re Joint Discovery Letter #293 is set for 8/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. This is an in court proceeding and appearances shall be in person. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 11, 2023 Filing 293 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Custodians filed by John Doe. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
August 8, 2023 Filing 292 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/18/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by John Doe, for Court Reporter Susan Zielie. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 8/8/2023)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 291 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #290 Addendum to Protective Order. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2023)
August 4, 2023 Filing 290 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #242 Protective Order, Set/Clear Flags Stipulated Addendum to Protective Order and Proposed Order filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 8/4/2023)
July 26, 2023 Filing 289 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER RELATING CASE No. 23-cv-3483. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/21/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 18, 2023 Filing 287 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 7/18/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference (Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2023). Close of Fact Discovery: 3/13/2024. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 8/27/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2025 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 12/1/2025 08:30 AM, both in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Total Time in Court: 4 minutes. Court Reporter: Susan Zielie. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/18/2023)
July 18, 2023 Filing 286 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-23-3483. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 18, 2023. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2023)
July 18, 2023 Filing 285 CLERKS NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 07/18/2023 at 2:00 p.m. will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 284 REPLY (re #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 11, 2023 Filing 283 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 7/11/2023)
June 29, 2023 Filing 282 NOTICE of Appearance by Mahnam Ghorbani (Ghorbani, Mahnam) (Filed on 6/29/2023)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #279 Defendant's Administrative Motion Requesting Extension of ESI Disclosure Deadlines. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
June 20, 2023 Filing 280 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #279 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Seeking to Extend Deadlines to Disclose ESI Sources and Search Terms ) filed byJohn Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Kafka)(Graber, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/20/2023)
June 16, 2023 Filing 279 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Seeking to Extend Deadlines to Disclose ESI Sources and Search Terms filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 6/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darcy C. Harris in Support of Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 6/16/2023)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #223 Discovery Dispute re Plaintiffs' Interrogatories Nos. 1 and 3. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2023)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #222 Discovery Dispute re "Web-Property." (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2023)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #221 May 1, 2023 Discovery Dispute re Time Period for Discovery. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2023)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #247 Discovery Dispute re Plaintiffs' Requests for Production Nos. 5-7. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2023)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #246 May 17, 2023 Discovery Dispute re Organizational Charts. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2023)
June 12, 2023 Filing 273 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe III. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/12/2023)
June 12, 2023 Filing 272 REDACTION to #222 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, #246 Joint Discovery Letter Briefwith respect to RFPs 1-4 and Interrogatory No. 4, #223 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, #221 Joint Discovery Letter Brief (Revised Redacted Version of Dkt. Nos. 221-4, 222-4, 223-4, 224-2, 246-4, 248-2) by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 6/12/2023)
June 12, 2023 Filing 271 REDACTION to #222 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, #246 Joint Discovery Letter Briefwith respect to RFPs 1-4 and Interrogatory No. 4, #247 Joint Discovery Letter Brief regarding RFP Nos. 5 to 7, #223 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, #221 Joint Discovery Letter Brief (Revised Redacted Version of Dkt. Nos. 221-3, 222-3, 223-3, 224-1, 246-3, 247-2, 248-1) by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 6/12/2023)
June 12, 2023 Filing 270 REDACTION to #246 Joint Discovery Letter Briefwith respect to RFPs 1-4 and Interrogatory No. 4 (Revised Redacted Version) by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 6/12/2023)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Order re Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #268 Stipulation. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2023) Modified text on 6/7/2023 (amk, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2023 Filing 268 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 6/5/2023)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 267 THIRD ORDER re Dispute re ESI Protocol. Parties' proposed protocol due by 6/5/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 6/2/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2023)
June 1, 2023 Filing 266 Declaration of Jamie Brown in Support of #235 Statement, as Directed in Order #258 filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #235 ) (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 6/1/2023)
June 1, 2023 Filing 265 Declaration of Sam Yang in Support of #235 Statement, as Directed in Order #258 filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #235 ) (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 6/1/2023)
June 1, 2023 Filing 264 / Joint Statement re Preservation Issues re #259 Discovery Order by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 6/1/2023)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting in part and denying in part #224 , #248 , #249 Plaintiffs' Motions to Seal. Parties to file revised redacted versions of documents by 6/12/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2023)
May 25, 2023 Filing 262 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/23/23, before Judge Magistrate Judge Virginia DeMarchi. Court Reporter/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: 11:00 - 1:25. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (257 in 3:22-cv-03580-WHO) Transcript Order, (256 in 3:22-cv-03580-WHO) Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 6/15/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2023. (Jauregui, Tara) (Filed on 5/25/2023)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 261 DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/25/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2023)
May 24, 2023 Filing 260 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman in Support of #248 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed in connection with the parties joint discovery dispute letters (ECF Nos. 246 and 247), #249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #248 , #249 ) (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 5/24/2023)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER re Preservation of Evidence; Requesting Parties' Views. Parties' joint response to order due by 6/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/24/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2023)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 258 SECOND ORDER re #235 , #253 Dispute re ESI Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/24/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2023)
May 23, 2023 Filing 257 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 23, 2023 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by John Doe, for Court Reporter not listed - San Jose. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 5/23/2023) Transcriber - Tara Jauregui, email: echoreporting@yahoo.com Modified on 5/23/2023 (kab, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2023 Filing 256 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/23/2023 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter not listed - San Francisco. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 5/23/2023) Transcriber - Tara Jauregui, email: echoreporting@yahoo.com Modified on 5/23/2023 (kab, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2023 Filing 255 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Further Discovery Hearing held on 5/23/2023 via Zoom webinar.Court to issue order.Plaintiff Attorney: Geoffrey Graber, Erick Kafka, Jason "Jay" Barnes, Nichole Ramirez. Defendant Attorney: Darcy Harris, Elizabeth McCloskey.No Court Reporter. Digital Recording Zoom: 11:00a.m.-1:25p.m. Total time: 2 Hours 25 Minutes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/23/2023)
