Roblox Corporation et al v. WowWee Group Limited et al
Plaintiff: Roblox Corporation and Jazwares, LLC
Defendant: WowWee Group Limited, WowWee Canada, Inc., WowWee USA, Inc. and Gramps Goods, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv04476
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Filing 40 STIPULATION re #36 Amended Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Gramps Goods, Inc., WowWee Canada, Inc., WowWee Group Limited, WowWee USA, Inc.. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/21/2022)
September 20, 2022 Filing 39 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2022)
September 20, 2022 Received one CD re #36 AMENDED COMPLAINT. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2022)
September 19, 2022 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jazwares, LLC, Roblox Corporation Re: [36-2], [36-3], [36-4] and [36-5] (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 19, 2022 Filing 37 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (Amended) (cc: form mailed to register). (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 19, 2022 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gramps Goods, Inc., WowWee Canada, Inc., WowWee Group Limited, WowWee USA, Inc.. Filed byRoblox Corporation, Jazwares, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Manual Filing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Manual Filing, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Manual Filing, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Manual Filing)(Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 19, 2022 Filing 35 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT GUIDELINE AND CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2022 at 02:30 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 10/26/22 at 2 p.m..Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statemen t due by 10/28/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 09/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 19, 2022 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 9, 2022 Filing 32 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gramps Goods, Inc., WowWee Canada, Inc., WowWee Group Limited, WowWee USA, Inc... (Elkin, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2022)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #30 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2022)
August 31, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Cesie Alvarez ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17497232.) filed by Gramps Goods, Inc., WowWee Canada, Inc., WowWee Group Limited, WowWee USA, Inc.. (Alvarez, Cesie) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #27 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #25 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Filing 27 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17492738.) filed by WowWee Canada, Inc., et al. (Bednarek, Michael) (Filed on 8/30/2022) Modified on 9/1/2022 (far, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin R. Ranahan (Ranahan, Erin) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17491651.) filed by Gramps Goods, Inc., WowWee Canada, Inc., WowWee Group Limited, WowWee USA, Inc.. (Elkin, Michael) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Golinveaux (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 16, 2022 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jazwares, LLC, Roblox Corporation.. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 12, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roblox Corporation, Jazwares, LLC. Gramps Goods, Inc. served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 12, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roblox Corporation, Jazwares, LLC. WowWee USA, Inc. served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 12, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roblox Corporation, Jazwares, LLC. WowWee Group Limited served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #6 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #5 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
August 3, 2022 Filing 17 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Filing 16 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Gramps Goods, Inc., WowWee Canada, Inc., WowWee Group Limited, WowWee USA, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Filing 14 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Filing 13 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/17/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 12 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 11 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jazwares, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alleghany Corporation, Other Affiliate Alleghany Capital Corporation for Jazwares, LLC. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jazwares, LLC (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roblox Corporation (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Roblox Corporation (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Tyce R. Walters ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17407224.) filed by Jazwares, LLC, Roblox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Walters, Tyce) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Elana Nightingale Dawson ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17407207.) filed by Jazwares, LLC, Roblox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Nightingale Dawson, Elana) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Meyers Ray on behalf of Plaintiffs Roblox Corporation and Jazwares, LLC (Ray, Sarah) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Gass on behalf of Plaintiffs Roblox Corporation and Jazwares, LLC (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gramps Goods, Inc., WowWee Canada, Inc., WowWee Group Limited, WowWee USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17406739.). Filed byRoblox Corporation, Jazwares, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1(a), #2 Exhibit 1(b), #3 Exhibit 1(c), #4 Exhibit 1(d), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/2/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roblox Corporation et al v. WowWee Group Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roblox Corporation
Represented By: Elana Nightingale Dawson
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Represented By: Tyce Randall Walters
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazwares, LLC
Represented By: Elana Nightingale Dawson
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Represented By: Tyce Randall Walters
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WowWee Group Limited
Represented By: Jennifer A. Golinveaux
Represented By: Cesie C. Alvarez
Represented By: Erin R. Ranahan
Represented By: Michael S. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WowWee Canada, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Golinveaux
Represented By: Cesie C. Alvarez
Represented By: Erin R. Ranahan
Represented By: Michael Bednarek
Represented By: Michael S. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WowWee USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Golinveaux
Represented By: Cesie C. Alvarez
Represented By: Erin R. Ranahan
Represented By: Michael S. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gramps Goods, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Golinveaux
Represented By: Cesie C. Alvarez
Represented By: Erin R. Ranahan
Represented By: Michael S. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?