Cook et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Cook and Anna Cook
Defendant: FCA US, LLC and Lithia Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat of Santa Rosa
Case Number: 3:2022cv03788
Filed: June 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
2 Judge: Trina L Thompson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2023 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A DEADLINE FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT RE: SETTLEMENT OR JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL.A deadline for a Joint Status Report r: Settlement or Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal is set for 11/27/2023. All other previously ordered dates are maintained. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 26, 2023 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT REGARDING SETTLEMENT by Anna Cook, Jonathan Cook. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER AS MODIFIED GRANTING #27 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES and REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 8/22/2023 (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 8/23/2023)
August 22, 2023 Filing 27 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES, REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER filed by Anna Cook, Jonathan Cook. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 8/22/2023)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER AS MODIFIED GRANTING #25 JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 8/14/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 11, 2023 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Order to Continue Jurisdiction filed by Anna Cook, Jonathan Cook. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
July 28, 2023 Filing 24 JUDGMENT AS MODIFIED. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 7/28/2023. Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal or Status Report due by 10/26/2023.(rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 7/28/2023)
July 28, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Anna Cook, Jonathan Cook. Responses due by 8/18/2023. Replies due by 8/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Judgment)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/28/2023)
March 3, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Nino Sanaia (Sanaia, Nino) (Filed on 3/3/2023)
December 1, 2022 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT on Scheduling Mediation by Anna Cook, Jonathan Cook. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 11/14/2022. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2022)
November 10, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Trina L Thompson: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/10/2022. Parties are to file a Joint Status Report by 11/28/2022, advising the Court the name of the mediator selected and the mediation date. If the parties are unable to obtain a mediation date, the Court will issue an Order referring case to a Magistrate Judge for a Settlement Conference. Private ADR to be completed by 5/19/2023. Close of Expert Discovery 10/10/2023. Close of Fact Discovery 7/24/2023. Dispositive Motion due by 12/4/2023. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before District Judge Trina L Thompson. Opening Reports due by 8/7/2023. Rebuttal Reports due by 8/28/2023. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement with Objections due by 2/8/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2024 at 3:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. Jury Selection set for 4/8/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before District Judge Trina L Thompson. Jury Trial set for 4/8/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before District Judge Trina L Thompson. Further Jury Trial set for 4/9/2024, 4/10/2024, 4/11/2024 and 4/15/2024 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before District Judge Trina L Thompson. Total Time in Court: 9 Minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Ariel Harman-Holmes. Defendant Attorney: Hailey Rogerson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/10/2022) Modified on 11/15/2022 (vla, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2022 Filing 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Anna Cook, Jonathan Cook. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 11/3/2022)
October 5, 2022 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 02:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at tltcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Monday, November 7, 2022, by no later than 12:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2022)
August 30, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Fifth Cause of Action (Fraud) Without Prejudice by Anna Cook, Jonathan Cook (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Request for Dismissal of Fifth Cause of Action (Fraud) Without Prejudice) (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 8/30/2022) Modified on 8/31/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Law (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 29, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Trina L Thompson. Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Trina L. Thompson in the San Francisco division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials TLT immediately after the case number.2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before Judge Thompson by the moving party for a date consistent with the Courts law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff remain unchanged.5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for or after November 15, 2022, and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered.6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before November 15, 2022, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines (e.g., motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases.7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice.8. On or before October 14, 2022, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address all issues outlined in the #Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District. The approved form for such statements can be accessed # here.IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 8/29/2022 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (ecg-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
June 29, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2022 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advan ced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than by noon on 10/5/2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 06/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 28, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 28, 2022 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2022 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 28, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/11/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet by FCA US, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Azemoon (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg Gruzman (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Hailey Marie Rogerson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by FCA US, LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA US LLC, Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V., Other Affiliate STELLANTIS N.V. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, N.V.) for FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is SC-269856. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17299072). Filed byFCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 of HMR iso of Removal, #2 A to HMR DECL iso Removal, #3 B to HMR DECL iso Removal, #4 C to HMR DECL iso Removal, #5 D to HMR DECL iso Removal, #6 E to HMR DECL iso Removal, #7 F to HMR DECL iso Removal, #8 G to HMR DECL iso Removal, #9 H to HMR DECL iso Removal, #10 I to HMR DECL iso Removal, #11 J to HMR DECL iso Removal, #12 K to HMR DECL iso Removal, #13 L to HMR DECL iso Removal, #14 M to HMR DECL iso Removal, #15 N to HMR DECL iso Removal, #16 O to HMR DECL iso Removal, #17 P to HMR DECL iso Removal, #18 Q to HMR DECL iso Removal, #19 R to HMR DECL iso Removal, #20 S to HMR DECL iso Removal, #21 T to HMR DECL iso Removal, #22 U to HMR DECL iso Removal, #23 V to HMR DECL iso Removal, #24 W to HMR DECL iso Removal, #25 X to HMR DECL iso Removal, #26 Y to HMR DECL iso Removal, #27 Z to HMR DECL iso Removal, #28 AA to HMR DECL iso Removal, #29 BB to HMR DECL iso Removal, #30 CC to HMR DECL iso Removal, #31 DD to HMR DECL iso Removal, #32 EE to HMR DECL iso Removal, #33 FF to HMR DECL iso Removal, #34 GG to HMR DECL iso Removal, #35 Civil Cover Sheet, #36 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Current version of Civil Cover Sheet needed for assignment. Please use civil cover sheet provided on our website with rev. date of 10/2020. No judge assi gnment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, filed by FCA US, LLC (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Cook
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Cook
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Ali Azemoon
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Hailey Marie Rogerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lithia Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat of Santa Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?