May 22, 2023 Filing 254 CLERKS NOTICE ADVANCING DISCOVERY HEARING TIME VIA ZOOM. Please take NOTICE that the Further Discovery Hearing set for 5/23/2023 is HEREBY ADVANCED to 11:00 AM (PST) in San Jose - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vkd General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/., Set/Reset Deadlines as to Discovery Hearing set for 5/23/2023 11:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2023)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER re #235 Dispute re ESI Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/18/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2023)
May 18, 2023 Filing 252 Brief re #251 Case Management Conference - Further (Healthcare Plaintiffs Memorandum in Support of Metas Motion to Sever Claims Against Meta in the Hey Favor Action) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey Graber, #2 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #251 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/18/2023)
May 18, 2023 Filing 251 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 5/16/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference (Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2023). Hearing on Motion for Class Certification set for 9/4/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick.Total Time in Court: 12 minutes. Court Reporter: Elaine Cropper. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/18/2023)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER re Initial Disclosures. Submissions to be lodged (not filed) by 10:00 AM, 5/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/17/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2023)
May 17, 2023 Filing 249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Joint Discovery Letter Brief with respect to RFPs 1-4 and Interrogatory No. 4)(Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 5/17/2023)
May 17, 2023 Filing 248 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed in connection with the parties joint discovery dispute letters (ECF Nos. 246 and 247) filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 5/17/2023)
May 17, 2023 Filing 247 Joint Discovery Letter Brief regarding RFP Nos. 5 to 7 filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 5/17/2023)
May 17, 2023 Filing 246 Joint Discovery Letter Briefwith respect to RFPs 1-4 and Interrogatory No. 4 filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 5/17/2023)
May 17, 2023 Filing 245 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 16, 2023, before Judge Willaim H. Orrick. Court Reporter Elaine Cropper; 602-322-7245; elaine_cropper@azd.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2023. (Cropper, Elaine) (Filed on 5/17/2023)
May 17, 2023 Filing 244 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 16, 2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Jane Doe, for Court Reporter Elaine Cropper. (Fiorilla, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2023)
May 16, 2023 Filing 243 Joint Statement Regarding Coordination and Interim Discovery Deadlines by Doe. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 5/16/2023)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 242 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/16/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023)
May 16, 2023 Filing 241 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Andre Michel Mura (Mura, Andre) (Filed on 5/16/2023)
May 16, 2023 Filing 240 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Delaney Brooks (Brooks, Sara) (Filed on 5/16/2023)
May 16, 2023 Filing 239 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 16, 2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Elaine Cropper. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 5/16/2023)
May 16, 2023 Filing 238 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 16, 2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by John Doe, for Court Reporter Elaine Cropper. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 5/16/2023)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER re #231 Dispute re Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/16/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023)
May 15, 2023 Filing 236 CLERKS NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 05/16/2023 at 2:00 p.m. will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2023)
May 10, 2023 Filing 235 Statement re ESI Protocol by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed ESI Protocol, #2 Exhibit B - Meta's Proposed ESI Protocol, #3 Exhibit C - Redline, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' Declaration)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 5/10/2023)
May 9, 2023 Filing 234 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 5/9/2023)
May 8, 2023 Filing 233 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman in Support of #224 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #224 ) (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 5/8/2023)
May 8, 2023 Filing 232 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/12/2023. Replies due by 7/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Abigail A. Barrera, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 5/8/2023)
May 5, 2023 Filing 231 Statement re Protective Order by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Meta's Proposed Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C - Redline)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 5/5/2023)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #229 Stipulation to Extend Time to Submit Proposed Protective Order. Deadline extended to 5/5/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2023)
May 4, 2023 Filing 229 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 5/4/2023)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Clawback Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/2/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER re #218 Dispute re Rule 502(d) Clawback Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/2/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
May 2, 2023 Filing 226 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING VIA ZOOM WEBINAR AND NOTICE OF REQUIRED REGISTRATION. Discovery Hearing as to Joint Letter Briefs #221 , #222 , and #223 filed by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II is set for 5/23/2023 at 01:30 PM (PST) in San Jose - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vkd Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails specifying main speaker(s) must be sent to the CRD at VKDcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 5/18/2023 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
May 1, 2023 Filing 225 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II re #224 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/1/2023)
May 1, 2023 Filing 224 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #2 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/1/2023)
May 1, 2023 Filing 223 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/1/2023)
May 1, 2023 Filing 222 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/1/2023)
May 1, 2023 Filing 221 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/1/2023)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Order by Judge William H. Orrick denying without prejudice #205 contingent Motion to Relate Case, in light of stay of underlying case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2023)
April 28, 2023 Filing 219 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING FURTHER DISCOVERY HEARING VIA ZOOM WEBINAR AND NOTICE OF REQUIRED REGISTRATION. Further Discovery Hearing is set for 5/23/2023 at 01:30 PM (PST) in San Jose - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Joint Discovery Statements due by 5/16/2023. Joint discovery hearing for cases: In re Meta Pixel Healthcare Litigation (No. 3:22-cv-3580-WHO); In re Meta Pixel Tax Filing Cases (No. 3:22-cv-7557-SI); and Gershzon v. Meta Platforms, Inc. (No. 3:23-cv-00083-SI)Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vkd Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails specifying main speaker(s) must be sent to the CRD at VKDcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 5/18/2023 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2023) Modified text on 4/28/2023 (amk, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2023 Filing 218 Joint Statement re Clawback Order by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Meta's Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Redline of Meta's and Plaintiffs' Proposed Orders)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 4/27/2023)
