Koller et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Scott Koller, Tim Ferguson, Ruby Cornejo and John Lysek
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Bayer CropScience LP, The Scotts Company LLC and Seamless Control LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv04260
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Filing 15 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule and Extend Page Limits filed by Bayer CropScience LP, Monsanto Company. Responses due by 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, John) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
August 23, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 23, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer CropScience LP identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Bayer CropScience LP. (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 23, 2022 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 23, 2022 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bayer CropScience LP identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Bayer CropScience LP. (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 23, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to re #1 Complaint filed by Bayer CropScience LP, Monsanto Company. (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Wilkerson for Defendants Monsanto Company and Bayer CropScience LP (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 23, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Rosenthal for Defendants Monsanto Company and Bayer CropScience LP (Rosenthal, John) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Defendants Bayer CropScience LP, Monsanto Company, Seamless Control LLC, The Scotts Company LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE MAGNUSSONMOSS WARRANTY ACT; VIOLATIONS OF THE SONG-BEVERLY CONSUMER WARRANTY ACT; BREACH OF EXPRESS AND IMPLIED WARRANTIES; VIOLATIONS OF CALIFORNIA CONSUMERS LEGAL REMEDIES ACT; FALSE ADVERTISING; FRAUDULENT CONCEALMENT; FRAUD, DECEIT, AND/OR MISREPRESENTATION; UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES; AND UNJUST ENRICHMENT against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17375342). Filed by John Lysek, Scott Koller, Ruby Cornejo, Tim Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Safier, Seth) (Filed on 7/22/2022) Modified on 7/22/2022 (tn, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2022 DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2741: Scott Koller, et al v. Monsanto Company, et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-04260-VC cc: JPMDL (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koller et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Koller
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Anthony J Patek
Represented By: David Jackson Wool
Represented By: Kali Backer
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Represented By: David Wool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Ferguson
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Anthony J Patek
Represented By: David Jackson Wool
Represented By: Kali Backer
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Represented By: David Wool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Cornejo
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Anthony J Patek
Represented By: David Jackson Wool
Represented By: Kali Backer
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Represented By: David Wool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lysek
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Anthony J Patek
Represented By: David Jackson Wool
Represented By: Kali Backer
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Represented By: David Wool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Wilkerson
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience LP
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Wilkerson
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Scotts Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seamless Control LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?