Wolff v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wolff
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2022cv04672
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #42 Stipulation regarding Attorney's Fees. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 42 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES and REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER filed by Kenneth Wolff, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 8/14/2023) Modified on 8/15/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2023 Filing 41 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/31/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2023)
July 27, 2023 Filing 40 Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Kenneth Wolff. Responses due by 8/10/2023. Replies due by 8/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/27/2023) Modified on 7/28/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/31/2023 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2023 Filing 39 CLERK'S NOTICE MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. At the request of the parties, the briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees is modified as follows:Opening brief is due by August 24, 2023.Opposition is due by September 7, 2023.Reply is due by September 14, 2023.The hearing on the motion is set for September 28, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. in San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2023) Modified on 6/25/2023 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2023 Filing 38 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT with POS filed by Kenneth Wolff and Ford Motor Company. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/23/2023) Modified on 6/26/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2023 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. In light of the parties' partial settlement (Dkt. No. 36 ), the case management conference set for July 27, 2023 is vacated. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees:Opening brief is due by August 3, 2023. Opposition is due by August 17, 2023. Reply is due by August 31, 2023.The Court will hear the motion September 7, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. in San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2023)
June 16, 2023 Filing 36 Amended Certification of ADR Session by Mediator Phillip Neiman: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held a Mediation session on June 14, 2023. The case partially settled, with the sole remaining issue of attorney fees/costs reserved for determination by the Court. Mediation is complete. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2023) Modified on 6/16/2023 (af, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2023 Filing 35 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. AMENDED CERTIFICATION OF ADR SESSION WILL BE FILED*** Certification of ADR Session by Mediator Phillip Neiman: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held a Mediation session on June 14, 2023. The case settled. Mediation is complete. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2023) Modified on 6/16/2023 (af, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Rabiya F. Tirmizi (Tirmizi, Rabiya) (Filed on 6/8/2023)
May 1, 2023 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 6/14/2023 09:00 AM (PT) via Zoom. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2023)
March 27, 2023 Filing 33 ADR Remark: Mediator Phillip Neiman's correct email address is as follows: phil@neimanadr.com. Please disregard the email address provided for Mediator Neiman in ECF No. 32 as it is incorrect. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2023) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 27, 2023 Filing 32 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Phillip Neiman as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2023)
March 24, 2023 Filing 31 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. INCORRECT EMAIL ADDRESS LISTED FOR MEDIATOR. SEE NO. #32 .***ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Phillip Neiman as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2023) Modified on 3/27/2023 (af, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2023 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS INFORMATION. The Further Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2023 at 1:30 p.m. will be held by a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting as modified #28 Stipulation to Continue ADR Deadline. The case management conference set for March 23, 2023 is continued to July 27, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. by a Zoom videoconference. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 17, 2023 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE ADR DEADLINE filed by Kenneth Wolff and Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue ADR Deadline)(Tracy, Michael) (Filed on 3/17/2023) Modified on 3/20/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lion Tracy (Tracy, Michael) (Filed on 3/16/2023)
March 16, 2023 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Michael Lion Tracy- The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re: #27 Notice of Appearance filed by Kenneth Wolff (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2023)
March 10, 2023 Filing 26 ADR Clerk's Notice Vacating Appointment of Mediator Sanford Kingsley. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE by Kenneth Wolff NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
November 22, 2022 Filing 24 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Sanford Kingsley as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/17/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2024 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 8/19/2024 at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 8/19/2024 to 8/30/2024 t 8:30 a.m. (10-days) in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
November 17, 2022 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Initial Case Management Conference held and recorded by Zoom videoconference on 11/17/2022. The case is referred to the Court's ADR Program for a mediation to occur within 120 days. If the parties chooses to go with their private mediator at a later time, they may submit a stipulation. Case deadlines and trial date are set. The Court will issue a Pretrial Order. (Digital Recording Time: 2:21-2:30)Attorneys for Plaintiff: Daniel LawAttorney for Defendant: Gurpreet Sandhu A Further Case Management Conference is set for 6/29/2023 at 1:30 p.m. via a Zoom webinar. Updated Case Management Statement is due by 6/22/2023.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 6/28/2023.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2022)
November 17, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Law (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
November 17, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 20 Joint Case Management Conference filed by Kenneth Wolff and Ford Motor Company. (Whang, Steven) (Filed on 11/10/2022) Modified on 11/14/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Whang of Counsel (Whang, Steven) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
September 14, 2022 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/17/2022 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties wh o wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 11/16/2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 14, 2022 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Gurpreet Sandhu. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on EC F. Re: #12 Notice of Appearance filed by Ford Motor Company (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 09/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate Ford Motor Company, Other Affiliate State Street Corporation (parent of State Street Bank and Trust Company, which is the trustee of the Ford defined contribution plans), Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A. (fiduciary of the Ford defined contribution plan), Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. and Certain affiliates. for Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sandhu, Gurpreet) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sandhu, Gurpreet) (Filed on 9/13/2022) Modified on 9/14/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gurpreet Sandhu (Attachments: #1 Certifcate of Service)(Sandhu, Gurpreet) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dean Sentlinger (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 2, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/16/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
August 30, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2022 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2022. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 25, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Wolff. Ford Motor Company served on 8/23/2022, answer due 9/13/2022. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 16, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 16, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 15, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/29/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2022)
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 8/15/2022)
August 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS against Does, Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17442564.). Filed by Kenneth Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 8/15/2022) Modified on 8/16/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolff v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wolff
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Michael Lion Tracy
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Eric Dean Sentlinger
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Gurpreet Sandhu
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?