April 27, 2023 Filing 217 Transcript of Digitally Recorded Proceedings held on April 20, 2023, before Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Transcribed by Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990/email marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #214 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2023. (Related documents(s) #214 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2023)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER Following April 20, 2023 Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 4/20/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2023)
April 20, 2023 Filing 215 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 20, 2023 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter not listed - San Jose. (Harris, Darcy) Transcriber - Marla Knox, email: marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov(Filed on 4/20/2023) Modified on 4/21/2023 (kab, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2023 Filing 214 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/20/2023 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by John Doe, for Court Reporter not listed - San Francisco. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 4/20/2023) Transcriber - Marla Knox, email: marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov Modified on 4/21/2023 (kab, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2023 Filing 213 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Discovery Hearing held on 4/20/2023. Joint/Combined discovery hearing with Cases: 3:22-cv-07557-SI In Re Metal Pixel Tax Filing Cases; and 3:23-cv-0083-SI Gershzon v. Meta Platforms, Inc.Court heard oral presentations from the parties. Court to issue a written order.Plaintiffs' Attorney: Jay Barnes, Geoffrey Graber, Eric Kafka, Nicole Ramirez.Plaintiffs' Attorney Appearance: Julia Gonzalez, Jeffrey Koncius, Eric Johnson. Defendant Attorney: Darcy Harris, Elizabeth McCloskey. Not Reported. Digital Recording Liberty: 9:01a.m.-12:14p.m. Total time: 3 Hours 13 Minutes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/20/2023)
April 19, 2023 Filing 212 NOTICE by John Doe NOTICE REGARDING PARTIES ADDITIONAL AGREEMENTS REGARDING ESI PROTOCOL AND PROTECTIVE ORDER (Graber, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/19/2023)
April 17, 2023 Filing 211 STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO METAS DISCOVERY COORDINATION PROPOSAL by John Doe. (Graber, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/17/2023)
April 17, 2023 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Lorraine Gonzalez (Gonzalez, Julia) (Filed on 4/17/2023)
March 30, 2023 Filing 209 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #205 Joint Administrative MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Reply filed byJane Doe. (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 3/30/2023)
March 30, 2023 Filing 208 REPLY (re #205 Joint Administrative MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) filed byDoe, John Doe, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Torchiana, Claire) (Filed on 3/30/2023)
March 29, 2023 Filing 207 NOTICE by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe III re #206 Opposition/Response to Motion, #205 Joint Administrative MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related (Notice of Intent to Seek Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Relate Cases) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/29/2023)
March 28, 2023 Filing 206 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #205 Joint Administrative MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) filed byJane Doe. (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 3/28/2023)
March 24, 2023 Filing 205 Joint Administrative MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related - (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #204 ) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darcy C. Harris in Support of Motion to Relate, #2 Exhibit A - Hey Favor Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 3/24/2023) Modified on 3/27/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2023 Filing 204 Erroneous Entry - Please refer to document #205 Joint Administrative MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darcy C. Harris in Support of Motion to Relate, #2 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 3/24/2023) Modified on 3/27/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/27/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #202 Stipulation to Continue April 6, 2023 Discovery Conference. Discovery conference set for 4/20/2023 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2023)
March 23, 2023 Filing 202 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for a Two Week Continuance of April 6, 2023 Discovery Conference re #201 Order filed by John Doe. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER re Discovery Conference. Discovery conference set for 4/6/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 3/17/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 16, 2023 Filing 200 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/14/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 3/16/2023)
March 16, 2023 Filing 199 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/14/2023, before Judge Orrick. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #196 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2023. (Related documents(s) #196 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 3/16/2023)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #197 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Gregg J. Costa. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2023)
March 15, 2023 Filing 197 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Gregg J. Costa, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-18076586) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Costa, Gregg) (Filed on 3/15/2023)
March 15, 2023 Filing 196 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/14/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Doe, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Torchiana, Claire) (Filed on 3/15/2023)
March 14, 2023 Filing 195 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/14/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2023. Hearing on Motion to Dismiss set for 8/16/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Total Time in Court: 20 minutes. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/14/2023)
March 13, 2023 Filing 194 CLERKS NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING. The Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2023 at 2:00 p.m. will be held via Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2023)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Related Case Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #192 Administrative Motion to relate Case No. 23-cv-900-SK. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2023)
March 10, 2023 Filing 192 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 3/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman, #2 Exhibit A - Stewart Complaint)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 3/10/2023)
March 7, 2023 Filing 191 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant ESI, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant Redline ESI to Plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit C - Defendant Redline ESI to Model, #4 Exhibit D - Defendant PO, #5 Exhibit E - Defendant Redline PO to Plaintiffs, #6 Exhibit F - Defendant Redline PO to Model, #7 Exhibit G - Defendant Clawback, #8 Exhibit H - Defendant Clawback to Plaintiff, #9 Exhibit I - Plaintiffs ESI, #10 Exhibit J - Plaintiffs ESI to Model, #11 Exhibit K - Plaintiffs PO, #12 Exhibit L - Plaintiffs PO to Model, #13 Exhibit M - Plaintiffs Clawback)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 3/7/2023)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #184 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Darcy C. Harris. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2023)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 189 RELATED CASE ORDER relating Case No. 23cv899-JCS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/07/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2023)
March 5, 2023 Filing 188 Statement in Support re #187 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases by Meta Platforms, Inc. in Support of Relating Nancy Murphy v. Meta Platforms, Inc. to In re Meta Pixel Healthcare Litigation by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Goldman)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 3/5/2023)
March 1, 2023 Filing 187 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case C-23-0899 to C-22-3580 JCS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 1, 2023. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting (183) Administrative Motion in case 3:22-cv-03580-WHO to relate Case No. 3:23-cv-00528-WHO. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2023)
