Warrens v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Leo Warrens
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2022cv03752
Filed: June 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
2 Judge: Trina L Thompson
3 Judge: Trina L Thompson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion for Dismissal filed by Leo Warrens. Responses due by 12/6/2023. Replies due by 12/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Motion for Dismissal)(Carvalho, Tionna) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES. The parties submitted a stipulation for Defendant to pay attorneys fees. See ECF No. 40. The Court DENIES without prejudice the parties joint stipulation. The Court requests that the parties provide evidence establishing the reasonableness of the established fee (under seal). See Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d). Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 11/16/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 15, 2023 Filing 40 Joint MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Leo Warrens and FCA US, LLC. Responses due by 11/29/2023. Replies due by 12/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 11/15/2023) Modified on 11/15/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION #38 . The parties submitted a stipulation to continue plaintiff's motion for attorneys fees, costs, and expenses from November 7, 2023 to either December 7, 2024 or February 7, 2024. See ECF No. 38. The Court DENIES this stipulation without prejudice. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and are scheduled for a hearing on November 28, 2023 at 2:00 pm in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 11/12/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2023)
November 8, 2023 Filing 38 Stipulation for Order to Continue Jurisdiction filed by Leo Warrens and FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 11/8/2023) Modified on 11/9/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION #36 . The parties submitted a stipulation to continue plaintiff's motion for attorneys fees, costs, and expenses from November 7, 2023 to February 7, 2024. See ECF No. 36. The Court DENIES this stipulation without prejudice. Good cause is required for a continuance over 30 days. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 11/3/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 2, 2023 Filing 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE JURISDICTION filed by Leo Warrens and FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 11/2/2023) Modified on 11/3/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER VACATING CMC Parties filed a motion to enforce judgment. See ECF No. 32. Accordingly, the Court vacates the case management conference scheduled for October 26, 2023. All other dates are maintained. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/25/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2023)
October 24, 2023 Filing 34 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/24/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 10/24/2023)
October 23, 2023 Filing 33 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Leo Warrens and FCA LLC. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/23/2023) Modified on 10/24/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Leo Warrens. Responses due by 11/6/2023. Replies due by 11/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. The parties did not file a joint case management statement as required under Judge Thompsons Civil Standing Order. See Judge Thompsons Civil Standing Order at para 12. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint case management statement by Tuesday, 10/24/2023. Failure to timely file a case management statement may result in the case management conference being continued and an order to show cause being issued for the parties to explain why the Court should not impose sanctions sua sponte for failure to comply with the Courts standing order. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/23/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
July 27, 2023 Filing 30 Joint Status Statement by Leo Warrens and FCA US LLC. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/27/2023) Modified on 7/28/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE by Leo Warrens of withdrawal of counsel (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann LaRocque (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REGARDING STATUS. The parties shall file a joint status statement by 7/27/2023 regarding the status of the case. The parties next appear before the Court on 10/26/2023 for a further Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 6/21/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
October 18, 2022 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trina L. Thompson: Initial Case Management Conference held by Zoom on 10/18/2022. Case referred to Private Mediation. The parties will participate in private mediation, preferably with Grant Woodruff or Ron Akasaka. Completion of ADR by 12/16/2023. The Court adopts the Joint Case Management Statement deadlines as outlined on page 20. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2023 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. Amended Pleadings due by 2/6/2023. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 11/6/2023. Close of Fact Discovery due by 10/16/2023. Close of Expert Disclosure due by 10/16/2023. Close of Expert Discovery due by 11/27/2023. Dispositive Motion due by 12/26/2023. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Trina L. Thompson. Pretrial Conference set for 2/29/2024 at 3:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Trina L. Thompson. Jury Trial set for 4/1/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Trina L. Thompson. Jury Trial set for 4/2/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Trina L. Thompson. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Trina L. Thompson. Jury Trial set for 4/4/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Trina L. Thompson. Jury Trial set for 4/5/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Trina L. Thompson.(Digital Recording Time: Zoom Recording: 9:15-9:22) Plaintiff Attorney: Ariel Harman-Holmes. Defendant Attorney: James Mayo. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/18/2022)
October 18, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2022)
October 12, 2022 Filing 25 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Leo Warrens and FCA US LLC. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 10/12/2022) Modified on 10/13/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2022 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Specially Set Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 09:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina- l-thompson/Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at tltcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Wednesday, October 12, 2022, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2022)
September 14, 2022 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 14, 2022 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Reshma Bajaj. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re: #17 Notice of Appearance filed by FCA US LLC (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 14, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #22 Notice of Appearance filed by FCA US LLC (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14 /2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 22 Disregard incorrect document attached- See #23 .- NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Mayo (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 9/13/2022) Modified on 9/15/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2022 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA US LLC, Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V., Other Affiliate Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). for FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bajaj, Reshma) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 20 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bajaj, Reshma) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bajaj, Reshma) (Filed on 9/13/2022) Modified on 9/14/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Reshma Amarlal Bajaj (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bajaj, Reshma) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Mayo (Attachments: #1 Certificate Of Service)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
August 29, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Trina L Thompson. Judge Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Trina L. Thompson in the San Francisco division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials TLT immediately after the case number.2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before Judge Thompson by the moving party for a date consistent with the Courts law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff remain unchanged.5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for or after November 15, 2022, and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered.6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before November 15, 2022, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines (e.g., motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases.7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice.8. On or before October 14, 2022, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address all issues outlined in the #Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District. The approved form for such statements can be accessed # here.IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 8/29/2022 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (ecg-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 25, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leo Warrens. FCA US LLC served on 8/23/2022, answer due 9/13/2022. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 13 Civil Cover Sheet by Leo Warrens . (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
July 28, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for October 11, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by October 4th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-03752-HSG. The October 11th proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction.The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equiv alent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2022)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 07/27/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2022)
July 26, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
July 26, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Leo Warrens.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
July 12, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/26/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2022)
July 1, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Nature of Suit Differs from original filing of Civil Cover sheet, please re-file an Amended Civil Cover sheet with the corrected Nature of Suit. Re: #7 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Leo Warrens (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
June 30, 2022 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet by Leo Warrens . (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 #Electronic filing error. No Venue chosen on Civil Cover Sheet, Please use the Northern Districts revision of the Civil Cover sheet, and refile an Amended Civil Cover sheet only. Re: #3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Leo Warrens (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 24, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/8/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 24, 2022 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Leo Warrens . (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 24, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS against Does, FCA US LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17294222.). Filed by Leo Warrens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/24/2022) Modified on 6/27/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warrens v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Warrens
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRocque
Represented By: Tionna Carvalho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: Reshma Amarlal Bajaj
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?