McClellan et al v. Twitter, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christina McClellan and Billy Moses
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv04758
Filed: August 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #19 Stipulation to Stay. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2022)
October 13, 2022 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Twitter, Inc... (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/13/2022)
October 11, 2022 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/25/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/25/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2022)
October 7, 2022 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Proceedings filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth L. Deeley)(Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/7/2022)
October 7, 2022 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Twitter, Inc. (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/7/2022)
October 7, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Twitter, Inc. (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/7/2022)
October 7, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney B. Weber on behalf of Defendant Twitter, Inc. (Weber, Whitney) (Filed on 10/7/2022)
October 7, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele D. Johnson on behalf of Defendant Twitter, Inc. (Johnson, Michele) (Filed on 10/7/2022)
October 7, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth L. Deeley on behalf of Defendant Twitter, Inc. (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/7/2022)
September 26, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2022. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 5 8. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court finds that this matter is related to 22-cv-03173-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/23/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 20, 2022 Filing 10 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 22-3173. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/20/2022. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2022)
September 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by Christina McClellan, Billy Moses of Pendency of Other Actions (Nelson, John) (Filed on 9/20/2022)
August 30, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christina McClellan, Billy Moses.. (Nelson, John) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 23, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christina McClellan, Billy Moses. Service waived by Twitter, Inc. waiver sent on 8/22/2022, answer due 10/21/2022. (Nelson, John) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 18, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Twitter, Inc.. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2022)
August 18, 2022 Filing 5 *** FILED IN ERROR *** SEE DOCKET #6 Summons Issued as to Twitter, Inc.. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2022) Modified on 8/19/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/19/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2022)
August 18, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2022)
August 18, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Nelson, John) (Filed on 8/18/2022)
August 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Twitter, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17456123.). Filed byChristina McClellan, Billy Moses. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, John) (Filed on 8/18/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClellan et al v. Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina McClellan
Represented By: John J. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Moses
Represented By: John J. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Michele D. Johnson
Represented By: Whitney B. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?