February 21, 2023 Filing 185 Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Meta Platforms, Inc.. Filed by John Doe II, Jane Doe I, John Doe, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 2/21/2023)
February 17, 2023 Filing 184 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18003508) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Harris, Darcy) (Filed on 2/17/2023)
February 17, 2023 Filing 183 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 2/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman, #2 Exhibit A - Smart Complaint)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 2/17/2023) Modified on 2/17/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Related Case Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #181 Motion to Relate Case. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023)
January 31, 2023 Filing 181 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED , MOTION to Relate Case filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 2/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman in support of Administrative Motion, #2 Exhibit A (Complaint in Naugle v. Meta Platforms, Inc.))(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 1/31/2023)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick denying #164 Motion to Relate Cases 22cv7557-SI and 22cv9149-SI. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2023)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE VIRGINIA DEMARCHI FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/25/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2023)
January 25, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for Discovery (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 178 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/17/2023, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #174 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/9/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2023. (Related documents(s) #174 ) (Schuerger, Peggy) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER APPROVING #175 JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUBSEQUENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 176 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 17, 2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter not listed - San Francisco. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 18, 2023 Filing 175 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #22 Amended Complaint Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Subsequent Briefing Schedule filed by The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Teresa C. Chow, #2 Proposed Order)(Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 18, 2023 Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 17, 2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Doe, for Court Reporter not listed - San Francisco. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 17, 2023 Filing 173 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 1/17/2023 granting #169 Stipulation and setting Further Case Management Conference for 3/14/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2023. Digital Recording Time: 2:19-2:27. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/17/2023) Modified on 1/18/2023: Matter transcribed by Peggy Schuerger (AdHoc Reporting). (rjd, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2023 Filing 172 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2023 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscour ts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 13, 2023 Filing 171 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 12-14-2022, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (152 in 3:22-cv-03580-WHO) Transcript Order, (153 in 3:22-cv-03580-WHO) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2023. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 13, 2023 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Vitruk (Vitruk, Alexander) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 13, 2023 Filing 169 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Doe. (Graber, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 12, 2023 Filing 168 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #164 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 1/12/2023)
January 10, 2023 Filing 167 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Filing 166 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #164 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) filed byKatrina Calderon, Danielle Calderon. (Deckant, Neal) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Order Relating Case No. 22cv9199-JCS by Judge William H. Orrick re #160 Related Case Referral. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2023) Modified on 1/10/2023 to correct linkage (jmd, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2023 Filing 164 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #2 Exhibit A - John Doe et al. v. Meta Platforms, Inc. (3:22-cv-7557-SI), #3 Exhibit B - Calderon et al. v. Meta Platforms, Inc. (5:22-cv-9149-VKD), #4 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (CIV. L.R. 6-1(b)) by Judge William H. Orrick granting #161 Stipulation. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 5, 2023 Filing 162 COMPLAINT against The Regents of the University of California ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17874057.). Filed byJANE DOE. (Busch, Frank) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 5, 2023 Filing 161 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint Against Dignity Health Medical Foundation filed by JANE DOE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Levis)(Levis, Christian) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 4, 2023 Filing 160 RELATED CASE REFERRAL referring 22-cv-9199 JCS to the Honorable William H. Orrick for consideration of whether the case is related to 22-cv-03580 WHO. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 4, 2023. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2023)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Order by Judge William H. Orrick denying #46 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL - Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2023. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/21/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge William H. Orrick re: #77 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #99 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, and #143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 20, 2022 Filing 156 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/09/2022 before Judge William H. Orrick for Court Reporter Pam Batalo-Hebel. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2022)
December 20, 2022 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Kasabian on Behalf of Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (Kasabian, Andrew) (Filed on 12/20/2022)
December 19, 2022 Filing 154 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Barrera, Abigail) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 19, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Re: #154 Stipulation filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Document filed in wrong case. [err401]. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file document in case 3:22-cv-07557-SI (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 14, 2022 before Judge William H. Orrick by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 15, 2022 Filing 152 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/14/2022 before Judge William H. Orrick by Doe, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2022 re (86 in 3:22-cv-03580-WHO) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, (120 in 3:22-cv-03580-WHO), First MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Class Counsel, (80 in 3:22-cv-03580-WHO) MOTION to Appoint Interim Lead Counsel. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 26 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2022)
December 12, 2022 Filing 150 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/23/2022 before Judge William H. Orrick for Court Reporter Pam Batalo-Hebel. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 149 NOTICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Cameron J. Clark (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 6, 2022 Filing 148 NOTICE by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/6/2022)
December 6, 2022 Filing 147 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/5/2022 before Judge William H. Orrick for Court Reporter Elaine Cropper. (rjd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 146 REPLY (re #86 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byJANE DOE. (MacLean, Margaret) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 145 REPLY in Support (re #80 MOTION to Appoint Interim Lead Counsel ) filed by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Graber, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/9/2022 before Judge William H. Orrick for Court Reporter Pam Batalo-Hebel. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant's Supplemental Declaration of Tobias Wooldridge in Response to Declaration of Christopher "Christo" Wilson filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to File Supplement Under Seal, #2 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman, #3 [Unredacted] Declaration of Tobias Wooldridge Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/23/2022) Modified on 11/25/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2022 Filing 142 Supplemental DECLARATION of Tobias Wooldridge in Opposition to #98 Declaration in Support [REDACTED] filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Related document(s) #98 ) (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 141 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/09/2022, before Judge Orrick. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (127 in 3:22-cv-03580-WHO) Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 12/14/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/21/2023. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 140 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #120 First MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Class Counsel ) filed byJANE DOE. (MacLean, Margaret) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING #134 UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION TO SEVER CLAIMS AGAINST UCSF MEDICAL CENTER AND DIGNITY HEALTH MEDICAL FOUNDATION INTO SEPARATE ACTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 138 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #86 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #80 MOTION to Appoint Interim Lead Counsel ) filed byJohn Doe, John Doe II. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 137 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #120 First MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Class Counsel ) filed byDoe. (Graber, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 17, 2022 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M Steiner (Steiner, Amanda) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
November 17, 2022 Filing 135 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Hearing on Motions to Appoint Interim Lead Counsel set for 12/14/2022 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that p hotographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
November 16, 2022 Filing 134 Unopposed Joint MOTION to Sever Claims Against UCSF Medical Center and Dignity Health Medical Foundation into Separate Actions filed by The Regents of the University of California. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/30/2022. Replies due by 12/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Joint Motion to Sever Claims Against UCSF Medical Center and Dignity Health Medical Foundation into Separate Actions)(Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 11/16/2022)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GIVING META LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO THE WILSON DECLARATION re #111 Objection. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/14/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2022)
November 14, 2022 Filing 132 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11-9-2022 before Judge William H. Orrick for Court Reporter Pam Batalo-Hebel. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 9, 2022 before Judge William H. Orrick by Dignity Health Medical Foundation, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo-Hebel. (Shively, Ashley) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 130 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/09/2022 before Judge William H. Orrick by Doe, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo-Hebel. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 129 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/09/2022 before Judge William H. Orrick by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo-Hebel. (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 128 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 9, 2022 before Judge William H. Orrick by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Pam Batalo-Hebel. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/9/2022 before Judge William H. Orrick by JANE DOE, for Court Reporter Pamela Hebel. (Fiorilla, Amanda) (Filed on 11/10/2022) Modified on 11/10/2022: Added court reporter's name. (rjd, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2022 Filing 126 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 11/9/2022 re (46 in 3:22-cv-03580-WHO) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion taken under submission; written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Hebel. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/9/2022)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/8/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 8, 2022 Filing 124 NOTICE by Malinda Smidga re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: Notice of Intent to Appear in Person (Kim, Jae) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/8/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 8, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #86 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #80 MOTION to Appoint Interim Lead Counsel, #120 First MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Class Counsel. Motion Hearing reset for 12/14/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 7, 2022 Filing 122 Proposed Order re #120 First MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Class Counsel Alternate Proposed Order by JANE DOE, John Doe. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 7, 2022 Filing 121 Proposed Order re #120 First MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Class Counsel by JANE DOE, John Doe. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 7, 2022 Filing 120 First MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Class Counsel filed by JANE DOE, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dee Miles resume, #2 Exhibit Rebecca Gilliland resume, #3 Exhibit Firm resume)(Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Related Case Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #102 Administrative Motion. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 7, 2022 Filing 118 Notice of Intent to Appear in Person re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 4, 2022 Filing 117 Statement of Non-Opposition re #102 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 3-12(b) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #102 ) (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/4/2022)
November 4, 2022 Filing 116 AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR IN PERSON by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 11/4/2022)
November 4, 2022 Filing 115 NOTICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Intent to Appear in Person (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/4/2022)
November 4, 2022 Filing 114 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING HYBRID HEARING - Counsel may appear in person for the Motion Hearing as to #46 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 11/9/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. This proceeding will also be conducted via Zoom webinar, and counsel may choose to appear remotely.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedi ngs, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2022)
November 2, 2022 Filing 113 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #86 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel) filed by Doe. (Graber, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/2/2022) Modified on 11/3/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2022 Filing 112 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #80 MOTION to Appoint Interim Lead Counsel) filed by JANE DOE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Fiorilla)(Fiorilla, Amanda) (Filed on 11/2/2022)
November 2, 2022 Filing 111 OBJECTIONS to #98 Declaration in Support To New Evidence Filed With Plaintiffs Preliminary Injunction Reply by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/2/2022) Modified on 11/3/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2022 Filing 110 NOTICE of Intent to Appear In Person by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 11/2/2022)
November 2, 2022 Filing 109 Statement re #99 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed) by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/2/2022)
November 2, 2022 Filing 108 Statement re #80 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel and Memorandum in Support) by Doe. (McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 11/2/2022)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #105 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Margaret McLean. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2022)
November 2, 2022 Filing 106 Statement re #80 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel and Memorandum in Support) - Statement on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Krackenberger in Support of Simmons Hanly/Cohen Milstein Proposed Interim Counsel Leadership Application by Michael Krackenberger. (Casey, David) (Filed on 11/2/2022)
November 1, 2022 Filing 105 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17686233) filed by JANE DOE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(MacLean, Margaret) (Filed on 11/1/2022)
October 31, 2022 Filing 104 Proposed Order re #102 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 3-12(b) by John Doe, John Doe II. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 10/31/2022)
October 31, 2022 Filing 103 Declaration of Jennie Lee Anderson in Support of #102 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 3-12(b) filed byJohn Doe, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #102 ) (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 10/31/2022)
October 31, 2022 Filing 102 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 3-12(b) filed by John Doe, John Doe II. Responses due by 11/4/2022. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 10/31/2022)
October 27, 2022 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/5/2022 before Judge William H. Orrick by JANE DOE, for Court Reporter Elaine Cropper. (Fiorilla, Amanda) (Filed on 10/27/2022)
October 26, 2022 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II re #99 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 26, 2022 Filing 99 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed) filed by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Unredacted Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Unredacted Declaration of Christopher "Christo" Wilson)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 26, 2022 Filing 98 Declaration of Christopher "Christo" Wilson in Support of #97 Reply to Opposition/Response (Redacted version) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Related document(s) #97 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 26, 2022 Filing 97 REPLY (re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (Redacted version) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #88 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Hannah N. Barnnett. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 24, 2022 Filing 95 Statement in Response re #92 Order regarding Newly Related Cases by Malinda Smidga. (Kim, Jae) (Filed on 10/24/2022) Modified on 10/25/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2022 Filing 94 Statement in Reponse re #92 Order Newly Related Cases by Michael Krackenberger. (Blatt, Gayle) (Filed on 10/24/2022) Modified on 10/25/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2022 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire L Torchiana (Torchiana, Claire) (Filed on 10/24/2022)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER REGARDING NEWLY RELATED CASES. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/21/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 21, 2022 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Francis Ram (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 21, 2022 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Yanchunis (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 21, 2022 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan McGee (McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 20, 2022 Filing 88 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17647386.) filed by Malinda Smidga. (Barnett, Hannah) (Filed on 10/20/2022)
October 20, 2022 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Jae K. Kim (Kim, Jae) (Filed on 10/20/2022)
October 19, 2022 Filing 86 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by JANE DOE. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2022 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/2/2022. Replies due by 11/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Fiorilla, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Fiorilla, Amanda) (Filed on 10/19/2022)
October 19, 2022 Filing 85 Declaration of Andre Mura in Support of #80 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel and Memorandum in Support) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/19/2022)
October 19, 2022 Filing 84 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Koncius in Support of #80 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel and Memorandum in Support) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/19/2022)
October 19, 2022 Filing 83 Declaration of Beth E. Terrell in Support of #80 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel and Memorandum in Support) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/19/2022)
October 19, 2022 Filing 82 Declaration of Geoffrey Graber in Support of #80 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel and Memorandum in Support) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/19/2022)
October 19, 2022 Filing 81 Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes in Support of #80 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel and Memorandum in Support) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/19/2022)
October 19, 2022 Filing 80 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel and Memorandum in Support) filed by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/19/2022)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting #74 , #75 Administrative Motions. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2022)
October 18, 2022 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Hanne Laine Jensen (Jensen, Hanne) (Filed on 10/18/2022)
October 17, 2022 Filing 77 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Declaration of Tobias Wooldridge in Support Defendant's Opposition filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman, #3 Exhibit 1- [Unredacted] Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Exhibit 2- [Unredacted] Declaration of Tobias Wooldridge with Exhibit 1, #5 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2022)
October 17, 2022 Filing 76 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Redacted] Declaration of Tobias Wooldridge with Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Abigail A. Barrera, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2022)
October 17, 2022 Filing 75 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION BY DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC. TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman in support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases should be Related, #2 Proposed Order to Relate Cases)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2022)
October 17, 2022 Filing 74 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION BY DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC. TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman in support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases should be Related, #2 Proposed Order to Relate Cases)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2022)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order by Judge William H. Orrick in case 3:22-cv-03580-WHO; granting (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:22-cv-04680-WHO. Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-04680-WHO, 3:22-cv-03580-WHO, 3:22-cv-04293-WHO, 3:22-cv-04963-WHO (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2022)
October 11, 2022 Filing 71 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 5, 2022, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Elaine Cropper; elaine_cropper@azd.uscourts.gov, telephone number 6023227245. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2023. (Cropper, Elaine) (Filed on 10/11/2022)
October 10, 2022 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/05/2022 before Judge William H. Orrick by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 10/10/2022)
October 7, 2022 Filing 69 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/5/2022 before Judge William H. Orrick by John Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II, for Court Reporter Elaine Cropper. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/7/2022)
October 5, 2022 Filing 72 AMENDED DOCUMENT - Minute entry amended to correct the name of the court reporter. The record was taken by Elaine Cropper. (38 in 3:22-cv-04680-WHO, 38 in 3:22-cv-04680-WHO, 26 in 3:22-cv-04963-WHO, 26 in 3:22-cv-04963-WHO, 55 in 3:22-cv-04293-WHO, 55 in 3:22-cv-04293-WHO). (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2022)
October 5, 2022 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2022 re (21 in 3:22-cv-04680-WHO) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 3:22-cv-03580-WHO, 3:2-cv-04293-WHO, and 3:22-cv-04680-WHO. Hearing on Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel set for 11/21/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference before Judge William H. Orrick. Total Time in Court: 25 miinutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2022)
October 5, 2022 Filing 67 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Hearing on Motions and Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2022 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that phot ographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #h ttps://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2022)
September 28, 2022 Filing 66 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 9/28/2022)
September 27, 2022 Filing 65 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #64 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Continue Hearing re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Enlarge Time for Briefing ) filed byJohn Doe, Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, John Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Koncius)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/27/2022)
September 23, 2022 Filing 64 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Continue Hearing re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Enlarge Time for Briefing filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 9/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman in support of Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING DIGNITY HEALTH MEDICAL FOUNDATION'S UNOPPOSED #28 MOTION TO INTERVENE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE by Judge William H. Orrick in case 3:22-cv-03580-WHO. Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-04680-WHO, 3:22-cv-03580-WHO, 3:22-cv-04293-WHO. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 21, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey on Behalf of Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/21/2022)
September 16, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron James Clark for Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (Clark, Cameron) (Filed on 9/16/2022)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Related Case Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #59 Motion..(jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2022)
September 8, 2022 Filing 59 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G. Rhodes, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 9/8/2022)
September 6, 2022 Filing 58 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #56 Stipulation. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2022. Responses to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction due by 10/10/2022. Replies due by 10/26/2022. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 11/9/2022 02:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 2, 2022 Filing 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Stipulated Request to Continue Hearing re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, and Setting Briefing Schedule filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G. Rhodes in support of Stipulated Request, #2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Request)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
August 31, 2022 Filing 55 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Meta Platforms, Inc. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 30, 2022 Filing 54 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jane Doe II) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Filing 53 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jane Doe I) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Filing 52 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (John Doe II) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Filing 51 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (John Doe) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 26, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Terrell (Terrell, Beth) (Filed on 8/26/2022)
August 25, 2022 Filing 49 Declaration of Richard M. Smith in Support of #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJohn Doe. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 25, 2022 Filing 48 Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes in Support of #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJohn Doe. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 25, 2022 Filing 47 Declaration of John Doe in Support of #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJohn Doe. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 25, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2022 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/8/2022. Replies due by 9/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Related Case Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #43 Administrative Motion to relate Case No. 22-cv-4680-AGT. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 44 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #43 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Relate Cases (Correction to ECF No. 42) ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Barrera, Abigail) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
August 19, 2022 Filing 43 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Relate Cases (Correction to ECF No. 42) filed by Doe. Responses due by 8/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey Graber)(Graber, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 18, 2022 Filing 42 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey Graber)(Graber, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/18/2022) Modified on 8/19/2022 (tn, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Related Case Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #35 Administrative Motion. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2022)
August 12, 2022 Filing 40 REPLY (re #35 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED ) (Plaintiff John Doe's Response In Support of Jane Doe Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related) filed byJohn Doe. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Lauren R. Goldman. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Trenton J. Van Oss. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 10, 2022 Filing 37 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #35 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Barrera, Abigail) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 10, 2022 Filing 36 STIPULATION FOR DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Barrera, Abigail) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 35 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by JANE DOE. Responses due by 8/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carol Villegas in Support of Administrative Motion to Relate Cases)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 34 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Barrera, Abigail) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Augus Barrera (Barrera, Abigail) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Trenton J. Van Oss (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17422520.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Van Oss, Trenton) (Filed on 8/8/2022) Modified on 8/9/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Lauren R. Goldman ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17422048.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 8/8/2022) Modified on 8/9/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2022 Filing 30 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS [CIVIL L.R. 3-15] filed by John Doe (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 7/29/2022)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Paulson. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2022)
July 27, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jennifer Paulson ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17387398) filed by John Doe. (Paulson, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/27/2022)
July 26, 2022 Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2022 02:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2022. This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoc onference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
July 18, 2022 Filing 26 Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 18, 2022 Filing 25 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Meta Platforms, Inc... (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Meta Platforms, Inc.. Filed by John Doe. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 11, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by John Doe. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/11/2022)
July 7, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes , Kyle C. Wong, and Caroline A. Lebel for Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 7/7/2022)
July 1, 2022 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Doe.. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
June 29, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 6/24/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #9 Application for Admission of Attorney Stephen M. Gorny Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #8 Application for Admission of Attorney Elizabeth S. Lenivy Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #7 Application for Admission of Attorney Amy Collignon Gunn Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #6 Application for Admission of Attorney Thien An Vinh Truong Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #5 Application for Admission of Attorney Eric S. Johnson Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #4 Application for Admission of Attorney Jason "Jay" Barnes Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17281159) filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gorny, Stephen) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17279845) filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Admission)(Lenivy, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17279797) filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Admission)(Gunn, Amy) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17275739) filed by John Doe. (Truong, An) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17275708) filed by John Doe. (Johnson, Eric) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17275489) filed by John Doe. (Barnes, Jay) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Meta Platforms, Inc., (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC- 17273752). Filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/17/2022) Modified on 6/21/2022 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Meta Pixel Healthcare Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: An V. Truong
Represented By: Eric Steven Johnson
Represented By: Jay Barnes
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Koncius
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Lenivy
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Stephen M. Gorny
Represented By: Jennifer M Paulson
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Amanda M Steiner
Represented By: Geoffrey Aaron Graber
Represented By: Eric Alfred Kafka
Represented By: Claire L Torchiana
Represented By: Mahnam Ghorbani
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez Jones
Represented By: Hanne Jensen
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe
Represented By: Geoffrey Aaron Graber
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Julia Lorraine Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael Kipp Mueller
Represented By: Claire L Torchiana
Represented By: Eric Alfred Kafka
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Sara Delaney Brooks
Represented By: Hanne Jensen
Represented By: Joseph P. Brent
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe II
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Koncius
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Geoffrey Aaron Graber
Represented By: Claire L Torchiana
Represented By: Mahnam Ghorbani
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez Jones
Represented By: Hanne Jensen
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe I
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Koncius
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez
Represented By: Geoffrey Aaron Graber
Represented By: Claire L Torchiana
Represented By: Mahnam Ghorbani
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez Jones
Represented By: Hanne Jensen
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe II
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Koncius
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez
Represented By: Geoffrey Aaron Graber
Represented By: Claire L Torchiana
Represented By: Mahnam Ghorbani
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez Jones
Represented By: Hanne Jensen
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Smidga
Represented By: Jae K. Kim
Represented By: Hannah N Barnett
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Jamisen A. Etzel
Represented By: Hanne Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1
Represented By: Alison D Hawthorne
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: Rachel Nichole Minder
Represented By: Rebecca Diane Gilliland
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Hanne Jensen
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 2
Represented By: Alison D Hawthorne
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: Rachel Nichole Minder
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Rebecca Diane Gilliland
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Hanne Jensen
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe III
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Koncius
Represented By: Claire L Torchiana
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez Jones
Represented By: Hanne Jensen
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Represented By: Mahnam Ghorbani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.C.
Represented By: GABRIEL G. SNYDER
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Represented By: Hanne Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Smart
Represented By: David J Cohen
Represented By: James Zouras
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Hanne Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. M.
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Caroline Lebel
Represented By: Kyle C. Wong
Represented By: Lauren R Goldman
Represented By: Abigail Augus Barrera
Represented By: Trenton James Van Oss
Represented By: Cameron James Clark
Represented By: Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey
Represented By: Caroline A. Lebel
Represented By: Andrew Kasabian
Represented By: Andrew M. Kasabian
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Darcy Caitlyn Harris
Represented By: Gregg Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Krackenberger
Represented By: Gayle Meryl Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Represented By: Alexander Vitruk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novant Health, Inc.
Represented By: DAVID BALSER
Represented By: Jennifer K. Van Zant
Represented By: MARISA MALECK
Represented By: ROBERT GRIEST
Represented By: STEVEN WILSON QUICK
Represented By: JIM W. PHILLIPS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Joshua Michael Fliegel
Represented By: David A. Carney
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Caroline A. Lebel
Represented By: Trenton James Van Oss
Represented By: Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Abigail Augus Barrera
Represented By: Kyle C. Wong
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Kutcher
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Operations, LLC
Represented By: Abigail Augus Barrera
Represented By: Kyle C. Wong
Represented By: Trenton James Van Oss
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Kutcher
Represented By: Caroline A. Lebel
Represented By: Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram LLC
Represented By: Trenton James Van Oss
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Caroline A. Lebel
Represented By: Abigail Augus Barrera
Represented By: Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Kutcher
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Kyle C. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Line Health
Represented By: EDWARD J. MCANDREW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JANE DOE
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean
Represented By: Amanda Grace Fiorilla
Represented By: Frank H. Busch
Represented By: James Matthew Wagstaffe
Represented By: Michael A. Caddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Dignity Health Medical Foundation
Represented By: Ashley Lynn Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Katrina Calderon
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Danielle Calderon
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nancy Murphy
Represented By: David J Cohen
Represented By: Ryan F. Stephan
Represented By: Teresa M. Becvar
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robert Stewart
Represented By: David J Cohen
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Teresa M. Becvar
Represented By: Ryan F. Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alistair Stewart
Represented By: Ryan F. Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Mohammed Rathur
Represented By: Teresa M. Becvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Patrick Santoro
Represented By: David J Cohen
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Ryan F. Stephan
Represented By: Teresa M. Becvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jessica Landis
Represented By: Ryan F. Stephan
Represented By: Teresa M. Becvar
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: David J Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Diana Williams
Represented By: Kenneth Noel Ralston
Represented By: Kevin David Neal
Represented By: William Fleming King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alicia Bell
Represented By: Kenneth Noel Ralston
Represented By: Kevin David Neal
Represented By: William Fleming King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Advocate Aurora Health, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Bushofsky
Represented By: Francis X Liesman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?